E.K.D. et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: C.M.D.
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Intervenor: T.A.B., A.D.Y., R.P.Y., H.E.W. and B.A.W.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01216
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Re: Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/26/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Antony Stuart (Stuart, Antony) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 101 ). Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by E.K.D. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 99 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 98 CLERKS NOTICE To All Counsel re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 4/3/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Filing of Facebook's Admin Motion in Fraley v. Facebook (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2 of 2)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 96 CLERKS NOTICE: Advising Counsel of Receipt of Action from the Southern District of Illinois. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 94 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:11-cv-00461. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 12, 2012 Filing 95 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Transfer Case brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for all further proceedings. The following motions pending in this case will be carried with the case for resolution in the transferee court: 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim brought by Facebook; 15 Motion for Judicial Notice brought by Facebook; 51 Motion to Certify Class brought by Plaintiffs E.K.D., by her next friend Melissa K. Dawes, and C.M.D., by his next friend Jennifer E. Deyong, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated; 90 Motion to Intervene brought by Plaintiffs; and 92 Motion for Protective Order brought by Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit the complete file in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and to close this Court's file in the case. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/8/2012. (jhs)
March 7, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Protective Order PROHIBITING EX PARTE INSPECTION OF USERS PRIVATE MESSAGES, WALL POSTS, COMMENTS AND MEDIA by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Zigler, Aaron)
March 6, 2012 Filing 91 Minute Entry for telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 3/6/2012. Appearing for Plaintiffs: Aaron Zigler; for Defendant: Matthew Brown, Jeffrey Gutkin, and Charles Swartwout. Defendant, pursuant to the current protective order, is ordered to produce six depositions (of plaintiffs and plaintiffs' parents) from the Fraley case no later than 3/15/2012. Defendant shall give notice of the instant order to the Fraley plaintiffs, who will have until 3/13/2012 to object to this order. The Court overruled Defendant's objection to producing a 30(b)(6) deponent as to Topic 2 of Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition. However, the scope of the deposition will be limited to the genesis of, and the decision-making process concerning, Facebook's practice of collecting information through a user's act of liking content as it relates to use of a user's name or profile pictures for any advertising generally, to include sponsored stories or social ads; including the people involved in the decisionmaking process and the facts, goals and policies considered in undertaking, continuing or modifying Facebook's practice of collecting information through a user's act of liking content. Also regarding the 30(b)(6) deposition notice, the Court sustained Defendant's objections (on grounds of overbreadth) to Topic 4 and Topic 5. The parties informed the Court that they agree to various other issues, and will inform the Court as to remaining disputes in advance of the discovery dispute conference set for 3/16/2012. (Court Reporter Barb Kniepmann.) (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION to Intervene by A.D.Y., B.A.W., H.E.W., R.P.Y., T.A.B.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decl. of P. Isaak, # 2 Exhibit Decl. of R. Young, # 3 Exhibit Decl. of J. Lemons)(Zigler, Aaron)
March 2, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 88 Motion to Intervene filed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. Per Atty, Motion was filed incorrectly. Doc. 88 is stricken from the docket, and a correct Motion to Intervene will be filed shortly. (cekf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2012 Filing 88 STRICKEN - MOTION to Intervene by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decl. of P. Isaak, # 2 Exhibit Decl. of R. Young, # 3 Exhibit Decl. of J. Lemons)(Zigler, Aaron) Modified on 3/2/2012 (cekf).
February 24, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Hearings: Per Doc. 86, two telephonic discovery dispute hearings are set before Magistrate Judge Williams in this case: (1) for 3/6/2012 at 10:30 AM; (2) for 3/16/2012 at 03:00 PM. To place the conference calls: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2012 Filing 86 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: held on 2/24/2012. Appearing for Plaintiffs: Garry Stevens and Aaron Zigler; for Defendant: Matthew Brown, Jeffrey Gutkin, and Charles Swartwout. The Court, after hearing the contours of several remaining discovery disputes, orders the following: (1) By agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs to disclose the full names, user i.d.'s, and email information of the minor plaintiffs by Monday, 2/27/2012; Facebook shall not access the users' private messages or wall posts absent further order from the Court. (2) Regarding the issues of information/data ownership and the application of the Stored Communications Act, the Court will set a telephonic hearing for 3/16/2012 at 3:00 p.m. and the parties will brief the Court as follows: Plaintiffs' 10-page brief due on or before 3/6/2012; Defendant's 10-page response due on or before 3/13/2012. (3) Regarding the issues of discovery in the Fraley case and 30(b)(6) discovery, the Court does not require briefing, and will set a telephonic hearing for 3/6/2012 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter n/a.) (jls, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a scheduling conflict with a criminal matter, the Telephonic Status Conference originally set for 2/24/2012 at 9:00 a.m. is RESET for 01:30 PM. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 82 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Garry T. Stevens, Jr. (cekf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 15, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE. The Court has been informed of a discovery dispute in the case. Because the Court has a compressed amount of time for next week's status conference, hearing argument on that dispute at that time is implausible. So at the 2/24 status conference, the parties should be prepared to succinctly discuss the contours of the dispute and an accelerated briefing schedule for a lengthier discovery dispute hearing. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyGarry T. Stevens, Jr by on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Stevens, Garry)
February 10, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 80 Notice of Appearance filed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. See attached document for specifics (jaj)
February 9, 2012 Filing 80 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Garry T. Stevens, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stevens, Garry) Modified on 2/10/2012 (jaj).
January 17, 2012 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
January 10, 2012 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decl. of DeYong, # 2 Exhibit Decl. of Dawes, # 3 Exhibit Decl. of Wallace, # 4 Exhibit Am. Resp to Plts RFP, # 5 Exhibit Corr. from Brown)(Zigler, Aaron)
January 10, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. See attached document for specifics. (slj)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Lee Squitieri (slj) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 9, 2012 Filing 75 ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Garry T. Stevens by AttorneyLee Squitieri $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1594938 by on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Squitieri, Lee) Modified on 1/10/2012 (slj).
January 9, 2012 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyLee Squitieri $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1594923 by on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Squitieri, Lee)
January 3, 2012 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion for a fourteen-day extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is now due on or before 1/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/19/2011. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 19, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 57 MOTION to Transfer Case. Plaintiff's response due by 1/10/2011. (lmt)
December 16, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 57 MOTION to Transfer Case by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Zigler, Aaron)
December 15, 2011 Filing 70 Sealed Memorandum in Support re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Unredacted Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki))(Brown, Matthew)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). Facebook seeks leave to file under seal unredacted versions of two documents that Facebook already has filed in redacted form, specifically, the memorandum of points and authorities brought by Facebook in support of its motion to transfer this case (Doc. 62 ), and the affidavit in support of transfer given by Sandeep N. Solanki, Facebook's litigation counsel (Doc. 63 ). The Court finding that there is good cause within the meaning of Rule 26(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to seal the documents at issue, it is hereby ORDERED that Facebook shall file unredacted versions of the documents under seal not later than five (5) days from the date of entry of this Order. The attorneys for the parties to this case are admonished that they cannot file documents under seal without prior leave of Court. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 12/15/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Transfer of Venue [(Dkt. 57)] by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Good cause having been shown, and because Plaintiffs are still represented by counsel, attorneys Ian J. Barlow and Mark J. Tamblyn are hereby terminated from the case.Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/12/2011. (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark J. Tamblyn and Ian J. Barlow by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Tamblyn, Mark)
December 9, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Wallace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wallace, Edward)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: On December 8, 2011, Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"), filed under seal a memorandum of points and authorities in support of a motion for transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California together with various evidentiary submissions in support of the said motion. See Doc. 58; Doc. 59. Consistent with the law of the Seventh Circuit, the Court ordered the sealed documents to be unsealed by the Clerk of Court until such time as Facebook demonstrated good cause to seal the documents. See Doc. 61. Facebook now has filed redacted versions of the documents that it formerly filed under seal. See Doc. 62; Doc. 63. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to strike in their entirety both Document 58 and Document 59 from the electronic docket of this case. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 12/8/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 8, 2011 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case (Redacted) Declaration of Sandeep N. Solanki in Support of Motion to Transfer) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Brown, Matthew)
December 8, 2011 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case (Redacted) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER unsealing 58 Sealed Document and 59 Sealed Document filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). In general, the law of the Seventh Circuit contemplates that judicial proceedings will take place in public. See Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 568 (7th Cir. 2000) ("People who want secrecy should opt for arbitration. When they call on the courts, they must accept the openness that goes with subsidized dispute resolution by public (and publicly accountable) officials."). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Document 58 and Document 59 on the docket of this case. If Facebook's attorneys believe there is good cause to seal the documents at issue, they should file an appropriate motion under Rule 26(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 12/8/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 8, 2011 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case (Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Motion to Transfer) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Brown, Matthew)
December 8, 2011 Filing 59 ENTRY STRICKEN and pdf document deleted per order of chambers -Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Brown, Matthew) Modified to unseal per Order at Doc. 61 on 12/8/2011 (lmm). Modified on 12/9/2011 (drb).
December 8, 2011 Filing 58 ENTRY STRICKEN and pdf document deleted per order of chambers - Memorandum in Support re 57 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) Modified to unseal document per Order at Doc. 61 on 12/8/2011 (lmm). Modified on 12/9/2011 (drb).
December 8, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Transfer Case by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/5/11. (amv)
December 5, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference to discuss mediation set for 2/24/2012 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 5, 2011 Filing 54 Minute Entry for Telephonic Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/5/2011. Appearing for the Plaintiffs: Aaron Zigler and Steve Katz; for Defendant: Matthew Brown. The Court ruled on the sole remaining disagreement re: the Proposed Protective Order. The parties will reconvene on 2/24/2012 for a (separately noticed) Telephonic Status Conference to discuss mediation. (Court Reporter LB.) (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Conference set for 12/5/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2011 Filing 52 Minute Entry for telephonic conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/30/2011. Appearing for Plaintiffs: Aaron Zigler; for Defendant: Matthew Brown and Michael Hermann. The Court discussed with the parties the proposed protective order. Parties will reconvene on Monday, 12/5/2011 at 10:00 a.m. and should be prepared to discuss the scheduling of mediation at that time. (Court Reporter LB.) (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 29, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION to Certify Class by C.M.D., E.K.D.. Responses due by 1/3/2012 (Zigler, Aaron)
November 24, 2011 Filing 50 Transcript of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/22/2011, before Judge Stephen C. Williams. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. <P> NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. This policy is located on our website at www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms/CMECFTranscriptPolicy.pdf.</P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2012. (mnc)
November 22, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2011 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; then when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 22, 2011 Filing 48 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/22/2011. Aaron Zigler for Plaintiffs. Matthew Brown and Charles Swartwout for Defendant. The Court discussed with the parties the Proposed Protective Order and made partial rulings on the same. The next Status Conference will be set by separate notice for 11/29/2011 at 4:00 p.m.. (Court Reporter MC) (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). Briefing on Facebook's motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement (Doc. 12 ) is now closed. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 10/30/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Facebook's Motion for More Definite Statement or Dismissal by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/4/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv)
October 21, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Telephonic Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 11/21/2011 at 03:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. To place the conference call: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467.(jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 21, 2011 Filing 43 Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 10/21/2011 before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Appearing via telephone: Aaron Zigler and Ian Barlow for the plaintiffs and Matthew Brown and Charles Swartwout for the defendants. The Court resolves disputes re: discovery and motion scheduling, and number of interrogatories and depositions. Reset by separate Notice for telephonic conference on November 21, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. for status of discovery and potential scheduling of mediation. (Court Reporter n/a) (jls)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). Briefing on Facebook's motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement (Doc. 12 ) is now closed. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 10/12/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 12, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF FACEBOOKS MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OR DISMISSAL by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Stay brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. ("Facebook"). As it appears from the record that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") has declined to transfer this litigation to another judicial district for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, see Doc. 33, Facebook's request for a stay of these proceedings pending transfer of this case by the JPML is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 10/12/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 12, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. Barlow on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barlow, Ian)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting re 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs by Attorney Ian J. Barlow $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1523842 filed by E.K.D., C.M.D. (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 10, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs by AttorneyIan J. Barlow $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1523842 by on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Barlow, Ian)
October 7, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Tamblyn on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D. (Tamblyn, Mark)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn on behalf of C.M.D. and E.K.D. (slj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (dmw)
October 6, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by C.M.D., E.K.D. re 27 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By MDL Panel on Motion To Transfer of Ruling by the JPML (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In re: Facebook Use of Name and Likeness Litigation, MDL No. 2288 Order denying transfer)(Zigler, Aaron)
October 6, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs by AttorneyMark J. Tamblyn $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1522305 by on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Tamblyn, Mark)
October 5, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By MDL Panel on Motion To Transfer filed by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pl. E.K.D.s Resp. in Oppn. to Facebooks Mot. for Trans. & Coord. or Consol. under 28 U.S.C. § 1407)(Zigler, Aaron)
September 23, 2011 Reset Hearings: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference reset for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. If not previously submitted, the parties shall submit their joint report on before 10/14/11. The previous date on 9/30/11 is canceled. (amv)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Stay Proceedings brought by Defendant Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 9/21/2011. (jhs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION Motion To Shorten Time For Plaintiffs To Respond To Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By MDL Panel On Motion To Transfer re 27 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By MDL Panel on Motion To Transfer by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
September 21, 2011 Filing 28 EXHIBIT by Facebook, Inc.. Exhibit to 27 Motion to Stay Declaration of Matthew D. Brown In Support Of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By Mdl Panel On Motion To Transfer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Brown Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Brown Declaration)(Brown, Matthew)
September 21, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By MDL Panel on Motion To Transfer by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
September 14, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 9/30/2011 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
September 13, 2011 Filing 25 CJRA TRACK D assigned: Bench Trial SET for presumptive trial month of 5/2013 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge G. Patrick Murphy. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 9/13/2011. (lmm)
September 6, 2011 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Zigler, Aaron)
September 6, 2011 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for Judicial Notice filed by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Zigler, Aaron)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 15 MOTION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for Judicial Notice, 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 8/18/2011. (ktc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for Judicial Notice by C.M.D., E.K.D.. (Zigler, Aaron)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G. Rhodes filed by Facebook, Inc. (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyMichael G. Rhodes by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael)
August 1, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Gutkin on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2011 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Facebook, Inc..(Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Brown on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion for Judicial Notice by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 14 EXHIBIT by Facebook, Inc.. Exhibit to 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Matthew D. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 9/6/2011 (Brown, Matthew)
August 1, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Hermann on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Hermann, Michael)
August 1, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Swartwout on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Swartwout, Charles)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting re 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Brown $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1468957 filed by Facebook, Inc., and 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey M. Gutkin $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1468958 filed by Facebook, Inc. (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 28, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyJeffrey M. Gutkin $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1468958 by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyMatthew D Brown $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1468957 by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew)
June 21, 2011 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2011, answer due 8/1/2011. (Zigler, Aaron)
June 21, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 4 Waiver of Service Executed filed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. Date of service is listed incorrectly. Clerk will strike entry and filer will re-file document inserting correct service date. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 21, 2011 Filing 4 ENTRY STRICKEN - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2011, answer due 8/19/2011. (Zigler, Aaron) Modified on 6/21/2011 (drb).
June 1, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Katz on behalf of C.M.D., E.K.D. (Katz, Steven)
June 1, 2011 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1422848.), filed by E.K.D., C.M.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zigler, Aaron)
June 1, 2011 Filing 1 Case Opened. Filing Fee Due. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 11-cv-461-GPM-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge)(drb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.K.D. et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.D.
Represented By: Steven A. Katz
Represented By: Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Garry T. Stevens, Jr.
Represented By: Antony Stuart
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Brown
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gutkin
Represented By: Michael C. Hermann
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: T.A.B.
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: A.D.Y.
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: R.P.Y.
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: H.E.W.
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: B.A.W.
Represented By: John Torjesen
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?