In Re: iPhone/iPad Application Consumer Privacy Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodimer, Cole Parr, William Moylan, Tommy Yarbrough, Barbara Davis, Hillary Burke, Cynthia O'Flaherty, Precious Arrington, Jarret Ammer, Alejandro Capiro, Heather Kimbrel, Isabella Capiro, Arun Gupta, Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz, Claus Meyer, Jerod Couch, William Devito, Sharon Leslie Normand, Kevin Burwick, Emili Clar, Dolma Acevedo-Crespo, Jose Carlos Velez-Colon, Anthony Chiu, Aaron Mulvey, Natasha Acosta, Jared Parsley, Jonathan Lalo, Dustin Freeman, Nicolette Boswell, Marcia Burke, Diego Lopez, William C Burke, III, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Eric Terrell, Gena Terry, Matt Hines, Arfat Adil, Anna M. Ruston and Vikram Ajjampur
Defendant: Apple, Inc., TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc., Yelp!, Inc., MobClix, Mellenial Media, The Weather Channel, New York Times Co., Medialets, Inc., Pinch Media, Inc., Pandora Media, Inc., GogII, Inc, Outfit7 Ltd., BackFlip Studios, Inc, IAC/InterActiveCorp., Room Candy, Inc, Dictionary.Com, LLC, Quattro Wireless, Inc., NPR, Sunstorm Interactive, Inc., Flurry, Inc., Webmd Health Services Group, Inc., AdMarval, Inc, Groupon, Inc., Google, LLC and Admob, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011md02250
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #299 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 299 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to File Bill of Costs and Plaintiffs to File Any Objections filed by Apple, Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #297 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 297 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to File Bill of Costs and Plaintiffs to File Any Objections filed by Apple, Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 296 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/25/2013. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #265 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting #269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (231) Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot (249) Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot (282) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 293 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel for Defendant Apple Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 11, 2013 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 291 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-31-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2014. (Related documents(s) #289 ) (las, ) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 290 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 290 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 288 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2013 before Honorable Lucy H. Koh re #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc. The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 287 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Leigh Smith filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Azar, David) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING 249 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (249 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247). Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ORDER. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING #249 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (249 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247). Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ORDER. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #283 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Pursuant to 285 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247). Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Pursuant to 285 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247). Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 285 CLERKS NOTICE. The Court will address Defendant's pending motion for summary judgment #231 at the hearing scheduled for October 31, 2013. The Court will address Plaintiffs' pending motion for class certification #249 at the hearing scheduled for November 7, 2013. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ORDER. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 284 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME FOR MOTION HEARING ON OCTOBER 31, 2013 TO 1:00 P.M. #249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247). Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (mpb, COURT STAFF). *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*****
October 24, 2013 Filing 283 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Smith, Leigh) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Apple's Sur Reply Objection, or in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to File a Response to Apple's Objection filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Motion), #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 281 OBJECTIONS to re #278 Declaration in Support, #276 Declaration in Opposition, #277 Reply to Opposition/Response Defendant Apple Inc.'s Objection to New Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Jessen)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 280 Declaration in Support of #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply on Motion to Certify filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Related document(s) #279 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply on Motion to Certify filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Points and Auth (unredacted), #5 Points and Auth (redacted), #6 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #7 Exhibit 1 (redacted), #8 Exhibit 1 (unredacted), #9 Exhibit 2 (under seal), #10 Exhibit 3 (under seal), #11 Exhibit 4 (under seal), #12 Exhibit 5 (under seal), #13 Exhibit 6 (under seal), #14 Exhibit 8 (under seal), #15 Exhibit 9 (under seal), #16 Exhibit 10 (under seal), #17 Exhibit 11 (under seal), #18 Exhibit 12 (under seal), #19 Exhibit 13 (under seal), #20 Exhibit 14 (under seal), #21 Exhibit 15 (under seal), #22 Exhibit 16 (under seal), #23 Exhibit 17 (under seal))(Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 278 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz in Support of #277 Reply to Opposition/Response Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 277 REPLY (re #249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247) ) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 276 DECLARATION of Scott A. Kamber in Support of #249 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified text on 10/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2013 Filing 275 Declaration of Joshua A. Jessen in Support of #273 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #273 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 274 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #273 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #273 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 273 REPLY in Support of ( #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified text on 10/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2013 Filing 272 NOTICE by Arfat Adil, Emili Clar, Jerod Couch, Barbara Davis, Matt Hines, Diego Lopez, Aaron Mulvey, Daniel Rodimer, Anna M. Ruston, Gena Terry Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel (Shelquist, Robert) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 3, 2013 Filing 271 Declaration of Scott B. Murray in Support of #269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 270 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz in Support of #253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents (In Partial Support of Administrative Motion) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #253 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 268 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz in Support of #266 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) #266 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 267 Declaration of Scott A. Kamber in Support of #266 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) #266 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION to ( #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified text on 9/30/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2013 Filing 265 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket #257 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 264 Declaration of Mark Buckley [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification; CORRECTION OF DOCKET #257 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M [Redacted], #14 Exhibit Exhibit N [Redacted], #15 Exhibit Exhibit O [Redacted], #16 Exhibit Exhibit P [Redacted], #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q [Redacted], #18 Exhibit Exhibit R [Redacted], #19 Exhibit Exhibit S [Redacted])(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 263 Declaration of Joshua Jessen CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [253-2] filed byApple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 262 Declaration of Scott B. Murray CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [253-1] filed byApple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 261 Declaration of Ronald Huang [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 260 Declaration of Phillip Shoemaker [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Withheld], #2 Exhibit B [Withheld], #3 Exhibit C [Withheld], #4 Exhibit D [Redacted], #5 Exhibit E [Redacted], #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 259 Declaration of Erik Neuenschwander [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Withheld], #2 Exhibit B [Withheld], #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 258 Declaration of Jane Horvath [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 257 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO DOCUMENT #264 . *** Declaration of Mark Buckley [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M [Redacted], #14 Exhibit N [Redacted], #15 Exhibit O [Redacted], #16 Exhibit P [Redacted], #17 Exhibit Q [Redacted], #18 Exhibit R [Redacted], #19 Exhibit S [Redacted])(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/27/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 Filing 256 Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas [Proposed Redacted] in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C [Redacted])(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 255 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #254 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H [Withheld], #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J [Redacted], #11 Exhibit K [Redacted], #12 Exhibit L [Withheld], #13 Exhibit M [Withheld], #14 Exhibit N [Withheld], #15 Exhibit O [Withheld], #16 Exhibit P [Withheld], #17 Exhibit Q [Withheld], #18 Exhibit R [Withheld], #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U [Redacted])(Related document(s) #254 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 254 OPPOSITION to ( #249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247) ) [Proposed Redacted Copy] filed byApple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified text on 9/23/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 Filing 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Murray, #2 Declaration of Joshua Jessen, #3 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Exhibits to Beringer Declaration, #5 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Bolas Declaration and Exhibits, #6 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Buckley Declaration and Exhibits, #7 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Horvath Declaration, #8 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Huang Declaration, #9 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Neuenschwander Declaration, #10 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Shoemaker Declaration and Exhibits, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 252 Declaration of Scott B. Murray in Support of #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #246 ) (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #251 Order Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 251 Order Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 28, 2013, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/22/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 250 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 28, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified text on 8/22/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2013 Filing 249 MOTION to Certify Class (Notice Re Dkt. Nos. 243 through 247) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/19/2013. Replies due by 10/10/2013. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 248 CLERKS NOTICE re: Deficiency (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 247 MEMORANDUM in Support of #249 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (redacted) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 8/20/2013) Modified text on 8/21/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 Filing 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #2 Proposed Order)(Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 245 Declaration of Deborah Kravits in Support of (Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29, #28 Exhibit 30, #29 Exhibit 31, #30 Exhibit 32, #31 Exhibit 33, #32 Exhibit 34, #33 Exhibit 35, #34 Exhibit 36, #35 Exhibit 37, #36 Exhibit 38)(Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 incorrect event type selected (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 Filing 244 Declaration of Scott A. Kamber in Support of #243 Notice (Other) (Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #243 ) (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu (Plaintiffs' Second Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification) (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 incorrect event type selected (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part #240 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting in part and denying in part #241 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 241 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING #240 PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: ENLARGING PAGE LIMITATION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 linking entry to document #240 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 240 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re: Enlarging Page Limitation for Class Certification Briefing for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: ENLARGING PAGE LIMITATION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified text on 8/9/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/07/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 239 Order Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #239 Order Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 238 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING OR CONTINUING JUNE 12, 2013 CMC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel for Defendant Apple Inc. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 236 Declaration of Phillip Shoemaker in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) #231 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 235 Declaration of Ronald Huang in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 234 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 233 Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 232 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #231 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/26/2013. Replies due by 10/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Summary of Forensic Analysis of Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified text on 5/20/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2013 Filing 230 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-10-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (Related documents(s) #227 ) (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 229 NOTICE of Resolution of Certain Disputes in Lieu of Further Motion Practive Relating to Discovery Issues by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 4/15/2013) Modified text on 4/16/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 226 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/10/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/10/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; finding as moot (126) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (145) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (156) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (176) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (187) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (190) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot (191) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 224 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel for Defendant Apple Inc. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 223 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DKT 221 - Joint Stip)(Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified text on 4/4/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING #221 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 29, 2013 Filing 221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER IN LIEU OF FURTHER MOTION PRACTICE RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 220 NOTICE by Anthony Chiu WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL (Azar, David) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 219 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/19/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2013. (Related documents(s) #217 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Dolma Acevedo-Crespo, Natasha Acosta, Arfat Adil, Vikram Ajjampur, Jarret Ammer, Precious Arrington, Nicolette Boswell, Hillary Burke, Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III, Kevin Burwick, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu, Emili Clar, Jerod Couch, Barbara Davis, William Devito, Dustin Freeman, Arun Gupta, Matt Hines, Heather Kimbrel, Jonathan Lalo, Diego Lopez, Claus Meyer, William Moylan, Aaron Mulvey, Sharon Leslie Normand, Cynthia O'Flaherty, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz, Daniel Rodimer, Anna M. Ruston, Eric Terrell, Gena Terry, Jose Carlos Velez-Colon, Tommy Yarbrough from Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Shelquist, Robert) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. from Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #168 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #163 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 214 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #150 , #206 , #208 and #211 : Parties to meet and confer on state of Apple's production by close of business day 3/22/13. If plaintiff requests relief, counsel to file/notice motion pursuant to local rules. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 213 Further Statement in Response to #203 Order on Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn Miller)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/19/2013) Modified text on 3/20/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL AND APPLE DISCOVERY FILINGS (Re: Docket Nos. #150 , #206 , #208 , #211 ): Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/11/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 8, 2013 Filing 211 Statement re #203 Order on Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn Miller, #2 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer, #3 Exhibit One, #4 Exhibit Two, #5 Exhibit Three, #6 Exhibit Four)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 8, 2013 Filing 210 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Certify Class (Without Prejudice) (Audet, William) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #209 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Further Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER DENYING APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #130 AND INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BECAUSE OF APPLES UNTIMELY DISCOVERYAssociated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 208 Statement re Joint Statement Regarding Outstanding Discovery by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 207 NOTICE by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu of Lodging Transcripts of Motion to Compel Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Nov. 6, 2012 hearing), #2 Exhibit B (March 5, 2012 hearing))(Parisi, David) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 206 Statement re #197 Transcript,, Joint Statement Regarding Outstanding Discovery [Apple Portion] by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 205 Supplemental Brief re #127 MOTION to Certify Class , #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Request of Court filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Related document(s) #127 , #130 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 204 Supplemental Brief re #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Brief In Support Of Apple's Opposition to Class Certification and Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) #146 , #130 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part #150 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 202 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/05/2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2013. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 200 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro: The court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2013)
March 4, 2013 Filing 199 NOTICE of Declaration of Lynn Miller and Supplemental Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer Regarding the Court's Request During February 28, 2013 Hearing Regarding Class Certification by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn Miller, #2 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/4/2013) Modified text on 3/5/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE of Supplemental Filing in Support of #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3, 5-7, 9, 12, 15-16. 20-21, 25 and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 3/4/2013) Modified text on 3/5/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Filing 197 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02-28-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013. (las, ) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 196 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #195 Notice (Other) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Declaration Pursuant to the Court's Order During February 28, 2013 Hearing Regarding Class Certification (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 194 Letter from Scott A. Kamber re Court's Request at Hearing on February 28, 2013. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 28, 2013 Filing 201 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 2/28/2013) re #127 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2013)
February 26, 2013 Filing 193 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clapper v. Amnesty International)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Apple's Objection to Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply Memo in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Opposition to Apple's Objection to Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply Memo in Support of Motion for Class Cert, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Decl. of Manuel Egele, #2 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Decl. of Dr. Lodovico Marziale, #3 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. 10, #5 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit Fithian Decl., #7 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify Class filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Decl of Dr. Lodovico Marziale, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Brief previously submitted under seal, #3 Exhibit Fithian Decl., #4 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #5 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Class Cert Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Decl of Manuel Egele, #3 Exhibit Ex. 18, Neuenschwander Depo., previously submitted under seal, #4 Exhibit Fithian Declaration, #5 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #6 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #186 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents In Support of Apple's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie Fithian, #2 Declaration of Jacob Walker, #3 Declaration of Jacob Walker (Supplemental), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Opposition, #6 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of E. Neuenschwander, #7 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of P. Shoemaker, #8 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of M. Buckley)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 186 MOTION to Appear by Telephone of Leigh Smith filed by Anthony Chiu. (Smith, Leigh) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 185 Declaration of Karen H. Riebel in Support of #184 Reply to Opposition/Response, #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Related document(s) #184 , #150 ) (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 184 REPLY (re #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents ) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 183 Declaration of Leslie Fithian in Support of #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Certify Class filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #176 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 182 OBJECTIONS to Reply Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re (126 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, (145 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed by Apple, Inc., (156 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC,S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, (176 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Certify Class filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/15/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 180 Declaration of Dr. Manuel Egele in Support of #127 MOTION to Certify Class dated December 17, 2012 (Filed with Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 179 Declaration of Dr. Manuel Egele dated January 22, 2013 (Filed with Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 178 Declaration of Lodovico Marziale in Support of #127 MOTION to Certify Class (Filed with Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal))(Related document(s) #127 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 177 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz in Support of #127 MOTION to Certify Class (Filed with Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Certify Class filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 175 OPPOSITION to ( #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip Shoemaker, #2 Declaration of Jacob A. Walker, #3 Declaration of Joshua A. Jessen)(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified text on 2/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Filing 174 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #173 Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #173 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified text on 2/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Filing 173 REPLY in Support of ( #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 2/8/2013) Modified text on 2/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING LOCATION OF FEBRUARY 28, 2013 HEARING. Judge Koh's Law and Motion Calendar will be heard in Courtroom 1 on the 5th Floor on this date. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (170) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK for Leigh Smith.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 170 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Leigh Smith ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7456260.) filed by Anthony Chiu. (Smith, Leigh) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 29, 2013 Filing 169 Declaration of Leslie Fithian in Support of #156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC,S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #156 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 168 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket No. 162) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 167 Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion CORRECTION OF DOCKET #162 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 166 Declaration of Leslie Fithian in Support of #151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits "M" through "T" to the Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 164 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-05-11, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2013. (las, ) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT REQUEST NOS. 1-3, 5-7, 21, 25 AND 27, AND PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF NON-PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #154 Stipulation. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 163 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket No. 149) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 162 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED, REFER TO #167 . *** Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion CORRECTION OF DOCKET #149 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/28/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2013 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Lodovico Marziale in Opposition to #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partially Redacted) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two - redacted, #3 Exhibit Three - redacted)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Scott A. Kamber in Opposition to #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partially Redacted) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three - redacted, #4 Exhibit Four - redacted, #5 Exhibit Five, #6 Supplement Six, #7 Exhibit Seven - redacted, #8 Exhibit Eight - redacted, #9 Exhibit Nine - redacted, #10 Exhibit Ten - redacted, #11 Exhibit Eleven - redacted, #12 Exhibit Twelve - redacted, #13 Exhibit Thirteen - redacted, #14 Exhibit Fourteen - redacted, #15 Exhibit Fifteen - redacted, #16 Exhibit Sixteen, #17 Exhibit Seventeen, #18 Exhibit Eighteen, #19 Exhibit Nineteen, #20 Exhibit Twenty, #21 Exhibit Twenty One, #22 Exhibit Twenty Two, #23 Exhibit Twenty Three, #24 Exhibit Twenty Four, #25 Exhibit Twenty Five, #26 Exhibit Twenty Six, #27 Exhibit Twenty Seven, #28 Exhibit Twenty Eight, #29 Exhibit Twenty Nine, #30 Exhibit Thirty)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Manuel Egele in Opposition to #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment dated December 17, 2012 (Redacted) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Related document(s) #130 ) (Kravitz, Deborah) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 158 DECLARATION of Manuel Egele in Opposition to #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration dated January 22, 2013) filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Related document(s) #130 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Karen Riebel in Opposition to #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC,S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re (152 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Cynthia O'Flaherty, granting (153 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Proposed Order filed by Cynthia O'Flaherty. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re: Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Document Request Nos. 1-3, 5-7, 21, 25 and 27, and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents filed by Apple, Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 153 Proposed Order re #152 Notice of Change of Counsel by Cynthia O'Flaherty. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE of Change of Counsel Cynthia O'Flaherty (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits "M" through "T" to the Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 150 MOTION to Compel Responses to Document Requests No. 1-3; 5-7; 21; 25; and 27 and Production of Unredacted Versions of Non-Privileged Documents filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 2/1/2013. Replies due by 2/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Karen H. Riebel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Proposed Order)(Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 149 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO [162}. *** Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #146 Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/17/2013) Modified text on 1/18/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/23/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/23/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2013 Filing 148 Declaration of Ronald Huang in Support of #146 Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/17/2013) Modified text on 1/18/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2013 Filing 147 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #146 Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/17/2013) Modified text on 1/18/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2013 Filing 146 OPPOSITION ( #127 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/17/2013) Modified text on 1/18/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2013 Filing 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie Fithian, #2 Declaration of Jacob Walker, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Opposition Brief, #5 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of E. Neuenschwander, #6 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of P. Shoemaker, #7 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Declaration of M. Buckley)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (140) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 143 OPPOSITION to ( #140 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Exceeding Page Limitation to Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Two Separate and Distinct Putative Classes ) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Apple's Motion for Leave to File Opposition Exceeding Page Limitation to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 1/8/2013) Modified text on 1/9/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT APPLE INC. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Matthew Glickman and Gail E. Lees (Glickman, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Opposition Exceeding Page Limitation to Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Two Separate and Distinct Putative Classes filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joshua A. Jessen, #2 Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (135) Motion Regarding Timing of Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment and Briefing Schedule in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 24, 2012 Filing 138 ERRATA re #127 MOTION to Certify Class by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Corrected Notice of Motion for Class Certification))(Parisi, David) (Filed on 12/24/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 137 Declaration of Leslie Fithian in Support of #126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Related document(s) #126 ) (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David E. Azar (Azar, David) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 135 Joint MOTION Joint Administrative Motion Regarding Timing of Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment and Briefing Schedule - NO HEARING REQUESTED filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2012. Replies due by 12/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 134 Declaration of Ronald Huang in Support of #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 133 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 132 Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Cc)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 131 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #130 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Summary of Forensic Analysis of Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Declaration of Phillip Shoemaker, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 129 Declaration of Deborah Kravitz in Support of #127 Motion to Certify Class filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 (Part 1 of 2), #10 Exhibit 9 (Part 2 of 2), #11 Exhibit 10 (Part 1 of 2), #12 Exhibit 10 (Part 2 of 2), #13 Exhibit 11 (Part 1 of 2), #14 Exhibit 11 (Part 2 of 2, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 linking entry to document #127 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 Filing 128 Declaration of Scott A. Kamber in Support of #127 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAlejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/17/2013. Replies due by 2/8/2013. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Kamber, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (119) Stipulation in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK and Striking Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 124 Declaration of Ronald Huang in Support of #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #120 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 123 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #120 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 122 Declaration of Jeffrey Bolas in Support of #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #120 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 121 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer in Support of #120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #120 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/28/2012. Replies due by 1/4/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Summary of Forensic Analysis, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Phillip Shoemaker in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #116 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: ENLARGING PAGE LIMITATION filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting in part and denying in part (97) Motion to Compel; denying (98) Motion for Protective Order in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 117 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/06/2012, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (115) Motion for Extension of Time for Class Expert Disclosures and Class Certification Briefing.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 8, 2012 Filing 115 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Enlarge Time for Class Expert Disclosures and Class Certification Briefing filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott A. Kamber, #2 Proposed Order)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified text on 11/9/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 Filing 114 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #97 MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30 filed by Daniel Rodimer and re #98 MOTION for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for the Deposition and Documents filed by Arun Gupta. The Court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Date Filed: 11/6/2012) (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 113 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Jury Trial Demanded] ANSWER to Amended Complaint byApple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (110) Stipulation in case 5:11-md-02250-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-md-02250-LHK, 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK, 5:11-cv-03416-LHK, 5:11-cv-04207-LHK, 5:11-cv-04542-LHK, 5:11-cv-04554-LHK, 5:11-cv-04555-LHK, 5:11-cv-04556-LHK, 5:11-cv-04557-LHK, 5:11-cv-04558-LHK, 5:11-cv-04559-LHK, 5:11-cv-04560-LHK, 5:12-cv-00162-LHK, 5:12-cv-00163-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 111 REPLY BRIEF in Support of ( #98 MOTION for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for the Deposition and Documents ) filed by Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro, Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2012 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Withdrawal of Edelson McGuire LLC from Plaintiffs' Executive Committee filed by Anthony Chiu, Alejandro Capiro, Isabella Capiro. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 109 REPLY in Support of ( #97 MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30 ) filed by Daniel Rodimer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KAREN H. RIEBEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT REQUESTS NOS. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 AND 30)(Audet, William) (Filed on 10/23/2012) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 108 Order (vacating hearing date of 11/15/12) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re #108 Order (vacating hearing date of 11/15/12) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re (103 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Response to Complaint filed by Anthony Chiu. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 Filing 107 Notice of Withdrawal of #76 Motion TO DISMISS (1) PLAINTIFFS GUPTA, FREEMAN, M. BURKE & W. BURKE, AND (2) CLAIMS OF PUTATIVE GEOLOCATION CLASS FROM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 linking entry to doc. #76 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 106 OPPOSITION to ( #98 MOTION for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for the Deposition and Documents ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified text on 10/10/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 105 OPPOSITION to ( #97 MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Jessen)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified text on 10/10/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2012 Filing 104 THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filed by Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified text on 10/8/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2012 Filing 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Apple's Response to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Anthony Chiu. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified text on 10/8/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE by Precious Arrington, Dustin Freeman, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Azita Moradmand) (Parisi, David) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES AND PLAINTIFF GUPTA'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #100 Stipulation. Apple's Oppositions Due: 10/9/2012. Plaintiffs' Replies Due: 10/23/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #98 MOTION for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for the Deposition and Documents, #97 MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re: Briefing Schedule For Plaintiffs' Motion For Order Compelling Responses And Plaintiff Gupta's Motion For Protective Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 21, 2012 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motions, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #98 MOTION for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for the Deposition and Documents, and #97 MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30: Motions continued to 11/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Gupta's Motion for Protective Order re: Supboenas Directed to Samy Kamkar for a Deposition and Documents filed by Arun Gupta. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/27/2012. Replies due by 10/4/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Declaration of Jay Edelson), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Reis, Sean) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified text on 9/14/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests Nos. 2-7, 13-15, 18, 21-25, 29 and 30; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Proposed Order filed by Daniel Rodimer. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/27/2012. Replies due by 10/4/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Document Requests)(Audet, William) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified text on 9/14/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #94 Motion for Admission of Attorney Julie A. Strother Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #93 Motion for Admission of Attorney Karen H. Riebel Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Julie A. Strother ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7098441.) filed by Daniel Rodimer. (Strother, Julie) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Karen H. Riebel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7098424.) filed by Daniel Rodimer. (Riebel, Karen) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Burwick, Heather Kimbrel (Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III (Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 27, 2012 Filing 90 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08-08-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh approving #87 Stipulated Protective Order.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 88 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/8/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/8/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #85 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Request of Peter E. Seidman To Appear By Telephone) filed by Anthony Chiu. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #82 Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #81 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-27-12 email from M. Cutler to Ms. Parker Brown)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #79 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 79 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 Filing 78 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Protective Orders filed by Anthony Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiffs' proposed protective order), #2 Exhibit B (Norther District form patent protective order), #3 Exhibit C (Defendant's proposed protective order))(Parisi, David) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #76 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/1/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs Gupta, Freeman, M. Burke, and W. Burke, and (2) Claims of Putative Geolocation Class from Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Ashlie Beringer, #2 Proposed Order)(Beringer, S.) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 3, 2012 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against Apple, Inc.. Filed byAnthony Chiu, Heather Kimbrel, William C Burke, III, Dustin Freeman, Marcia Burke. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Jessen For Defendant Apple Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Approving #70 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/25/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ashlie Beringer NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT APPLE INC. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by S. Ashlie Beringer NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; [PROPOSED] ORDER (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part #42 Motion to Dismiss; granting #43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS NEW YORK TIMES CO., GROUPON, INC., BACKFLIP STUDIOS, INC., THE WEATHER CHANNEL, WEBMD HEALTH SERVICES GROUP, INC., NPR, PANDORA MEDIA, INC., DICTIONARY.COM LLC, AND YELP!, INC. by Jonathan Lalo (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO GOGII, INC., OUTFIT7, LTD., ROOM CANDY, INC., SUNSTORM INTERACTIVE, INC., PINCH MEDIA, INC., QUATTRO WIRELESS, INC., MELLENIAL MEDIA, MOBCLIX, TRAFFICMARKETPLACE.COM, INC., AND IAC/INTERACTIVE CORP. by Jonathan Lalo (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/03/2012, before Judge Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2012. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 65 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/3/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/3/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 9/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/3/2012) re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Apple, Inc., #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AdMarval, Inc, Medialets, Inc., Flurry, Inc., Google, Inc., Admob, Inc.. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #61 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 62 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Mobile Industry Defendants' Statement of Recent Decision filed byFlurry, Inc.. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #58 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 59 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE filed by Flurry, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ashlie Beringer NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BARBARA A. IZZO FOR DEFENDANT FLURRY, INC. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01-11-12, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Mobile Industry Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc., Flurry, Inc., Google, Inc., Medialets, Inc.. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 54 REPLY (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc J. Zwillinger)(Zwillinger, Marc) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #52 Application for Admission of Attorney Jacob Sommer Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jacob A. Sommer ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6717376.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zwillinger, Marc) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 8, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byDolma Acevedo-Crespo, Natasha Acosta, Vikram Ajjampur, Jarret Ammer, Precious Arrington, Nicolette Boswell, Hillary Burke, Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III, Kevin Burwick, Anthony Chiu, Emili Clar, Jerod Couch, Barbara Davis, William Devito, Dustin Freeman, Matt Hines, Heather Kimbrel, Jonathan Lalo, Diego Lopez, Claus Meyer, William Moylan, Aaron Mulvey, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley, Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz, Daniel Rodimer, Anna M. Ruston, Eric Terrell, Gena Terry, Tommy Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Deborah Kravitz)(Parisi, David) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #49 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limits.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction STIPULATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION OF BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jonathan Lalo. (Audet, William) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Regarding Mediation by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #46 Stipulation Re: Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Opposition to Motions to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Their Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Proposed] Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (McCabe, James) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Zwillinger (Zwillinger, Marc) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
January 11, 2012 Filing 44 Minute Entry and Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 1/11/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc., Flurry, Inc., Google, Inc., Medialets, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/15/2012. Replies due by 3/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Beringer, Ashlie) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/15/2012. Replies due by 3/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCabe, James) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 41 MDL 2250 TRANSFER ORDER (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #37 Motion to Appear by Telephone (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 10, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Henry Page (Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dustin Freeman. (Wilson, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Joint Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of Briefing in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Apple, Inc.. (McCabe, James) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Joint Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of Briefing in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (McCabe, James) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 Denying Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/6/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) & PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING 1/11/12 CMC TO DATE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Flurry, Inc.. (Beringer, Ashlie) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re (30 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 30 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Apple, Inc.. (McCabe, James) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to AdMarvel, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Medialets, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 26 *** DOCUMENT POSTED IN ERROR *** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jonathan Lalo as to Medialets, Inc.. (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified text on 12/1/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2011 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #24 against AdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc., Apple, Inc., BackFlip Studios, Inc, Dictionary.Com, LLC, Flurry, Inc., GogII, Inc, Groupon, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp., Medialets, Inc., Mellenial Media, MobClix, NPR, New York Times Co., Outfit7 Ltd., Pandora Media, Inc., Pinch Media, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc., Room Candy, Inc, Sunstorm Interactive, Inc., The Weather Channel, TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc., Webmd Health Services Group, Inc., Yelp!, Inc.. Filed byJonathan Lalo. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 24 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #25 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT First Consolidated against AdMarval, Inc, Admob, Inc., Apple, Inc., BackFlip Studios, Inc, Dictionary.Com, LLC, Flurry, Inc., GogII, Inc, Groupon, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp., Medialets, Inc., Mellenial Media, MobClix, NPR, New York Times Co., Outfit7 Ltd., Pandora Media, Inc., Pinch Media, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc., Room Candy, Inc, Sunstorm Interactive, Inc., The Weather Channel, TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc., Webmd Health Services Group, Inc., Yelp!, Inc.. Filed byJonathan Lalo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Trial Demand)(Stampley, David) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 23 RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #20 Statement, ) [Opposition] filed byPrecious Arrington, Dustin Freeman, Cole Parr, Jared Parsley. (Parisi, David) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #20 Statement, filed by Dolma Acevedo-Crespo, Natasha Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Becnel, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 21 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/5/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 10/5/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 20 Statement of Application for Appointment to Plaintiff Steering Committee of Daniel E. Becnel, Jr., Becnel Law Firm, LLC by Dolma Acevedo-Crespo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV, #2 Exhibit Filed Suit, #3 Exhibit JPML Motion)(Becnel, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan M. Mansfield (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Becnel, Jr (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Becnel, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 17 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Apple, Inc.. (McCabe, James) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified text on 9/29/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2011 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Rivera-Diaz -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 3:11-cv-01433) from the District of Puerto Rico (OUR CASE NO. C11-04560) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (William Moylan -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 1:11-cv-03268) from the Northern District of Illinois (OUR CASE NO. C11-04559) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Nicolette Boswell -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 9:11-cv-80658) from the Southern District of Florida (OUR CASE NO. C11-04558) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Ajjampur, et al -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 8:11-cv-00895) from the Middle District of Florida (OUR CASE NO. C11-04557) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Burwick, et al -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 2:11-cv-03450) from the Central District of California (OUR CASE NO. C11-04556) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Burke, et al -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 2:11-cv-01855) from the Northern District of Alabama (OUR CASE NO. C11-04555). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Burke, et al -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 2:11-cv-01376) from the Northern District of Alabama (OUR CASE NO. C11-4554) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order, #5 Conditional Transfer Order, #8 Corder Granting Motions to Dismiss with Leave to Amend, by Jonathan Lalo (Audet, William) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/28/2011 linking entry to document #4, 5, 8 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/20/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Jarret Ammer -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 7:11-cv-02841) from the Southern District of New York (OUR CASE NO. C11-04542) (Attachments: #1 Order Regarding MDL Panel Conditional Transfer Order) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 5 MDL-2250 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding MDL Panel Conditional Transfer Order transferring tag-along actions to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/9/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 7 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 9/8/2011). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE to Counsel Regarding the Opening of MDL 2250. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case from the District of Puerto Rico (Acosta, et al v. Apple, Inc., et al, 3:11-cv-01326). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1 MDL-2250 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California is transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A. *** Reference must be made to individual docket sheets for entries relating only to individual actions *** (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 1 MDL-2250 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California is transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A. *** Reference must be made to individual docket sheets for entries relating only to individual actions *** (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: iPhone/iPad Application Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodimer
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Parr
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moylan
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Yarbrough
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Davis
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Burke
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia O'Flaherty
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Judy L. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Arrington
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarret Ammer
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Jerrold S. Parker,
Represented By: Fred Robert Rosenthal
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Capiro
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kimbrel
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Dominic Mauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Capiro
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arun Gupta
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: William Charles Gray
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz
Represented By: Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claus Meyer
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerod Couch
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Devito
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Leslie Normand
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Represented By: Richard Alan Proaps
Represented By: Corina MacCarin
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Burwick
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Dominic Mauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emili Clar
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolma Acevedo-Crespo
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chiu
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: Anne Marie Vu
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Sabrina S. Kim
Represented By: Peter E. Seidman
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mulvey
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Acosta
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Parsley
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lalo
Represented By: Deborah Kravitz
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Executive Committee Member
Represented By: David A. Stampley
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Freeman
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolette Boswell
Represented By: Brian William Smith
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Howard Weil Rubinstein
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Burke
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Lopez
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Burke, III
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Executive Committee
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Terrell
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Donald Chidi Amamgbo, Esq.
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Terry
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Hines
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arfat Adil
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M. Ruston
Represented By: Richard A. Lockridge,
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Michael Andrew McShane
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Jonas Palmer Mann
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikram Ajjampur
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Represented By: Julie A. Strother
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: S. Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Represented By: Molly Elizabeth Cutler
Represented By: Peter H Day
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Represented By: Marc J. Zwillinger
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Jessen
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Glickman
Represented By: James Francis McCabe
Represented By: Teresa Neet Burlison
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Represented By: Jacob Alan Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrafficMarketplace.com. Inc.
Represented By: Seth Alan Gold
Represented By: Rachel R. Davidson
Represented By: David Alan Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp!, Inc.
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MobClix
Represented By: Carter Winford Ott
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellenial Media
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Stisa Granick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medialets, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinch Media, Inc.
Represented By: S. Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Media, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GogII, Inc
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Represented By: Jonathan David Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outfit7 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BackFlip Studios, Inc
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/InterActiveCorp.
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Room Candy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dictionary.Com, LLC
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quattro Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Represented By: Teresa Neet Burlison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPR
Represented By: Mali Beck Friedman
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunstorm Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flurry, Inc.
Represented By: S. Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Gail E. Lees
Represented By: Barbara Ann Izzo
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webmd Health Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jiyoun Chung
Represented By: James Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdMarval, Inc
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence F. Pulgram
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admob, Inc.
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?