Major v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc
Plaintiff: Noelle Major
Defendant: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv03067
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 50 Second Motion to Certify Class; granting 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting 87 Stipulation Modifying Case Management Deadlines. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2014(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' joint statement (see Docket Item No. 70) and in light of the pending Motion for Class Certification and Motion for Summary Judgment, the court has determined a pret rial conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 4, 2014, is VACATED and will be rescheduled as appropriate subsequent to the court's ruling on the pending motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Certify Class; denying 39 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/10/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Class Certification, the Court finds an appearance unnecessary at this time. The court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Clas s Certification for May 3, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file, serve and notice the motion as necessary pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7. ***11/30/2012 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. Response due 8/24/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Major
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?