Juel v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Phoebe Juel
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv03124
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2012 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE e Notice of Removal (Filed Under Seal) by Apple Inc (Brickman, Suzanna) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Modified on 6/21/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 Filing 12 Amended Certificate of Service re 1 Notice of Removal by Apple Inc. (Brickman, Suzanna) (Filed on 6/20/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 1 filed by Apple Inc. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Linkage added on 6/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 5 Declaration in Support, 1 Notice of Removal, 3 Certificate of Interested Entities, 2 Declaration in Support (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila granting 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order HRL, # 2 Standing Order for all Judges)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 5 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 4 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 2 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 1 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Public Redacted Version) from Superior Court, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 112CV222854. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 54611012054). Filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juel v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoebe Juel
Represented By: Nicole T. Fiorelli
Represented By: John Andrew Kithas
Represented By: Christopher Land
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Michael Robert Rudick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Suzanna Pacht Brickman
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?