Flores et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rick Flores and Tisha Flores
Defendant: Cummins Power Generation, Inc, Ford Motor Company, Thor Motor Coach, Inc and Airxcel, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01029
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re 81 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 18, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 76 Case Management Statement filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 1, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 62 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ; maintaining Case Management Conference scheduled for April 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 13, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 68 Stipulation, filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores, 69 Proposed Order filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/1/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/1/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 66 Proposed Order filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores, 65 Stipulation filed by Rick Flores, Tisha Flores. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/7/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 30 Stipulation selecting Mediation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 26 Stipulation [As Modified by Court](lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Power Generation, Inc
Represented By: J.. A. (Jay) Felton
Represented By: Jeffrey Harrison Grant
Represented By: Kevin M Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: H. Grant Law
Represented By: Bradley M Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc
Represented By: Peter Bruce Lightstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airxcel, Inc
Represented By: Peter Bruce Lightstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Flores
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Flores
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?