Mena et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mauricio Mena and Alma Mena
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01257
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 21, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE SCHEDULE re 38 Notice (Other) filed by Mauricio Mena, Alma Mena. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 31, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 6/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Joint proposed schedule to be submitted no later than 5/28/2013. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/17/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS SLANDER OF TITLE CLAIM by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 28 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mena et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Mena
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Mena
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?