InCorp Services, Inc v. Does 1-10, inclusive
Plaintiff: InCorp Services, Inc
Defendant: Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2011cv04660
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 3/22/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/29/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions areTERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due 5/10/2013. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due 5/14/2013. Final Pretrial Conferenc e set for 5/24/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 6/10/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 6/11/2013, 6/12/2013, 6/13/2013, 6/17/2013, 6/18/2013. Jury Deliberations set for 6/19/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). Accordingly, the 2/8/2013 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: The parties shall meet and confer in order to reach anagreement on an ADR process alt ernative to private mediation within 10 days of the issuance of this order. Within that same timeframe, the parties shall either (1) file the form entitled "Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Selecting ADR Process if an agreement is reached, or (2 ) file the form entitledNotice of Need for ADR Phone Conference." All previously-imposed deadlines shall remain as currently set. Please note footnote. Defendant may file an administrative motion for leave to take the late deposition of Douglas Ansell upon sufficient proof that Defendant has located Mr. Ansell. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 5/10/2013. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, andProposed Jury Verdict For ms due 5/14/2013. Jury Selection set for 6/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2013, 6/5/2013, 6/6/2013, 6/7/2013, 6/10/201 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Deliberations set for 6/11/2013, 6/12/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 68 , 71 Motions to Dismiss. Any amended Answer and counterclaim submitted in response to this order must be filed on or before 2/15/2013. The hearing scheduled for 2/1/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING re 78 Stipulation of Withdrawal of Motion for Order to Show Cause without Prejudice filed by InCorp Services, Inc, ***12/7/2012 Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 55 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Failure to Submit Sanctions Payment filed by InCorp Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Granting 74 Stipulation Continuing Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND CONFIDENTIALITY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 57 Stipulation (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court also grants Plaintiff leave to amend with respect to subject matter jurisdiction (i.e. the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act claim) and personal jurisdiction with regard to Jo Ann Oliver. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/24/2012 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified on 8/24/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING 6/22/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floo r, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, Sa n Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2012. (Correction of 44 ) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed Plaintiff's Case Management Statement and considering default has been entered as to some Defendants, the court finds an appearance unnecessary at this time. Joint Case Management Stat ement due by 4/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Anticipated Default Judgment Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the unilateral Case Management Conference Statement, filed by Plaintiff on January 17, 2012, the court has determined that an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 1/27/2012 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Amended Complaint due by 2/3/2012. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 7 Motion for Discovery (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InCorp Services, Inc v. Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InCorp Services, Inc
Represented By: Henry M. Burgoyne, III
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?