Dugan et al v. Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC
Plaintiff: John Dugan, Matthew Tapscott and Aurora Dugan
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv02549
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER RE CLASS COUNSELS STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER GRANTING IN PART re (447 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Letter filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan re: personal appearance at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/15/14. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 357 MOTION for Summary Judgment Refiled in Unredacted Form Pursuant to Order at ECF 356 filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC, 342 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan. Signed by Judge William Alsup on April 24, 2014. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING TO APRIL 24 ----- re (429 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) MOTION for Settlement -- Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by Aurora Dugan, John Dugan, (415 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Following Class Settlement filed by Aurora Dugan, John Dugan, (403 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Supplemental Brief, filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, (342 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) MOTION f or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, (409 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Case Management Scheduling Order,, (348 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Cl aims of Plaintiffs filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC ---- Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions Hearing set for 4/24/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER re MDL 2501 Denying Case Centralization (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER TENTATIVELY GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re 403 Supplemental Brief, filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 365, 375) by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 329 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement., ORDER Submission due by 1/6/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 26, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 319 Motion to Compel.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 347) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME AND DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE DEADLINES re 331 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Date and Extend Other Dates, in View of Class Settlement filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan , Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, 330 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 329 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement - Stipulation to Advance Hearing Date from 12/26/13 to 12/19/13 filed by Aurora Dugan, John Dugan. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER re 309 MOTION for Protective Order re Deposition of A. Hutchinson filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 309 MOTION for Protective Order re Deposition of A. Hutchinson. Responses due by 10/29/2013. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2013 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on October 28, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH by Hon. William Alsup denying 303 Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 10, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 253 Motion for Protective Order; granting 266 Motion to Compel (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing re 252 MOTION to Bifurcate Defendant Lloyds TSB Bank PLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurcate Individual Claims for Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 247 Motion to Compel (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas terminating 231 Discovery Letter Brief (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE Objections due by 5/24/2013. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 209 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re 101 Discovery Letter BriefSeeking Urgent Relief in Advance of International Depositions filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on April 23, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL re 163 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, 164 Redacted Document filed by Jason Ray, Aurora Dugan, Rika Olson, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 FURTHER QUESTIONS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 10, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REFERRING SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on March 27, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Discovery (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by Judge Alsup granting (100) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (109) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-02549-WHA; granting (85) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (91) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-02937-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 22, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 COURT-ORDERED INTERROGATORIES AND FOLLOW-UP (due by noon on 1/31/2013). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/10/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas re Confidential Protective Order;terminating 82 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating 85 Discovery Letter Brief (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING FOR JANUARY 10 HEARING. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 82 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Entry of Final Confidentiality Protective Order filed by Aurora Dugan, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on December 20, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RESCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON THE PARTIES DISCOVERY DISPUTES [re (54 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aurora Dugan, Matthew Tapscott, John Dugan, (56 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lloyd s TSB Bank, PLC, (55 in 3:12-cv-02549-WHA) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC, (43 in 3:12-cv-02937-WHA) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC]. Responses due by NOON on 10/29/2012. Four-Hour Meet-and-Confer starting at 7:00 AM--11:00 AM 10/31/2012 in the Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 10/31/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND VACATING MOTION HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/15/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugan et al v. Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dugan
Represented By: William Karl Swank
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Riff
Represented By: Laurence Fredric Janssen
Represented By: Stephen A. Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tapscott
Represented By: Stephen A. Fennell
Represented By: Laurence Fredric Janssen
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Riff
Represented By: William Karl Swank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Dugan
Represented By: Stephen A. Fennell
Represented By: Laurence Fredric Janssen
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Riff
Represented By: William Karl Swank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC
Represented By: Mark C. Dosker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?