Dynetix Design Solutions, Inc. v. Synopsys, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dynetix Design Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Synopsys, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05973
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 FINAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/11/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER RE: TRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 23, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S DAMAGES EXPERT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 22, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER RE: FINAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RULINGS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 21, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PATENT PROSECUTION DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 399 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and deny ing in part 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 263 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granti ng 295 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 307 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 87 Motion to Dismiss; denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF VCS MULTICORE AND GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF VCS CLOUD by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER RE 300 4/9/2013 HEARING. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 4, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 229 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 235 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART FIRST MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN RE DOCKET NO. 115 AND 167 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 17, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 124 Motion for Leave to File (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF 30(b)(6) WITNESS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 154 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 15, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND GRANTING SYNOPSYS, INC.S COUNTER ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATE re 70 Proposed Order, filed by Synopsys, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/15/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS; ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY CLAIMS AND DISCOVERY AGAINST CUSTOMERS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 40 Motion to Stay; granting 43 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Synopsys, Inc. is required to E-FILE the amended document (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 31 Declaration in Support, filed by Synopsys, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 12, 2012. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 13, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY, re 20 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Dynetix Design Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/12/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynetix Design Solutions, Inc. v. Synopsys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynetix Design Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: J. James Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synopsys, Inc.
Represented By: Shanee Y. W. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?