In re Google, Inc. Privacy Policy Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert B. De Mars and Lorena Barrios
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01382
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2015 152 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 151 Bill of Costs (Withdrawal of Bill of Costs) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
July 29, 2015 151 BILL OF COSTS by Google, Inc.. Objections due by 8/12/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A to Page Declaration)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 15, 2015 150 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 15, 2015 re 149 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 149 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 105 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 148 RESPONSE (re 138 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Certificate of Service ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A to Page Declaration)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 147 RESPONSE (re 138 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Certificate of Service ) filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 7, 2015 146 REPLY (re 131 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Fernando Torres ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 7, 2015 145 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JULY 21, 2015 MOTION HEARING, resetting 120 MOTION to Certify Class, 131 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Fernando Torres and 138 MOTION to Intervene: 7/21/2015 Motion Hearing is reset to 8/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 7, 2015 *** CLERK'S ERROR *** please ignore (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 144 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 140 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2015 143 OPPOSITION (re 140 MOTION to Shorten Time with Certificate of Service ) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Page Declaration)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2015 142 RESPONSE (re 137 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 6, 2015 141 RESPONSE (re 137 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 1, 2015 140 MOTION to Shorten Time 138 Motion to Intervene with Certificate of Service filed by Alice Svenson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank Jablonski in Support of Motion to Shorten Time, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sopko, Dominique) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 139 Declaration of Frank Jablonski in Support of 138 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Certificate of Service filed byAlice Svenson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Exhibit A to Complaint in Intervention, # 3 Exhibit B to Complaint in Intervention, # 4 Exhibit C to Complaint in Intervention, # 5 Exhibit D to Complaint in Intervention, # 6 Exhibit B - Motion to Stay, # 7 Exhibit C - Litigation Timeline, # 8 Exhibit D - Svenson Case Management Schedule, # 9 Exhibit E - GPP Case Management Schedule)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Sopko, Dominique) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
July 1, 2015 138 MOTION to Intervene Svenson is the named plaintiff in Svenson v. Google, Inc., Case No. 5:13-cv-04080-BLF, a putative class action pending before Judge Freeman in this judicial District. related document 137 Motion to relate to Judge Freemanand Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support with Certificate of Service filed by Alice Svenson. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/15/2015. Replies due by 7/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sopko, Dominique) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 137 MOTION to Relate Case to Judge Freeman filed by [proposed] Intervene plaintiff Alice Svenson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank Jablonski in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related to Judge Freeman. , # 2 Proposed Order to be related In re Google Privacy Policy Litigation, No. 5:12-cv-01382-PSG to the docket of Judge Beth Labson Freeman in this judicial District. )(Sopko, Dominique) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 136 RESPONSE to re 133 Objection by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 135 RESPONSE (re 131 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Fernando Torres ) filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 25, 2015 134 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-28-15, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 132 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2015. (Related documents(s) 132 ) (las, ) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 133 OBJECTIONS to re 130 Reply to Opposition/Response, / Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections To Reply Evidence (LR 7-3(D)(1)) and Motion to Strike by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 17, 2015 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 16, 2015 131 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Fernando Torres filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/30/2015. Replies due by 7/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 130 REPLY (re 120 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 15, 2015 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 128 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 128 EXHIBITS re 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Declaration of Michael H. Page in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Ex. A to Page Decl. (Ex. M to Sabella Decl.), # 2 Unredacted Ex. A to Page Decl. (Ex. M to Sabella Decl.), # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 11, 2015 127 Featured Case ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting in part and denying in part 119 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 3, 2015 126 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 2, 2015 125 RESPONSE (re 120 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Page Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Page Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Page Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Page Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Page Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Page Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Page Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Page Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Page Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Page Decl.)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 15, 2015 124 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 123 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 121 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, 120 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 122 Declaration of Michael H. Page in Support of 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 12, 2015 121 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JUNE 9, 2015 MOTION HEARING, resetting 120 MOTION to Certify Class. 6/9/2015 Motion Hearing is reset to 6/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 12, 2015 120 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/26/2015. Replies due by 6/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella- Redacted, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 12, 2015 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle McGee, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of James J. Sabella - Redacted, # 4 Declaration of James J. Sabella- Unredacted Part 1, # 5 Declaration of James J. Sabella- Unredacted Part 2, # 6 Declaration of James J. Sabella - Unredacted Part 3)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 28, 2015 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2015 re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment: The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge (Time in Court: 10:42 to 11:25). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Kyle McGee. Also present (telephonically): Neal Deckant. Defendant Attorney present: Michael Page. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 117 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO ATTEND APRIL 28, 2015 HEARING TELEPHONICALLY, granting 116 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/28/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 116 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 10, 2015 115 REPLY (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A to Page Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Page Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Page Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Page Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Page Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Page Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Page Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Page Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Page Decl., # 11 Exhibit J to Page Decl., # 12 Exhibit K to Page Decl., # 13 Exhibit L to Page Decl., # 14 Exhibit M to Page Decl., # 15 Exhibit N to Page Decl.)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 114 DECLARATION of James J. Sabella in Opposition to 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byRobert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Scott McCullough. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 113 RESPONSE (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byRobert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Scott McCullough. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 112 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 108 by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 10, 2015. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 111 Declaration of Michael H. Page in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal (Civil L.R. 79-5(e)) [Dkt. No. 108] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 9, 2015 110 Featured Case ***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE ECF NO. 112 *** ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 108 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015) Modified on 4/10/2015 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2015 109 RESPONSE (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byRobert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Scott McCullough. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 3, 2015 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Scott McCullough. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle McGee, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration of James J. Sabella- Redacted, # 6 Declaration of James J. Sabella - Unredacted Version)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 20, 2015 107 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 106 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Michael Goldberg, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 13, 2015 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/27/2015. Replies due by 4/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 2 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Page Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Page Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Page Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Page Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Page Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Page Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Page Declaration, # 10 Declaration of Ficus Kirkpatrick, # 11 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 12, 2015 104 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/10/2015, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2015. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 103 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint against Google, Inc.. Filed byLorena Barrios, Matthew Villani, Nicholas Anderson, Robert B. De Mars, Scott McCullough, Pedro Marti, David Nisenbaum, Michael Goldberg. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google, Inc. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2015 re 97 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint. The court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Rule 12 Motion or Answer to be filed within 30 days. Broader discovery will not be authorized as a result of the filing of a new complaint other than to permit Google to take appropriate discovery of Mr. Goldberg including a deposition. Current case schedule to remain in place. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney present: Kyle McGee. Defendant Attorney present: Michael Page. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 100 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, Mark LeHocky; Mediation session held 2/5/2015; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
January 27, 2015 99 REPLY (re 97 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane Zilka)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 20, 2015 98 RESPONSE (re 97 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ficus Kirkpatrick, # 2 Declaration of Michael H. Page, # 3 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Page Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Page Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Page Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Page Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Page Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Page Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Page Declaration, # 11 Exhibit I to Page Declaration, # 12 Exhibit J to Page Declaration)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 6, 2015 Setting Hearing as to 97 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 6, 2015 97 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James J. Sabella, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 22, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing reset to 2/5/2015 09:00 AM at Durie Tangri offices locate at 217 Leidesdorff Street, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
October 9, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 1/22/2015 at 09:00 AM at Durie Tangri offices locate at 217 Leidesdorff Street, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 2, 2014 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 10/9/2014 at 8:30 AM Pacific Time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 25, 2014 96 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order for the Treatment of Confidential Information by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Sabella, James) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 18, 2014 95 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 94 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 94 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Zilka, Diane) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 93 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON NOVEMBER 16, 2015 JURY TRIAL: 11/16/2015 10:00 AM Jury Trial is advanced to 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 12, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 92 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 92 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 12, 2014 re 88 and 91 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 91 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/12/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Parties agree that case not related to CV13-04080 BLF Alice Svenson v. Google Inc., et al. Cases not related. Parties to meet & confer as to Rule 11, 12 & 56 Motions & ADR. Court to issue scheduling order. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:04 to 10:26) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2014)
September 8, 2014 90 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 9/12/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 89 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Potentially Related Cases (L.R. 3-13) and Suggestion That Those Cases Not Be Related (Page, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 28, 2014 88 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Sabella, James) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 27, 2014 87 Answer to Amended Complaint 68 Amended Complaint, (Defendant Google Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint) byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
July 29, 2014 86 STIPULATION re 68 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 21, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 71 Motion to Dismiss; granting 77 Motion to Strike (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 17, 2014 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google, Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 13, 2014 83 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/15/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
May 14, 2014 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (McGee, Kyle) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
April 15, 2014 81 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint and 77 MOTION to Strike. The court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Yeremey O. Krivoshey (Krivoshey, Yeremey) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 79 RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION to Strike 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint [Declaration of Silas Reyes] ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 78 REPLY (re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
March 28, 2014 77 MOTION to Strike 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint [Declaration of Silas Reyes] filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/11/2014. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 76 RESPONSE to re 72 Request for Judicial Notice, by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 75 Request for Judicial Notice re 74 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 74 RESPONSE (re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle J. McGee)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
February 24, 2014 73 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 72 Request for Judicial Notice re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 71 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 3/28/2014. Replies due by 4/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Silas Reyes in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amened Class Action Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amened Class Action Complaint)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
January 24, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 69 Stipulation.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 21, 2014 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 68 Amended Complaint, (Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Second Amended Complaint) filed by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 16, 2014 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Google, Inc.. Filed byLorena Barrios, Matthew Villani, Nicholas Anderson, Robert B. De Mars, Scott McCullough, Pedro Marti, David Nisenbaum. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 3, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 53 Motion to Dismiss.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
October 3, 2013 66 OBJECTIONS to re 65 Notice (Other), re Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 3, 2013 65 NOTICE by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kurtz, Orin) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
August 27, 2013 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kurtz, Orin) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 21, 2013 63 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/13/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2013. (Related documents(s) 62 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 62 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google, Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 13, 2013 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Annick Marie Persinger (Persinger, Annick) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 60 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint: Ms. Persinger to submit notice of appearance. The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2013)
August 6, 2013 59 REPLY (re 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 9, 2013 58 Response to Defendant's 54 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013,(incorrect event selected) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 57 Opposition to Defendant's 53 Motion to Dismiss filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 26, 2013 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Orin Kurtz) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7802413.) filed by Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, Matthew Villani. (Kurtz, Orin) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
May 14, 2013 54 Request for Judicial Notice re 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 53 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 14, 2013 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/28/2013. Replies due by 6/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
March 15, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 52 Order on Stipulation: Motion to Dismiss (In Re: Docket No. 52 ) set for 8/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 51 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 7, 2013 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byLorena Barrios, Matthew Villani, Nicholas Anderson, Robert B. De Mars, Scott McCullough, Pedro Marti, David Nisenbaum. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 27, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 48 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 27, 2013 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
January 11, 2013 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 46 Stipulation. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to File Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 28, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 29 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
October 18, 2012 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/09/2012, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 17, 2012 43 OBJECTIONS to re 42 Notice (Other), by Google, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 42 NOTICE by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 9, 2012 41 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 29 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc: The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Date Filed: 10/9/2012) (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2012)
September 28, 2012 40 REPLY (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 17, 2012 39 Request for Judicial Notice re 30 Request for Judicial Notice, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 38 Request for Judicial Notice re 37 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 37 RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byNicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 36 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 14, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 7, 2012 35 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mark LeHocky as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 20, 2012 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 33 Stipulation selecting Mediation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 14, 2012 33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 7, 2012 31 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 8/7/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Deadline for opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss continued to 9/17/2012. Reply due by 9/28/2012. 9/11/2012 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (In Re: Docket No. 29 ) continued to 10/9/12 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case schedule deferred and case stayed pending resolution of motion to dismiss. (Date Filed: 8/7/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (2:24 to 2:40.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2012)
August 6, 2012 30 Request for Judicial Notice re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 29 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/20/2012. Replies due by 8/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 30, 2012 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Allison C. Weiss by Allison C. Weiss (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 12, 2012 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 7/17/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 7/17/2012 Case Management Conference reset to 8/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 10, 2012 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Text modified on 7/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES J. SABELLA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KYLE J. MCGEE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DIANE ZILKA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES S. NOTIS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KELLY A. NOTO PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 2, 2012 20 Application for Admission of Attorney James J. Sabella for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6937140) filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed ) Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 19 Application for Admission of Attorney Kyle J. McGree for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6937082.) filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 18 Application for Admission of Attorney Diane Zilka for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6937000.) filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/2/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 17 Application for Admission of Attorney James S. Notis for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6936921) filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/2/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 16 Application for Admission of Attorney Kelly A. Noto for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6936768.) filed by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/2/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 15 Certification of Interested Entities by Nicholas Anderson, Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Pedro Marti, Scott McCullough, David Nisenbaum, Matthew Villani, Allison C. Weiss (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 6/20/2012) Modified on 6/21/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 14 Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Damages, Equitable and Injunctive Relief against Google, Inc. Filed byLorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars, Nicholas Anderson, David Nisenbaum, Pedro Marti, Matthew Villani, Scott McCullough, Allison C. Weiss. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Text modified on 6/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2012 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2012. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 13, 2012 12 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2012 11 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 4/12/2012). (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars (Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/12/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2012 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 4/12/2012 STATUS CONFERENCE: 4/12/2012 11:00 AM Status Conference reset to 09:30 AM (Special Set) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for a telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING CONSOLIDATION: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/12/2012 at 11:00 AM (Special Set) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 9, 2012 7 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL, AND EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 5 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Case CV12-01565 WHA Consolidated with CV12-01382 PSG. Lead Case: CV12-01382 PSG (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified on 4/11/2012 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2012 6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Text modified on 4/11/2012 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2012 5 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Consolidating Cases, Appointing Interim Lead Counsel, and Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/11/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 4 Proof of Service of Summons as to defendant Google, Inc served on 3/22/2012 by Lorena Barrios, Robert B. De Mars (Bakst, Martin) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2012 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611011538). Filed byRobert B. De Mars, Lorena Barrios. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Google, Inc. Privacy Policy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. De Mars
Represented By: Martin Stuart Bakst
Represented By: Mark C. Gardy
Represented By: James S. Notis
Represented By: James J. Sabella
Represented By: Jennifer Sarnelli
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Barrios
Represented By: Martin Stuart Bakst
Represented By: Mark C. Gardy
Represented By: James S. Notis
Represented By: James J. Sabella
Represented By: Jennifer Sarnelli
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?