Johnson v. Fritz et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: R.W. Fritz, A Hedgpeth, T. Selby, B. Martinez, P. Nickerson, B. Hedrick, G. Biaggini, Worrington, Park, G. Ramirez, W. Muniz, A. Meden and Card
Case Number: 5:2012cv00722
Filed: February 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. No motion for substitution has been filed bya successor or representative of Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Court must dismiss this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/11/2013. Replies due by 1/25/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ISSUING SUMMONS TO DEFENDANT DR. WORRINGTON; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK RE 52 MOTION requesting Marshal service of defendant Dr. Worrington filed by Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr . The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, a copy of the Court's Order of Service, (Docket Item No. 16) and a copy of this order upon Defendant Dr. Worrington at the address provided by the Litigation Coordinator. The Clerk of the Court shall also mail a courtesy copy of the complaint and a copy of this Order to the California Attorney General's Office. Additionally, the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order tp Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants R. W. Fritz, A. Hedgpeth, T. Selby, B. Martinez, P. Nickerson, B. Hedrick, G. Biaggini, Dr. Worrington, Ms. Park, A. Meden, W. Muniz, D r. Card and G. Ramirez at the Salinas Valley State Prison , (P.O. Box 1020, Soledad, CA 96960-1020). The Clerk of the Court shall also mail a courtesy copy of the complaint and a copy of this Order to the California Attorney General's Office. Additionally, the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Dispositive Motion due by 10/2/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2012. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. On April 2, 2012, in the interest of justice, the Court granted Plaintiff an extension of time to file a completed IFP application within thirty days of the date the order was filed. The deadline has since passed, and Plaintiff has neither paid the filing fee nor filed an IFP application. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/29/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Fritz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Selby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Biaggini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Meden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?