Banuelos v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deyanira Banuelos
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2012cv01961
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 19 Stipulation for an Extension of Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Stipulation for an Extension of Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banuelos v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deyanira Banuelos
Represented By: James Hunt Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?