M. v. City of King City et al
Plaintiff: Adela M., Martin M. and J. M.
Defendant: Nick Baldviez, Tirado, Does VII-L, Yanez, Jerry Hunter, Bruce Miller, Mark Baker, City of King City, Jorge Luna, Does 1-50 and King City Police Department
Case Number: 5:2012cv01951
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPROVING GUARDIAN AD LITEM'S PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 41 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 42 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Stipulation; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend; striking 26 Amendment to Amended Complaint. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Sealing 11 Second Amended Complaint to Protect Minor's Privacy and Ordering Re-filing of Redacted Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/6/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 6 Stipulation of Leave to Amend the Complaint; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. v. City of King City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Baldviez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tirado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does VII-L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of King City
Represented By: Raymond Alexander Thomas
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Luna
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Represented By: Raymond Alexander Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King City Police Department
Represented By: Raymond Alexander Thomas
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adela M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M.
Represented By: Edward Leo Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?