Xenoport, Inc. v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Xenoport, Inc.
Defendant: Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC and GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01544
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order Granting 120 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Action. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/14/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2012. All other pretrial deadlines, motions and hearing dates are vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, the above-entitled action is referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for a settlement conference to occur no later than 10/31/2012. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Speros chambers to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/20/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 100 Proposed Order filed by Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 31, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 90 Motion for Protective Order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS MODIFIED) RE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS GLAXO GROUP LIMITED, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC AMD GLAXOSMITHKLINE HOLDINGS (AMERICAS) INC.'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 26, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on May 2, 2012. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila granting in part and denying in part 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER STAYING MOTION BRIEFING. In light of the four related motions to seal currently pending before the court 17 , 28 , 31 , 32 further briefing on both Defendants Motion to dismiss and transfer venue and Plaintiffs Motion to remand is STAYED. The court will provide further deadlines in the order addressing the motions to seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xenoport, Inc. v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xenoport, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Chingyun Pai
Represented By: Harold J. McElhinny
Represented By: Mark W. Danis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxo Group Limited
Represented By: Scott D Baker
Represented By: Raymond Cardoza
Represented By: Michelle Lyu Cheng
Represented By: Lorenzo Emilio Gasparetti
Represented By: Michelle Haejin Lyu
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Cardoza
Represented By: Michelle Lyu Cheng
Represented By: Lorenzo Emilio Gasparetti
Represented By: Michelle Haejin Lyu
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas), Inc
Represented By: Scott D Baker
Represented By: Raymond Cardoza
Represented By: Michelle Lyu Cheng
Represented By: Lorenzo Emilio Gasparetti
Represented By: Michelle Haejin Lyu
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?