Williams v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Defendant: R. Perez, C. Ramos, J. Juarez and P. Roque
Case Number: 5:2012cv01691
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST for Staff Counsel Mike Davis to appear by telephone at Settlement Conference set for 12/21/2015. 127 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/15/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM re 125 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/10/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND REOPENING CASE re 103 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Referring Case to Pro Se Settlement Program and STAYING CASE and re 115 Order Appointing Counsel. The Clerk is directed to re-open the case. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/30/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Permission to Appear Telephonically at 10/30/2015 Case Management Conference re 119 Declaration of Trace Maiorino in Support of Request for Permission for Telephonic Appearance with Proposed Order filed by Canchola, J. Juarez, R. Perez. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/28/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/16/15. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 4/23/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/14/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying Without Prejudice 70 Motion to Cross-Examine Dendants' Witnesses; Denying 71 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 100 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply; Denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Sur-Reply; REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE SETTLEMENT PROGRAM. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's Reply Filed 10/14/2014 96 is Deemed Timely. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Denying 63 Motion for an Order to Use DOJ to Assist Plaintiff in Investigating the Name Defendants; Denying 66 Motion to Compel Discovery; Granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 49 Motion to Dismiss; Further Briefing Schedule. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 59 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF SERVICE; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Dispositive Motion due by 4/22/2013. Habeas Answer due by 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 32 Motion for 60 Day Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS. Motions terminated: 25 MOTION for Discovery Deposition and Interrogatories to Witness Magdy Danial filed by James Edward Williams, 19 MOTION Summons Demand filed by James Edward Williams, 7 MOTION to Am end/Correct filed by James Edward Williams, 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion filed by R. Perez, 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by James Edward Williams, 29 MOTION for Discovery Deposition and Interrogators to Captain Klinkini filed by James Edward Williams. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Roque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?