EMC Corporation v. Bright Response, LLC
Plaintiff: EMC Corporation
Defendant: Bright Response, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv02841
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC to 2/14/13 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen STAYING Action and Declining to Rule on 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer in Favor of First-Filed Action, 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; and 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Briefing Schedule of Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and/or Transfer, 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 25 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer in Fa vor of First-Filed Action, 30 MOTION for Discovery EMC's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery to Respond to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and/or Transfer., STIPULATION AND ORDER Responses due by 8/21/2012. Replies due by 8/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO 31 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMC Corporation v. Bright Response, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Curran
Represented By: William R. Clark
Represented By: Paul T. Dacier
Represented By: Krishnendu Gupta
Represented By: Emily Christina O'Brien
Represented By: Antonio Moriyama Sistos
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Response, LLC
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?