Sricom, Inc v. Ebislogic, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sricom, Inc
Defendant: Ebislogic, Inc, Asterix Consulting, Inc, Elite Technology Partners, LLC and VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00904
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 15, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 46 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 42 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/16/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sricom, Inc v. Ebislogic, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebislogic, Inc
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asterix Consulting, Inc
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Represented By: Jonathan Steven O'Donnell
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Technology Partners, LLC
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sricom, Inc
Represented By: Chung Shuen Poon
Represented By: Anna Kathryn Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?