Doyle v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations et al
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Doyle
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, M. Sepulveda, G. Ellis, J. D. Zamola, J. Clarke Kelso, M Kuersten and Damon T. Hininger
Case Number: 5:2012cv02769
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. All pending motion, case management and trial dates are VACATED. The Compliance hearing currently set for Friday 11/6/2015 is likewise VACATED. A Compliance Hearing regarding settlement is set for Friday, 2/5/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint statement filed by 1/29/16. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/2/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 200 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 AMENDED JUDGMENT re 187 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 JUDGMENT. Granting Judgment in favor of Defendant Corrections Corporation of America and against Plaintiff on all claims, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL STAY OF DISCOVERY. Order to Show Cause Hearing why Plaintiff's counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to appear for the case management conference is set for Friday, 3/20/2015 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/4/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VADAS FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2015 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/16/2015. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 149 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 123 Motion to Dismiss; granting 132 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference and Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/19/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference and Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/18/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 116 Motion ; granting 117 Motion to Continue Deadline (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING PENDING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING;REQUIRING FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 50 Motion for Leave to File; denying 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 52 Motion to Dismiss; denying 58 Motion to Strike ; denying 69 Ex Parte Application ; denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS granting 8 REQUEST FOR SCREENING OF COMPLAINT; denying 14 Motion to Remand (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Zamola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clarke Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Kuersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon T. Hininger
Represented By: Heather Linn Rosing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?