Maridon v. Comcast Corporation
Plaintiff: Geri Maridon
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv02109
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RESETTING CMC AND VACATING TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DATES. Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 57 Proposed Order, 56 Declaration in Support, 55 Declaration in Support, 50 Declaration in Support, 53 Declaration in Support, 51 Declaration in Support, 54 D eclaration in Support, 52 Declarati filed by Geri Maridon, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 57 Proposed Order, 56 Declaration in Support, 55 Declaration in Support, 50 Declaration in Support, 53 Declaration in Support, 51 Declaration in Support, 54 Declaration in Support, 52 Declarati, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Responses due by 12/18/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 58 Motion ; denying 58 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 26 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF'S JURY DEMAND TIMELY. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/2/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 Correcting Defendant's Name and Correcting Caption filed by Geri Maridon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 5/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maridon v. Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geri Maridon
Represented By: Christopher Robert Le Clerc
Represented By: Stephen F. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Marianne C. Koepf
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?