St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Tessera, Inc.
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Tessera, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv01827
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 74 -3 St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 78 Tessera, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. PUBLIC UNREDACTED VERSION of 90 . (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 74 -3 St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 78 Tessera, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 52 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 29 St.Paul's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 30 Tessera's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 32 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER 15 Selecting ADR Process, Case Referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/8/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY, re 19 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/11/2012.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Tessera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Matthew Clark Lovell
Represented By: Dean J. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?