Gonzalez v. The Eggo Company, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Gonzalez
Defendant: The Eggo Company, Inc doing business as Kellogs, Ecolab, Inc., Jacobs Engineering,, Inc and State Certified Plumbing
Case Number: 5:2012cv02955
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Referring Judge: Ronald M Whyte
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER #63 Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 63 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice and (Proposed) Order filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order) (Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER #61 : Discovery cutoff 3/31/2014. Jury Trial set for 7/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/5/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Amend and/or Modify Dates Set in June 26, 2013 Scheduleing Order re #59 ; and (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amended (Proposed) Order)(Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/26/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Filing 60 Notice of Errata re (Proposed) scheduling Order #56 -1) re #59 by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER #56 : Discovery cutoff by 12/31/2013. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motion: Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/26/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF receipt of certified documents re partial remanded case.from Superior Court of California, Santa Clarea County, San Jose, ca on 4/22/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE OF LODGING OF (PROPOSED) SCHEDULING ORDER by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Text modified on 4/23/2013 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2013 Filing 57 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2013 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 4/19/2013). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 7/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 55 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons by Jamie Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission) (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Text modified on 4/22/2013 conforming to posted document captio (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #53 Motion to Appear by Telephone for the 4/19/2013 CMC Filed by the Defendants. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Remarks: Portions of case remanded to State Case pursuant to Order Granting Motion to Sever, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The court hereby remands the product liability claims to the Superior Court of California for the County of Santa Clara. The claims against Eggo are retained here under diversity jurisdiction. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013) (Clerk mailed certified copy of docket sheet and order to State court. USPS certified mail tracking #7009-1410-0002-2008-1056
April 16, 2013 Filing 53 Request to Appear by Telephonically at April 19, 2013 Case Management Conference and (Proposed) Oreder filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 4/16/2013) Modified on 4/17/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2013 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/1/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2013)
February 22, 2013 Filing 50 DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE re #49 Order on Stipulation (Declaration of Service by Mail Re: Order Granting Withdrawal of Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP and Substitution of McGuireWoods LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendant The Eggo Company) by The Eggo Company, Inc (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 2/22/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #47 Withdrawal of Wilson Kosmo Turner LLP and Substitution of McGuirewoods LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendant the Eggo Company. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 48 DECLARATION OF SERVICE re #47 Conditional Withdrawal of Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP and Conditional Substitution of McGuireWoods LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendant The Eggo Company For All Future Purposes Pursuant to L.R. 11-5(b) RE: DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS MCGUIREWOODS LLP by The Eggo Company, Inc (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 Filing 47 Conditional Withdrawal of Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP and Conditional Substitution of McGuireWoods LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendant The Eggo Company For All Future Purposes Pursuant to L.R. 11-5(b) filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order (Re: Granting Conditional Withdrawal of Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP and Conditional Substitution of McGuireWoods LLP as Counsel of Record for Defendant The Eggo Company For All Future Purposes Pursuant to L.R. 11-5(b)), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting #33 Motion to Sever; granting in part and denying in part #38 Motion to Remand (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
October 26, 2012 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2012 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 10/26/2012) re #38 MOTION to Remand Entire Case filed by Jamie Gonzalez, #33 MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure section 21 filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 44 Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court re #38 filed by Jamie Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 10/18/2012) Modified on 10/19/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 by State Certified Plumbing. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Long, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Linkage added on 10/15/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2012 Filing 42 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court re #38 filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marissa L. Lyftogt in Support of Defendant Eggo Company, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service (Re: Defendant Eggo Company, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)) (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 Filing 41 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to its Motion to Sever pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure re #33 filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service (Re: Defendant Eggo Company's Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Oppostion to its Motion to Sever, etc.)) (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EGGOS MOTION TO SEVER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 re #33 filed by Jamie Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Filing 38 Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Jamie Gonzalez. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 10/11/2012. Replies due by 10/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Cox, John) (Filed on 9/26/2012) Modified on 9/27/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2012 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/21/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 36 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint re #27 by Ecolab, Inc. (McCarthy, Ryan) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Linkage added on 9/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance of Marcia A. Pollioni on behalf of Greg Kirk by Joseph Antonio Long, Esq (Long, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and (Proposed) Order filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed} Order (Re: Joint Case Management Statement), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service by Electronic Submission) (Wilson, Claudette) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Filing 33 Notice of Motion and Motion to Server pusuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 9/28/2012. Replies due by 10/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Sever Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure section 21, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service by Electronic Submission)(Wilson, Claudette) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 32 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint re #27 by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission (Re: Answer to SAC and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)) (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Text modified,linkage added on 9/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 Filing 31 Answer to Second Amended Complaint re #27 by Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 9/10/2012) Text modified, linkage added on 9/10/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 30 Substitution of Attorney for Greg Kirk dba State Certified Plumbing filed by State Certified Plumbing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Long, Joseph) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Text modified on 9/4/2012 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event used when posting document; motion terminated (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2012 Filing 29 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Certified Plumbing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Long, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2012 Filing 28 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint re #1 by State Certified Plumbing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Long, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 Filing 27 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Jamie Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 Filing 26 Notice of Representation of Greg Kird dba State Certified Plumbing by State Certified Plumbing (Long, Joseph) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER #22 of All Parties to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/3/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has until 8/27/2012 to file an amended complaint. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2012 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 7/27/2012) re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Eggo's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Through Fifth Causes of Action for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 22 STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE and (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by Jamie Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jannik O. Caalano In Support of Stipulation to Continue, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE:The Motion Hearing on #11 Motion to Dismiss is Scheduled for 7/27/2012 at 9:30 AM NOT 9:00 AM. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Eggo's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Through Fifth Causes of Action for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 23, 2012 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 with Jury Demand by Ecolab, Inc. (McCarthy, Ryan) (Filed on 7/5/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2012 Filing 18 DEFENDANT EGGOS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND THROUGH FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) re #11 filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 7/5/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2012 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jamie Gonzalez. (Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EGGOS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND THROUGH FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) (re #11 filed by Jamie Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jannik Catalano in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Catalano, Jannik) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified on 6/28/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Filing 15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Ecolab, Inc. (McCarthy, Ryan) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Modified on 6/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Filing 14 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Jacobs Engineering,, Inc (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Modified on 6/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT ECOLAB INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT re #1 filed by Ecolab, Inc.. (McCarthy, Ryan) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Linkage added on 6/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #1 by Jacobs Engineering,, Inc. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Modified on 6/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND THROUGH FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 6/27/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Eggo's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Through Fifth Causes of Action for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Declaration of Lupe Christensen in Support of Defendant Eggo's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission (Re Motion to Dismiss)) (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 6/13/2012) Modified on 6/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Jacobs Engineering , INC. (Cox, John) (Filed on 6/13/2012) Modified on 6/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC. TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Jacobs Engineering,, Inc. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Text modified on 6/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/12/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 ADR Scheduling Order by The Eggo Company, Inc (Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Text modified on 6/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission (Re Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge))(Lyftogt, Marissa) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 Filing 3 Declaration of Servie re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Lupe Christensen in Support of Notice of Removal by The Eggo Company, Inc (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 Filing 2 Declaration of Lupe Christensen in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Exhibits: (Exhibit-A: AMENDED COMPLAINT) ; (NO PROCESS) from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 111CV208962. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611012008). Filed by The Eggo Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. The Eggo Company, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Gonzalez
Represented By: Jannik Patrick Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Eggo Company, Inc doing business as Kellogs
Represented By: Claudette Girdner Wilson
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Represented By: Katherine Koransky Pothier
Represented By: Marissa L. Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Alexander McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering,, Inc
Represented By: John Cox
Represented By: Nathan Randall Jaskowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Certified Plumbing
Represented By: Marcia Allen Pollioni
Represented By: Joseph Antonio Long, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?