UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Shiozawa
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Shiro Shiozawa
Case Number: 5:2012cv02025
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 50 Motion for New Trial.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge June 28, 2013 granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO THE USE OF DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 8, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 27, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Shiozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiro Shiozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?