Neustar, Inc , et al v. F5 Networks, Inc,
Plaintiff: |
Neustar, Inc and Quova, Inc |
Defendant: |
F5 Networks, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv02574 |
Filed: |
May 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul Singh Grewal |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
69
ORDER GRANTING 68 Stipulation filed by Quova, Inc, Neustar, Inc. Motions terminated: 59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel filed by Quova, Inc, Neustar, Inc.*** ALL Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying [42-1] Motion to Compel; denying 46 Motion to Compel (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
34
PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the partie s are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Anticipated Motion Hearing re Summary Judgment set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in L imine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 1/17/2014. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due by 1/21/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selec tion set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2014, 2/12/2014, 2/13/2014, 2/18/2014, 2/19/2014, 2/20/2014, 2/24/2014, 2/25/2014. Jury Deliberations set for 2/26/2014, 2/27/2 014, 2/28/2014. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Please see Order for further specifics. ***5/24/2013 PTC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/21/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?