Creagri, Inc. v. Pinnaclife Inc
Plaintiff: Creagri, Inc.
Defendant: Pinnaclife Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv06635
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 190 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 192 Motion for Attorney Fees. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order Vacating Hearing on Motions for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/28/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefs on Motions for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/29/14. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh finding as moot 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 118 A dministrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 142 Admini strative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [156 ] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in p art 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 163 Motion ; granting 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 174 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Expert Witness. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/18/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
October 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/20/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 54 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 24, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 85 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 2, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh amending Case Management Order and granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONSTRUING DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,416,808 and 8,216,599. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 16, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 1, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 8, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/1/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 42 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 24 Proposed Order filed by Pinnaclife Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/3/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order GRANTING 18 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/24/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creagri, Inc. v. Pinnaclife Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creagri, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Boyle
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Harold M Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnaclife Inc
Represented By: Kenneth L Marshall
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?