Vasquez et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Alvina Vasquez, Gabrielle Vasquez, Jason Vasquez, Jr., S. V., So V. and Oralia Mason
Defendant: County of Santa Clara and Laurie Smith
Case Number: 5:2011cv05812
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/28/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Suggesting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/09/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference; and Case Management Order. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/21/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 23 Stipulation Changing Time for Mediation and Discovery Cut-off.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulated Protective Order.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/31/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 11 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvina Vasquez
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Vasquez
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Vasquez, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. V.
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: So V.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oralia Mason
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?