Bernardi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas As Trustee et al
Plaintiff: Donna Bernardi and Smitesh Mahendra Parmar
Defendant: Aurora Bank, FSB, Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas As Trustee
Case Number: 5:2011cv05453
Filed: November 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER 42 to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/25/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER 27 Granting Motion for Substitution of Attorney, Attorney Hazel Suhnhee Chu and Gordon Flint Dickson Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/8/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER 13 to Set Aside Default of Defandants. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/6/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernardi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas As Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas As Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Bernardi
Represented By: Gordon Flint Dickson
Represented By: Hazel Suhnhee Chu
Represented By: Deborah Pauline Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smitesh Mahendra Parmar
Represented By: Hazel Suhnhee Chu
Represented By: Gordon Flint Dickson
Represented By: Deborah Pauline Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?