Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP v. U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division
Case Number: 5:2011cv05105
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Certified Mail re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued, 3 ADR Scheduling Order, by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Notice of Assignment, # 3 Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611065941.). Filed byLieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP v. U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Dean Michael Harvey
Represented By: Katherine M Lehe
Represented By: Joseph Richard Saveri
Represented By: Anne Brackett Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?