Bedalla v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Bedalla
Defendant: Recontrusrt Company, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2012cv02307
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Amending 29 and dismissing with prejudice. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/6/2013 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE, granting 8 Case Management Statement,, filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/17/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2012: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedalla v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrusrt Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Bedalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?