GPNE Corp. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: GPNE Corp.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv02885
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alan Honea (Honea, Christopher) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Garteiser (Garteiser, Randall) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 8/14/12 Case Management Conference reset to 7/17/12 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/10/12. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 7/10/12. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 4, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 4, 2012 Filing 10 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 4, 2012 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:12-cv-00248. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 6/8/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 8 GPNE Corp.'s ANSWER to 7 Defendant Apple Inc.'s COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief, filed August 29, 2011; Certificate of Service - by GPNE Corp. -- This document is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 80. (emt, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 7 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 GPNE Corp.'s Complaint for Patent Infringement, filed July 1, 2011; COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service - by Apple Inc. -- This document is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 23. (emt, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 6 THIRD STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER FILED OCTOBER 5, 2011 (DOC. 114) ; AND ORDER - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/30/12. -- This order is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 265. (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 10, 2012 ADVISORY ENTRY. Pursuant to the "Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Motion to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff's Claims Against Research in Motion Ltd., and Research in Motion Corporation and Defendants Apple Inc. And Barnes & Noble, Inc.'s Consolidated Motion to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue" filed on March 9, 2012 and the "Order Affirming Magistrate Judge's Order Transferring Plaintiff's Claims Against Research in Motion Ltd.; Research in Motion Corporation; Apple Inc.; and Barnes & Noble, Inc." filed on May 9, 2012 All defendants, except Amazon, Inc. are severed from CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP; GPNE Corp. V. Amazon Inc.; et al. In accordance with the above referenced orders, the Clerks Office has opened new cases for the claims against each defendant or defendant group named below: 1) GPNE Corp. V. Apple, Inc. CV 12-00248 SOM-RLP 2) GPNE Corp. V. Barnes & Noble, Inc. - CV 12-00249 SOM-RLP 3) GPNE Corp. V. Nokia Corporation and Nokia, Inc. - CV 12-00250 SOM-RLP 4) GPNE Corp. V. Pantech Co., Ltd. and Pantech Wireless, Inc. - CV 12-00251 SOM-RLP 5) GPNE Corp. V. Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corporation - CV 12-00252 SOM-RLP 6) GPNE Corp. V. Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation - CV 12-00253 SOM-RLP 7) GPNE Corp. V. Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc. - CV 12- 00254 SOM-RLP (emt, )
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER TRANSFERRING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD.; RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATION; APPLE INC.; BARNES & NOBLE, INC. - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/9/12. -- This order is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 287. (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD. AND RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATION AND DEFENDANTS APPLE INC. AND BARNES & NOBLE, INC.'S CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AND TRANSFER VENUE - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/9/12. -- This order is referenced in CV 11-004426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 246. (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 10, 2012 Filing 3 SECOND STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER, FILED OCTOBER 5, 2011 (Doc. 113); AND ORDER - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 2/23/12. -- This order is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 238. (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 10/5/11. -- The Scheduling Order is referenced in CV 11-00426 SOM-RLP as docket entry 114. (emt, )No COS issued for this docket entry
May 10, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. - filed by GPNE Corp. -- The Complaint was originally filed on July 1, 2011 and assigned civil number CV 11-00426 JMS-RLP (later reassigned to Chief Judge Susan Oki Mollway pursuant to the "Order of Recusal" filed on August 30, 2011). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Demand for Jury Trial, # 5 Summons)(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GPNE Corp. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPNE Corp.
Represented By: Barry J. Bumgardner
Represented By: Alexandra Capachietti
Represented By: Stephen Y. Chow
Represented By: Randall Garteiser
Represented By: Zachary R. Gates
Represented By: Steven W. Hartsell
Represented By: Christopher Alan Honea
Represented By: Jordon Jun Kimura
Represented By: Robert G. Klein
Represented By: Kenneth J. Mansfield
Represented By: Shaun M. Mukai
Represented By: Paul T. Muniz
Represented By: Howard J. Susser
Represented By: Merton E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Christopher Owen Green
Represented By: Kelly C. Hunsaker
Represented By: Louise K.Y. Ing
Represented By: Erin E. Kaiser
Represented By: Malia E. Kakos
Represented By: Aamir A. Kazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?