Roland v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Roland
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01061
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 65 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 15, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 63 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 61 STIPULATION Of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER: The parties shall file dismissals or a further status report on February 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/16/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 MOTION for Plaintiff's to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/29/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION selecting Mediation - To be completed by 9/10/2012. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roland v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Christa J. Jewsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Roland
Represented By: Edward O. Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?