Ortiz v. Bank of America Home Loan Retention Division
Plaintiff: Rafael Ortiz
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loan Retention Division and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01131
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting defendants' 43 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. The Court finds that further amendment would be futile and thus dismisses this action with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 33 Motion to Dismiss, and granting Plaintiff leave to file a second amended comlaint. If plaintiff wishes to file a second amended complaint, he shall do so no later than June 24, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Granting Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendants' request to appear telephonically at the March 19, 2013 hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 14, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and setting status conference for January 22, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 19, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2012 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2012. The November 13, 2012 Initial Case Management Conference is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on November 9, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference: The Initial Case Management Conference set for September 18, 2012 has been CONTINUED to November 13, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Bank of America Home Loan Retention Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loan Retention Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?