Summers v. Chapnick et.al.
Plaintiff: George E. Summers
Defendant: //
Case Number: 5:2012cv02491
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Because the acts complained of occurred in Kings County, which lies within the venue of the Eastern District of California, venue properly lies in that district and not in this one. See 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). Accordingly, this c ase is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND REOPENING ACTION; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLAINT. In the interest of justice, the Court construes the letter as a motion for reconsideration, and for good cause shown, GRANTS the motion. The Clerk shall reopen this action. Plaintiff shall submit a complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Complaint on Form due by 11/4/2012. Failure to file a complaint in accordance with this court order in the time provided will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The deadline has since passed, and Plaintiff has not filed a complaint. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to file a complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/20/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. Chapnick et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George E. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: //
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?