Freeza et al v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rachel Freeza and Mauro Rodriguez
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00237
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER 46 Enlarging Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/3/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Amending 43 Order on Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 37 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 38 Stipulation(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER 33 Enlarging Time. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/21/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 for Adjournment of Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/23/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER 19 Changing Time, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/23/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeza et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Freeza
Represented By: James M McCintick
Represented By: Joseph Jeremy Siprut
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Rodriguez
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Represented By: James M McCintick
Represented By: Joseph Jeremy Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?