Ager v. Hedgepath et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ager
Defendant: Anthony Hedgepath, B. Hendricks and D. Spencer
Case Number: 5:2011cv06642
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER finding as moot 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendants. The clerk shall CLOSE this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/26/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/13. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order Granting 82 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Dispositive Motion. Deadline for dispositive motion due 5/3/2013. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Granting 80 Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/27/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL AND OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 57 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2013. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 1/31/2013 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Request to Vacate Settlement Conference. Request denied without prejudice. Scheduling issues are to be raised with Judge Davila. Discovery matters are to be brought before Magistrate Judge Grewal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/26/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT (Correction of 21 ). The court advances the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 17 ) to July 6, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 6, 2012 , at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before June 29, 2012. The briefing schedule is modified as stipulated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified text on 5/16/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT GRANTING 20 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule And Hearing On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss And To Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Opposition due by 5/18/2012. Reply due by 6/1 /2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ager v. Hedgepath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ager
Represented By: Randolph Elliott Daar
Represented By: John Houston
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?