Fortinet, Inc. v. SRI International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fortinet, Inc.
Defendant: SRI International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv02540
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 95 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TENTATIVE RULINGS AND QUESTIONS RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 3, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/8/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 68 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part (64) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-02540-JSW; granting in part and denying in part (57) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-03231-JSW (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES: ORDERING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN PERSON ON MARCH 14, 2013 AT 9:00 AM, COURTROOM B. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 59 STIPULATION to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/13/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3.1.13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION Selecting Private ADR.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS AGAINST DEFENDANT SRI INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortinet, Inc. v. SRI International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortinet, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Lynn Brewer
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?