Technology & Intellectual Property Strategies Group, PC v. Insperity, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Technology & Intellectual Property Strategies Group, PC
Defendant: Insperity, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2012cv03163
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Continuing Stay Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/17/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion to Intervene; granting 19 Motion to Compel; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/2012. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology & Intellectual Property Strategies Group, PC v. Insperity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology & Intellectual Property Strategies Group, PC
Represented By: William Claude Milks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insperity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?