In re LinkedIn User Privacy Litigation
Plaintiff: Katie Szpyrka, Scott Shepherd, Candyce Paraggua and Sam Veith
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv03088
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 145 Motion for Settlement. The Clerk shall close this file upon entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/15/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015) Modified on 9/15/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request and (Proposed) Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Linkedin Corporation. ***7/18/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss. The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on June 6,2014. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/28/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 59 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Any amended complaint shall be file within 30 days of this filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013) Modified text on 3/6/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/5/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request Setting Date To Respond to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint re 42 Stipulation filed by Sam Veith, Linkedin Corporation, Katie Szpyrka, Candyce Paraggua, Scott Shepherd. Response due 11/5/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. In light of the order granting consolidation and appointment interim lead class counsel, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement on or before 9/13/2012 which includes, inter alia, a proposed schedule for the consolidated action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/30/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Appointing Interim Lead Class Counsel. All future filings shall be in 5:12-cv-03088 EJD and shall bear the caption: In re LinkedIn User Privacy Litigation. The hearing and Case Management Conference cu rrently scheduled for 8/31/2012 are VACATED. The court will file an order addressing scheduling issues forthwith. Within 21 days of the date this order is filed, Plaintiffs shall filed a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 13 Stipulation filed by Linkedin Corporation. The stipulation is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Before the court will consider extending Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint, and before the court will con sider consolidating this case with cases not already assigned to Judge Davila, the parties must file and obtain a ruling on an administrative motion to consider whether cases should be related pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(b). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/23/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re LinkedIn User Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Szpyrka
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Christopher L. Dore
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Shepherd
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candyce Paraggua
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Represented By: Joseph Jeremy Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Veith
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?