Trustees of the HOD Carriers Local 166 South Bay Pension Fund et al v. LA Paz Stucco and Plastering, Inc
Plaintiff: Trustees of the HOD Carriers Local 166 South Bay Pension Fund, HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund and Hod Carriers Local Union 166
Defendant: LA Paz Stucco and Plastering, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00922
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by HOD Carriers Local Union 166, HOD Carriers Local 166 South Bay Pension Fund, HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund. Attorney Sue Campbell terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Vacating Judgment Debtor Exam. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/17/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/15/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs' Request for Continuance. Case management conference continued to 8/21/2012, 1:30 PM. Status report due by 8/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/25/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Plaintiffs' Request for Continuance. Matter continued to 6/26/2012, 1:30 PM for status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/24/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the HOD Carriers Local 166 South Bay Pension Fund et al v. LA Paz Stucco and Plastering, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the HOD Carriers Local 166 South Bay Pension Fund
Represented By: Sue Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOD Carriers Local 166 West Bay Consolidated Pension Fund
Represented By: Sue Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hod Carriers Local Union 166
Represented By: Sue Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Paz Stucco and Plastering, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?