Zynga, Inc. v. Kobojo SAS Featured Case
Plaintiff: Zynga, Inc.
Defendant: Kobojo SAS
Case Number: 5:2012cv02236
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Zynga, Inc. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims with Prejudice Upon Consent by Zynga, Inc. (Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 11 Order Granting 10 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Frank Goldberg, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Varas, # 3 Proposed Order)(Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 7/12/2012. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zynga, Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kobojo SAS. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Zynga, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Kobojo SAS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611011796). Filed by Zynga, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits: A-G, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga, Inc. v. Kobojo SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Represented By: Larry W McFarland
Represented By: Christopher Theodore Varas
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobojo SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?