Reddy v. Nuance Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krishna Reddy
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc., Focus Infomatics, Inc., Paul Ricci, Jeanne Nauman, Catherine Dorchuck, Richard Nardone, John Hagen, Matthew Liptak and Diane Coffey
Case Number: 5:2011cv05632
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR FEES, SANCTIONS, AND LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 275 ; denying 280 ; denying 302 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 270 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 271 .(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 267 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING REQUEST. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 2, 2015, re 264 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 153 ; denying 154 ; denying as moot 156 ; denying 157 ; granting 159 ; granting 168 ; denying 169 ; denying 170 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 171 ; denying 172 ; granting 173 ; denying 174 ; granting 177 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 11, 2015 re 245 , 246 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 3, 2014 re 236 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 158 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND 224 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul S. Grewal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER STRIKING 185 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 152 Motion to Disqualify Judge (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: No later than 11/30/2012, the parties shall participate in a settlement conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge Kandis Westmore. The parties shall contact her Courtroom Deputy, Susan Imbriani, at (510) 637-3525 to schedule it. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/2/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION re 137 Ex Parte Application re 122 Notice of Appeal for Reporters' Transcripts at Government Expense - filed by Krishna Reddy. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 12, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO SET A DEADLINE FOR SERVICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 45 Motion Default Judgment; granting 65 Motion to Set Aside Default (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF KRISHNA REDDY'S CROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal finding as moot 75 Motion to Appear by Telephone (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SIXTH, NINTH, AND TENTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF OF THE COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 25, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy v. Nuance Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Infomatics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Nauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Dorchuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?