Ortiz v. Lin R. Rogers Electrical Contractors, Inc
Plaintiff: Victor Ortiz
Defendant: Lin R. Rogers Electrical Contractors, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv04750
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H.Koh on 4/16/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order granting stipulation 23 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/21/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation, as modified.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule re 13 . ***Deadlines terminated. Response due by 12/27/2011. Reply due by 1/10/2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/20/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Lin R. Rogers Electrical Contractors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ortiz
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin R. Rogers Electrical Contractors, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?