Bei v. Santucci

Plaintiff: Norman Bei
Defendant: Nicholas J Santucci
Case Number: 5:2011cv05061
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 53 Motion for Hearing (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
July 18, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE OR REDUCE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 36 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
February 5, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 33 Motion for Default Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
April 23, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/23/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
December 16, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT NICHOLAS SANTUCCI'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 29, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 29, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bei v. Santucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Bei
Represented By: Reid Paul Schantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J Santucci
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?