Metcalfe v. State of California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Metcalfe
Defendant: G. Lewis, R. Grounds, State of California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Hedgpeth, M. Evans, G. Neotti and A. Nolls
Case Number: 5:2012cv01445
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 31, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 26, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 28, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SECOND ORDER REGARDING FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 19, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SOLICITING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 15, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 25, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DECLINING TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CASE AND VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 22, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 4, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/5/2012 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/27/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalfe v. State of California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Nolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Metcalfe
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?