Securities and Exchange Commission v. Small Business Capital Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: SBC Portfolio Fund, LLC, Small Business Capital Corp.,, Investors Prime Fund, LLC, USA, California Business Bank and Mark Feathers
Interested Party: Natalie Feathers and U.S. Small Business Administration
Claimant: BusinessUS, LLC
Receiver: Thomas A. Seaman
Not Classified By Court: Stephen D. Pahl
Case Number: 5:2012cv03237
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 1278 Mail sent to Mark Feathers returned as undeliverable re #1277 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 Order granting #1274 Motion to Conclude Receivership. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/9/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 1276 OPPOSITION (re #1274 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: Approving Post Closing Accounting and Report; Releasing Feathers Reserve funds; Authorizing Payment of Professional Fees; and Discharging Receiver (with Exhibits A, B and C) ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1275 ERRATA re #1274 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: Approving Post Closing Accounting and Report; Releasing Feathers Reserve funds; Authorizing Payment of Professional Fees; and Discharging Receiver (with Exhibits A, B and C) by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1274 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: Approving Post Closing Accounting and Report; Releasing Feathers Reserve funds; Authorizing Payment of Professional Fees; and Discharging Receiver (with Exhibits A, B and C) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 8/16/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1273 MANDATE of USCA. The judgment of this Court, entered May 14, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. as to #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #872 Notice of Appeal, filed by Natalie Feathers, #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 ORDER of USCA Filed order amending memorandum - The time for filing any petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc expired June 28, 2019, and no party filed a petition. However, on May 14, 2019, the United States Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) notified us that an error was made regarding the allocation of costs. No party has responded indicating otherwise. We agree with the SEC. Thus, the memorandum disposition filed May 14, 2019, is amended as follows: The ultimate paragraph of the disposition is amended to read: Costs are to be taxed against Appellant Mark Feathers in Nos. 14-15466, 14-15894, 15-16018, 15-17200, 17- 15923; costs are to be taxed against Appellant Natalie Feathers in No. 14-15831. The parties shall bear their own costs in Nos. 13-17304 and 15-70102. No further suggestions for amendments or changes to the disposition will be entertained. as to #907 USCA Appeal Fees, #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1270 #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #872 Notice of Appeal, filed by Natalie Feathers, #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1053 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1271 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Feathers (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1270 USCA MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION As to Feathers, AFFIRMED in Nos. 13-17304, 14-15466, 14-15894, 15- 16018, 15-17200, 17-15923, VACATED and REMANDED in No. 15-70102; as to Natalie Feathers, AFFIRMED in No. 14-15831. Costs are to be taxed against Appellant Mark Feathers in Nos. 13-17304, 14- 15466, 14-15894, 15-16018, 15-17200, 17-15923; costs are to be taxed against Appellant Natalie Feathers in No. 14-15831; costs are to be taxed against Respondent SEC in No. 15-70102. as to #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #872 Notice of Appeal, filed by Natalie Feathers, #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1053 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1269 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Feathers (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1268 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-25-16, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1263 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018. (Related documents(s) #1263 ) (las, ) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1266 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/16/2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1262 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018. (Related documents(s) #1262 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1265 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/16/2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 1264 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/03/2015, 10/22/2013, 05/10/2013 before Judge Edward J. Davila by USA, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 1263 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/25/2016 before Judge Edward J. Davila by USA, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 1262 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2014 and 07/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal by USA, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER of USCA Appellants motion for reconsideration of this courts July 28, 2017 order in appeal No. 15-17200 (Docket Entry No. #21 in appeal No. 13-17304) is denied as untimely. Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 14-15938 (Docket Entry No. #22 in appeal No. 13-17304) is granted. Appeal No. 14-15938 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to appeal No. 14-15938 only. Proceedings in the remaining appeals are stayed pending the appointment of pro bono counsel and further order of the court. 10680346 (Fung, Allison) as to #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 1260 Letter from Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER of USCA as to #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 25, 2017 Receipt of acknowledgment from USCA Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee - in case no. 17-15923. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/24/2017.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 1258 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611017008 re #1257 USCA Order (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 ORDER of USCA - Mark Feathers shall pay the docketing and filings fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in appeal No. 17-15923 by August 9, 2017.Mark Feathers motion for emergency relief in appeal No. 15-17200 will be addressed by separate order.Appeal No. 16-16988 shall proceed independently.The Clerk shall enter an order appointing pro bono counsel to represent Mark and Natalie Feathers (the Feathers) for purposes of these consolidated appeals only.Appellant Mark Feathers motion to relate appeal Nos. 13-17304 and16-16988 (Docket Entry No. 54 in No. 13-17304) is granted. Additionally, the court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 13-17304 with appeal Nos. 14-15466, 14-15831, 14-15894, 14-15938, 15-16018, 15-17200, 15-70102, and 17-15923.as to #904 USCA Case Number, #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers, #872 Notice of Appeal, filed by Natalie Feathers, #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017) Modified on 7/13/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2017 Filing 1256 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 7/10/17 Addendum to motion for reconsideration, Request for status on motion, request to make decision on pleadings without hearing, Notification of Intent to Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTIONS denying #1230 , #1251 , #1254 Motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/27/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2017 Filing 1254 Ex Parte Application for immediate consideration to overturn prior order of summary judgment filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ORDER denying #1235 Motion for Release of Funds or Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER of USCA - appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; as to #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 1251 MOTION for reconsideration of legal fees filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 6/29/2017. Replies due by 7/6/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 1250 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 6/6/17. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1249 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 5/12/17 re: copy of all court filings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 4, 2017 Filing 1248 USCA Case Number 17-15923 9th Circuit Court of Appeals - Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The fee is payable to the District Court.for #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1247 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Ex Parte Application, #1242 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1246 Ex Parte REQUEST for Emergency Injunction against Thomas A. Seaman by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2017: #1 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Filing 1245 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 4/27/17. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2017: #1 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Filing 1244 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 4/27/17. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 1243 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ted Fates (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 ORDER granting #1241 Ex Parte Application for Approval of Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2017 Filing 1241 Ex Parte Application re #1166 MOTION Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver , #1238 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1165 MOTION Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Receiver's Ex Parte Application for Clarification and Order Authorizing Administrative Payments, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 1240 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1235 MOTION for Release of Funds MOTION to Stay ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER denying #1207 , #1208 , #1219 Motions. The hearing scheduled for 2/16/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 ORDER granting #1164 Receiver's Motion to Conclude Receivership. The February 16th motion hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 ORDER denying without prejudice #1193 Motion for Appointment of the Federal Public Defender. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORDER granting #1163 Stipulation Resolving Claim of U.S. Small Business Administration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 Filing 1235 MOTION for Release of Funds and Notice filed in Case No. CR 14-531 LHK and Case No. 12-cv-3237 EJD or, MOTION to Stay of Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/9/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2017 Filing 1234 *** Posted In Error *** please see #1235 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 2/9/2017) Modified on 2/9/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/9/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2017 Filing 1233 STATUS REPORT by Mark Feathers. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 23, 2017 Filing 1232 REPLY (re #1230 MOTION for Relief in the form of an Order form the Court to SEC Instructing SEC to Discontinue Violating Laws, Codes, and Statues in Properly Determining if Defendant Qualifies to have SEC Waive Court Ordered Disgorgement and Defendant's Request for ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 1231 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1230 MOTION for Relief in the form of an Order form the Court to SEC Instructing SEC to Discontinue Violating Laws, Codes, and Statues in Properly Determining if Defendant Qualifies to have SEC Waive Court Ordered Disgorgement and Defendant's Request ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 1/17/2017) Modified on 1/23/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2017 Filing 1230 MOTION for Relief in the form of an Order from the Court to SEC Instructing SEC to Discontinue Violating Laws, Codes, and Statues in Properly Determining if Defendant Qualifies to have SEC Waive Court Ordered Disgorgement and Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice of Evidentiary Material to Support Defendant's Motion for Relief filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 1/17/2017. Replies due by 1/24/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017) Modified on 1/23/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2016 Filing 1229 Supplemental Brief re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma (Receiver's Supplemental Report and Request for Judicial Notice) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #1164 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 27, 2016 Filing 1228 OPPOSITION to Receiver's Ex-Parte Motion re #1226 filed byMark Feathers. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 ORDER granting #1226 Ex Parte Application to Amend the Relief Sought in Receiver's Motion to Conclude Receivership and fee Applications of the Receiver and Allen Matkins; and to Re-Set Vacated Hearing Date for 2/16/2017. On 2/16/2017, the Court will consider the Receiver's modifications to the Closing Motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2016 ***Set Hearing pursuant to #1227 Order re Receiver's closing motion. Receiver's closing Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 ***Set Motion hearing (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 ***Set Motions Hearing #1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION to Stay re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Shorten Time, #1207 MOTION for Sanctions, #1219 MOTION for Sanctions, #1227 Receiver's Modification to Closing Motion. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 1226 Ex Parte Application to Amend the Relief Sought in Receiver's Motion to Conclude Receivership and fee Applications of the Receiver and Allen Matkins [Dkt Nos. 1164,1165,1166]; and to Re-Set Vacated Hearing Date for February 16, 2017 [Dkt No. 1224] filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/16/2016) Modified on 12/19/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 ORDER denying #1208 Motion to Shorten Time; denying #1220 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 ORDER RE: #1195 MOTION TO DEFER RULING. The hearing scheduled for 11/17/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. The hearing scheduled for 10/20/2016 is continued to 11/17/2016 at 1:30 PM, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 ***Reset Hearing as to #1195 Motion to Defer Ruling for Appointment of Counsel in Ancillary Matter. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 ***Terminated 10/20/2016 Hearing pursuant to #1223 Order. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 1222 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/25/2016, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1203 in 5:12-cv-03237-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1221 Proposed Order re #1219 MOTION for Sanctions by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1220 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time #1219 Motion for sanctions filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016) Modified on 9/30/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2016 Filing 1219 MOTION for Sanctions against receiver and professionals filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/14/2016. Replies due by 10/21/2016. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 1218 REPLY to opposition #1216 (re #1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016) Modified on 9/27/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2016 Filing 1217 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING re #1207 Motion to Request Sanctions Against Receiver and Professionals filed by Defendant Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 1216 OPPOSITION (re #1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION to Stay re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Shorten Time ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/20/2016) Modified on 9/27/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MARK FEATHERS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Re: Dkt. No. #1207 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 1214 RESPONSE to re #1211 Order by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1213 REPLY (re #1207 MOTION for sanctions against receiver and professionals. re filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Re: Dkt. No. #1207 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1212 ERRATA re #1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1210 OPPOSITION (re #1207 MOTION for Sanctions Against Receiver and Professionals filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 9/7/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2016 Filing 1209 Proposed Order re #1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION to Stay re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Shorten Time by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1208 MOTION for relief from prior order of disgorgement re #622 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, MOTION increase in defendant's legal fee reserves pending court's review, MOTION to Stay of payment of fees to receiver and counsel #1165 and #1166 and REQUEST for court to re-allocate all past and present fee request MOTION to Shorten Time and request for judicial notice filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016) Modified on 9/6/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2016 ***Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #1208 Motion for relief from prior order of disgorgement. Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/27/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1207 MOTION to Request Sanctions Against Receiver and Professionals filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 1, 2016 Filing 1206 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-27-12, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1186 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2016. (Related documents(s) #1186 ) (las, ) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 31, 2016 Filing 1205 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma Notice of Lodgment of Amended Proposed Order Concluding Receivership, etc. (Attachments: #1 Amended Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 26, 2016 Filing 1203 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/25/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Mark Feathers, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1204 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2016 re #1166 Motion Application for Approval of Fees and Costs, #1195 Motion to Defer Ruling, #1164 Motion to Conclude Receivership and for Order; (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #1165 Motion Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees. The Court heard oral argument and took the matters under submission. As to #1195 Motion the court heard oral argument and continued the matter for Motion Hearing to be held on 10/20/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Plaintiff Attorney John Bulgozdy. Defendant Attorney David Zaro, Eric Adams, Mark Feathers, Rita Bosworth, Martin Teckler (via CourtCall). Total Time in Court:9:15-10:20am, 10:50-11:32am (1hr.47mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2016 Filing 1202 REPLY (re #1193 MOTION to Appoint Federal Public Defender; Reply on Motion to Defer Ruling on Part of Receiver's Motion to Conclude Receivership filed by Mark Feathers. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/24/2016) Modified on 8/25/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2016 Filing 1201 ADDENDA re #1178 Opposition to #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of A. Stalker Electronically filed in case CR14-531 RMW docket no. 67)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016) Modified on 8/24/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/24/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 1200 NOTICE by BusinessUS, LLC re #1196 Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone, Notice of Court Call Appearance By Martin Teckler (Teckler, Martin) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 8/24/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 1199 OPPOSITION (re #1195 MOTION to Defer Ruling, #1193 MOTION to Appoint Federal Public Defender for Purposes of Ancillary Proceeding [18 U.S.C. Section 3006A(c)] and [Proposed] Order ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 1198 OPPOSITION (re #1195 MOTION to Defer Ruling, #1193 MOTION to Appoint Federal Public Defender for Purposes of Ancillary Proceeding [18 U.S.C. Section 3006A(c)] and [Proposed] Order filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 1197 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06-28-2012, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1188 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #1188 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER Granting #1191 Claimant Business US, LLC's Motion to Appear and Participate Telephonically at 8/25/2016 Hearing on Motion to Conclude the Receivership and other matters. Counsel is instructed to Contact CourtCall directly at (866) 582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/19/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 1195 MOTION to defer ruling on #1164 motion to conclude receivership, shorten time and the Court schedules a hearing on this matter for August 25, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. [Proposed] Order filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rita Bosworth)(Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/18/2016) Modified on 8/19/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2016 Filing 1194 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Belle Bosworth (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 1193 MOTION to Appoint Federal Public Defender specifically, AFPD Rita Bosworth, to represent Mr. Feathers for Purposes of Ancillary Proceeding [18 U.S.C. Section 3006A(c)] and [Proposed] Order filed by Mark Feathers. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/18/2016) Modified on 8/18/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2016 Filing 1192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BusinessUS, LLC re #1191 MOTION to Appear by Telephone BUSINESSUS, LLC'S Motion to Appear and Participate Telephonically at August 25, 2016 Hearing on Motion to Conclude the Receivership and other Matters [Proposed Order] (Teckler, Martin) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1191 MOTION to Appear by Telephone [Proposed Order] filed by BusinessUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teckler, Martin) (Filed on 8/17/2016) Modified on 8/17/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2016 Filing 1190 REPLY (re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma ) (Response to Opposition filed by BusinessUS LLC) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman as Receiver with Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Francis Scollan with Exhibits)(Scollan, Francis) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 1189 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/26/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Mark Feathers, for Court Reporter Jaimie Hopp. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/11/2016) Modified text on 8/11/2016,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/12/2016 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2016 Filing 1188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/28/2016 amendment to #1187 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Mark Feathers, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/11/2016) Modified on 8/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2016 Filing 1187 *** ERROR *** please see #1188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/28/2012 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Mark Feathers, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/11/2016) Modified on 8/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2016 Filing 1186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/2012 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Mark Feathers, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bosworth, Rita) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BusinessUS, LLC re #1184 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Fink, David) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 ORDER Granting #1182 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Martin Teckler, Counsel for Claimant Business US, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/5/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 1183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BusinessUS, LLC re #1182 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10662527.) (Fink, David) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 1182 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10662527.) filed by BusinessUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Teckler, Martin) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 1181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BusinessUS, LLC re #1180 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Fink, David) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 1180 RESPONSE (re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma ) filed byBusinessUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Teckler)(Fink, David) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 1179 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #1178 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #1178 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 1178 OPPOSITION (re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 1177 RESPONSE (re #1166 MOTION Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver , #1165 MOTION Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 1176 RESPONSE (re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER Granting #1173 Motion to Shorten Time on Motion to Conclude Receivership and Fee Applications of Receiver and Allen Matkins. It is hereby ordered that: The hearing date for the Motion To Conclude Receivership #1164 ; the Receiver's Fee Application #1165 ; and Allen Matkins Fee Application #1166 is hereby advanced 8/25/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/7/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2016 Filing 1174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 7, 2016 Reset Hearing as to #1164 Motion to Conclude Receivership; #1165 Motion Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees; #1166 Motion Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 1173 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for MOTION to conclude receivership and fee application of the receiver and ALLEN MATKINS [DKT. NOS. #1164 , #1165 , #1166 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman in support thereof #2 Proposed Order , #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 7/6/2016) Modified on 7/6/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2016 Filing 1172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Sma (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER granting #1159 Motion for Approval of Settlement with California Business Bank, Raffi D. Krikorian, Michael Maluccio, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Jane Auserwald, Mladen Buntich, Steven Hong, Biff Naylor, Peggy Hansen, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ellwood Johnston and M. Aaron Yashouafar. The hearing scheduled for 6/30/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER granting #1129 Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver. The hearing scheduled for 6/30/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER granting #1128 Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application. The hearing scheduled for 6/30/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2016 Filing 1168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1166 MOTION Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver , #1167 Notice (Other), #1165 MOTION Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1167 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1166 MOTION Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver , #1165 MOTION Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees Notice of Hearing on Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1166 MOTION Application for Approval of Fees and Costs of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/7/2016. Replies due by 7/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1165 MOTION Receiver's Application for Approval and Payment of Fees filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/7/2016. Replies due by 7/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1164 MOTION to Conclude Receivership and for Order: (1) Approving Sale of Cline Judgment and CBB Stock; (2) Authorizing Receiver to Establish Reserve and Make Administrative Payments and Final Distributions to Claimants; (3) Approving Stipulation With Small Business Administration; (4) Approving Final Accounting and Report; (5) Approving Disposition of Books and Records; (6) Releasing Feathers Reserve Funds; and (7) Conditionally Discharging Receiver; Receiver's Final Report and Accounting filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/7/2016. Replies due by 7/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Resolving Claim of U.S. Small Business Administration filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 1162 REPLY (re #1159 MOTION for Settlement for Approval of Settlement with California Business Bank, Raffi D. Krikorian, Michael Maluccio, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Jane Auserwald, Mladen Buntich, Steven Hong, Biff Naylor, Peggy Hansen, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ell ) Receiver's Reply to Opposition of Mr. Feathers to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Breen, Patrick) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1161 RESPONSE (re #1159 MOTION for Settlement for Approval of Settlement with California Business Bank, Raffi D. Krikorian, Michael Maluccio, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Jane Auserwald, Mladen Buntich, Steven Hong, Biff Naylor, Peggy Hansen, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ell ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 1160 OPPOSITION (re #1159 MOTION for Settlement for Approval of Settlement with California Business Bank, Raffi D. Krikorian, Michael Maluccio, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Jane Auserwald, Mladen Buntich, Steven Hong, Biff Naylor, Peggy Hansen, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ell ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 1159 MOTION for Settlement for Approval of Settlement with California Business Bank, Raffi D. Krikorian, Michael Maluccio, Cole W. Minnick, Jr., Jane Auserwald, Mladen Buntich, Steven Hong, Biff Naylor, Peggy Hansen, Kenneth Thompson, Gary K. Cross, Ellwood Johnston and M. Aaron Yashouafar; Declarations of Thomas A. Seaman (with Exhibits A and B) and Patrick E. Breen (with Proof of Service) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/9/2016. Replies due by 5/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breen, Patrick) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 1158 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Sixteenth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 30, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application : Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (STAFF NOTES: For calendaring purposes only. Motions were not showing up properly on the Court's calendar.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 ORDER granting #1132 Motion for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/25/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2016 Filing 1156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2016 re #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Matter submitted. The Court to issue further order following hearing. Court Reporter Name Lee-Anne Shortridge. Total Time in Court 22 minutes (2:06 pm - 2:28 pm). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 1155 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME FOR Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License. The Court advances the time of the hearing from 3:00 PM to 2:00 PM 2/25/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor (Ceremonial Courtroom), San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2016: #2 AMENDED NOTICE: To include Courtroom/Judge Assignment) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/23/2016: correcting courtroom assignment(ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Thomas A. Seaman: Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Staff notes: hearing terminated in error) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 Order Granting #1153 Stipulation and Final Judgment as to Defendants Small Business Capital Corp, Investors Prime Fund, LLC, and SBC Portfolio Fund LLC. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consent to Final Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Final Judgment as to Defendants Small Business Capital Corp., Investors Prime Fund, LLC, and SBC Portfolio Fund, LLC)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 1152 REPLY (re #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ORDER granting #1093 Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 ORDER granting #1092 Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2016 Filing 1149 OPPOSITION (re #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE #1150 and #1151 FOR CORRECTED ORDERS ORDER granting #1093 Motion for Fees of Allen, Matkins, Leck & Natsis, LLP. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/9/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF)(x2)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE #1150 and #1151 FOR CORRECTED ORDERS ORDER granting #1092 Motion for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and his Professionals. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/9/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF)(x2).
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 ORDER denying as moot #1125 Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking a Release of Real Property from Asset Freeze and Injunctive Protection. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER denying as moot #1097 Motion for Order Approving or Disapproving Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1117 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1116 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2016 Filing 1142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2016 re #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #1097 MOTION to Shorten Time MOTION for an order re #678 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mark Feathers, #1138 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion of Receiver for Approval of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and License (Dkt No. 1132) filed by Thomas A. Seaman ; granting #1138 Ex Parte Application. Matters submitted following oral argument. The Court to issue further order following hearing. Motion Hearing re #1132 Motion of Receiver for Approval of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and License set for 2/25/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter Name Irene Rodriguez. Total Time in Court 39 minutes, 9:03 9:42 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2016) Modified text on 2/4/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1097 Motion for an Order: Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver , #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application . Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)(Staff notes: Setting for calendaring purposes only)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1141 RESPONSE (re #1138 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion of Receiver for Approval of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and License (Dkt No. 1132) ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1140 RESPONSE (re #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1139 RESPONSE (re #1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1138 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion of Receiver for Approval of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and License (Dkt No. 1132) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Seaman (with Exhibit A), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1137 Reply to the Court on Status Conference by Mark Feathers. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1136 Omnius Opposition to Receiver's and His Professional's Motion for Payment (re #1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application ) filed byMark Feathers. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1135 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1134 Request for Judicial Notice re #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (with Exhibit 1 and Proof of Service) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Related document(s) #1132 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1133 Declaration of Receiver, Thomas A. Seaman in Support of #1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #1132 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1132 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/10/2016. Replies due by 2/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/27/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 1131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application , #1130 Notice (Other), (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 1130 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 1129 MOTION Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/4/2016. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 1128 MOTION Receiver's Twelfth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/4/2016. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 1127 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman of Release of Property From Preliminary Injunction and Orders: (1) Freezing Assets; (2) Prohibiting the Destruction of Documents; (3) Requiring Accountings; and (4) Appointing a Permanent Receiver (Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1126 RESPONSE (re #1125 MOTION Release of Asset from Asset Freeze re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1125 MOTION Release of Asset from Asset Freeze re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 1/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 7, #2 Declaration Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schultze, Carol) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 RELATED CASE ORDER. 5:12-cv-03237-EJD Securities and Exchange Commission v. Small Business Capital Corp. and 5:16-cv-00086-LHK Feathers v. Bank of America, N.A. ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 1123 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 1/14/2016. (A copy of this order has also been filed in Feathers v. Bank of America, N.A. et al, 5:16-CV-00086-LHK(sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1122 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1107 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/29/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1106 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/29/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2015 Filing 1119 RESPONSE (re #1117 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November 2015 ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1118 RESPONSE (re #1116 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October 2015 ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 1117 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 12/21/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 1116 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 12/21/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 3, 2015 Appeal Remark Received notification from USCA re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 11/30/2015. re #1105 Notice of Appeal, : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1115 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611015924 re #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers re: 15-17200. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 1114 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER granting #1078 Tenth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP. The hearing scheduled for 11/19/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ORDER granting #1077 Receiver's Tenth Interim Fee Application. The hearing scheduled for 11/19/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/16/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 1111 RESPONSE to re #1103 Supplemental Brief by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1110 RESPONSE (re #1107 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2015 , #1106 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2015 ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 ORDER of USCA as to #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 1108 USCA Case Number 15-17200 USCA for the Ninth Circuit for #1105 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 1107 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 11/9/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 1106 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 11/9/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 1105 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Mark Feathers. Appeal of Request for Leave of Court on the Basis of New Admissions by the United States as to Negligence of Plaintiff to Request a Motion Hearing on February 6, 2015 for Consideration of Legal Fees to be Awarded Feathers #1104 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER denying #1101 Motion filed on 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1103 OPPOSITION to Defendants' Request to Issue an Order (Docket No. #1097 ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/2/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2015 Filing 1102 ERRATA re #1101 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Hearing by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1101 REQUEST for Leave of Court on basis of new admissions by the United States as to Negligence of Plaintiff to REQUEST a Motion Hearing on February 6, 2015 for Consideration of Legal Fees to be Awarded Feathers. filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2015 Filing 1100 RESPONSE (re #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver , #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER denying #1097 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 Filing 1098 OPPOSITION (re #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver , #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 1097 MOTION to Shorten Time, MOTION for an order re #678 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Ex Parte Application for Authority to Pursue and Settle Claims Against Certain Third Parties; filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/2/2015. Replies due by 11/9/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015) Modified on 2/3/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER denying #1091 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/14/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 1095 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver , #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application , #1094 Notice (Other), (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1094 NOTICE of hearing by Thomas A. Seaman re #1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver , #1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/14/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 1093 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Eleventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1092 MOTION Approval and Payment of Compensation of Receiver's Eleventh Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1091 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1087 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit amended complaint)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER granting #1060 Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver. The hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER granting #1059 Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application. The hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1085 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for June, 2015 ; granting in part and denying in part #1086 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for July, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER denying #1056 Request for Leave to File a Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders; granting Request for Judicial Notice. The hearing scheduled for 9/10/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 1086 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for July 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 8/24/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 1085 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for June 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 8/24/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1084 RESPONSE (re #1077 MOTION Receiver's Tenth Interim Fee Application , #1078 MOTION Tenth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 1083 OPPOSITION to re #1079 Notice (Other), by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1072 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for May, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/5/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2015 Filing 1081 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Special Report Concerning Distributions and Asset Sale by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1080 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1079 Notice (Other), #1077 MOTION Receiver's Tenth Interim Fee Application , #1078 MOTION Tenth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1079 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1077 MOTION Receiver's Tenth Interim Fee Application , #1078 MOTION Tenth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1078 MOTION Tenth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1077 MOTION Receiver's Tenth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER Denying #1075 Motion to Relate Case. An administrative motion has been filed to consider whether case number 5:15-cv-02194 PSG, Feathers v. United States, is related to the case captioned above. The court has carefully reviewed these two actions and finds they are not related according to the requirements provided by Civil Local Rule 3-12. Accordingly, these two cases shall not be related and a reassignment to the undersigned shall not occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1075 MOTION to Relate Case Defendant's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases should be Related filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1074 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Fourteenth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 1073 RESPONSE (re #1072 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for May 2015 ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1072 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for May 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 7/13/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 1071 RESPONSE (re #1060 MOTION Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1059 MOTION Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 24, 2015 Filing 1070 OPPOSITION (re #1060 MOTION Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1059 MOTION Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 24, 2015 Filing 1069 Request for Judicial Notice Receiver's violation filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015) Modified on 6/24/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2015 Filing 1068 RESPONSE (re #1056 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort ) OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO MODIFY MOTION TO FILE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDERS filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 1067 REPLY (re #1056 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER granting #1019 ; #1020 Eighth Motions for Interim Fees and Costs. The hearing scheduled for 6/18/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1048 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for April, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2015 Filing 1064 RESPONSE (re #1056 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort ) re Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1063 STATUS REPORT RECEIVER'S SPECIAL REPORT CONCERNING ASSET SALE by Thomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 1062 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1060 MOTION Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1059 MOTION Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application , #1061 Notice (Other), (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 1061 NOTICE of Hearing: by Thomas A. Seaman re #1060 MOTION Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1059 MOTION Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/11/2015) Modified on 6/11/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2015 Filing 1060 MOTION Ninth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/25/2015. Replies due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 1059 MOTION Receiver's Ninth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/25/2015. Replies due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 5, 2015 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611015645 re #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1058 Proposed Order re #1056 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1057 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1056 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #1056 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1056 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Judicial Notice of Federal Tort filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/16/2015. Replies due by 6/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Complaint C15-2194 PSG)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER of USCA as to #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers, #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 1054 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Feathers re #1053 Amended Notice of Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 1053 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Mark Feathers as to #1047 Order on Motion for Order of Sale,. Appeal Record due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1052 USCA Case Number 15-16018 9th Circuit Court of Appeals - Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct thisdeficiency within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1.for #1051 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1051 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion for Order of Sale, #1047 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1039 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for March, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2015 Filing 1049 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/2015, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1046 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015. (Related documents(s) #1046 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 1048 MOTION RECEIVER'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF LOAN SERVICING COSTS FOR APRIL 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 5/18/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1027 Motion for Approval to Sell 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2015 Filing 1046 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 1045 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2015 re #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Matter submitted. Court to issue further order following hearing. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez (Time in Court 10:14 - 10:31)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2015)
May 5, 2015 Filing 1044 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Thirteenth Interim Report (with Exhibit A and Proof of Service) by Thomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1033 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for February, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2015 Filing 1042 REPLY (re #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1041 Letter from Mark Feathers. #1038 MOTION for hearing to stay (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1040 ERRATA re #1038 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1039 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for March 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 4/27/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 1038 RESPONSE (re #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale - Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits and MOTION for hearing to stay and Declaration of Mark Feathers and Proof of Service ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 1037 RESPONSE (re #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1036 RESPONSE (re #1033 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for February 2015 ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER granting #1025 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for January, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/14/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER denying #1014 Request to Take Affirmative Action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/14/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1033 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for February 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 4/17/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 Order Granting #1030 Ex Parte Application Shortening Time on Motion of Receiver for Approval of Sale. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/10/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License: Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 1031 ERRATA re [PROPOSED] ORDER SHORTENING TIME re: #1030 by Thomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/9/2015) Modified on 4/10/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2015 Filing 1030 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on Motion) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Seaman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/9/2015) Modified on 4/10/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2015 Filing 1029 Request for Judicial Notice re #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Related document(s) #1027 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1028 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman in Support of #1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #1027 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1027 MOTION for Order of Sale of 7(a) Loan Portfolio, Servicing Rights and SBLC License; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 4/22/2015. Replies due by 4/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 1026 RESPONSE (re #1020 MOTION Eighth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1019 MOTION Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 18, 2015 Filing 1025 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for January 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 3/23/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 1024 Declaration of Mark Feathers filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 1023 OPPOSITION and request (re #1020 MOTION Eighth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1019 MOTION Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1021 Notice (Other), #1020 MOTION Eighth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1019 MOTION Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1021 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #1020 MOTION Eighth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #1019 MOTION Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1020 MOTION Eighth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/20/2015. Replies due by 3/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1019 MOTION Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/20/2015. Replies due by 3/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER of USCA as to #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 1017 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman Receivers Notice of Second Distribution Pursuant to Court-Approved Distribution Plan (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER granting #1006 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for December 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 1015 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #1014 MOTION to take affirmative action and to accept, or to not accept, the re #1011 Status Report filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #1014 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 1014 MOTION to take affirmative action and to accept, or to not accept, re #1011 Receiver's Twelfth Interim and OPPOSITION filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 2/17/2015. Replies due by 2/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER denying #950 , #980 Defendant's Motions. The hearing scheduled for 2/5/2015 is VACATED. Commencing immediately, Feathers shall not file any pleading on the district court docket which raises or discusses (1) the fact that Seaman is not a CPA, or (2) that this fact was not disclosed earlier in this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2015: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER granting #966 , #967 Seventh Motions for Interim Fees and Costs. The hearing scheduled for 2/5/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2015: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2015 Filing 1011 Receiver's Twelfth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/27/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1000 Order to Show Cause. The court has determined that entry of judgment on any part of this action is premature at this time. Accordingly, good cause having been shown in response, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 Order Granting #1008 Motion Relief from Personal Appearance. The Receiver is excused from personal appearance at the hearing on the Motion set for February 5, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1008 Administrative Motion Requesting Relief from Personal Appearance at Fee Application Hearing Set for Februrary 5, 2015 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/21/2015) Modified on 1/21/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER granting #998 Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/21/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2015 Filing 1006 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for December 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 1/26/2015. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 1005 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #1000 by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 1004 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 1/16/15. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 1003 Statement re #1000 Order to Show Cause,, Re: Entry of Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 1002 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Thomas A. Seaman (with Proof of Service). (Zaro, David) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 1001 OPPOSITION (re #998 Ex Parte Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November 2014 ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Entry of Judgment. Any party opposing entry of judgment shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause on or before 1/16/2015. All parties are notified that absent a response demonstrating good cause for not doing so, the court will enter a judgment as indicated above. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER granting #988 Motion for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans. The hearing scheduled for 1/8/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2015: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2014 Filing 998 Ex Parte Application /Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for November 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 997 Proposed Order re #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 19, 2014 Filing 996 Statement of Non-Opposition re #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #988 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 995 Statement re #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 994 Order Granting #991 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 12/15/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER granting #983 Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/15/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans : Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 992 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Eleventh Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 991 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on #988 Motion to Approve Sale of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loan; Supporting Declaration of Receiver, Thomas A. Seaman; [Proposed] Order Shortening Time; and Proof of Service filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/12/2014) Modified on 12/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2014 Filing 990 Request for Judicial Notice re #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Related document(s) #988 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 989 Declaration of Receiver, Thomas A. Seaman in Support of #988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #988 ) (Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION for Order of Sale by Receiver of 504/FMLP Loan Portfolio and Non-SBA Loans; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/26/2014. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Zaro, David) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 987 CLERK'S NOTICE. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 986 REPLY (re #980 MOTION to end permanent injunction MOTION to Dismiss receiver MOTION for Legal Fees MOTION to return all monies received back to the receivership estate ) filed byMark Feathers. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 985 OPPOSITION (re #983 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October 2014 ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 984 RESPONSE (re #980 MOTION to end permanent injunction MOTION to Dismiss receiver MOTION for Legal Fees MOTION to return all monies received back to the receivership estate ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 983 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for October 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 11/24/2014. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 982 Proposed Order re #980 MOTION to end permanent injunction MOTION to Dismiss receiver MOTION for Legal Fees MOTION to return all monies received back to the receivership estate by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 981 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #980 MOTION to end permanent injunction MOTION to Dismiss receiver MOTION for Legal Fees MOTION to return all monies received back to the receivership estate filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #980 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 980 MOTION to end permanent injunction and, MOTION to Dismiss receiver, REQUEST for legal Attorney Fees for jury trial, and for a jury trial, REQUEST for receiver to RETURN all monies received back to the receivership estate filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/28/2014. Replies due by 12/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 memorandum and understanding to motion end permanent injunction)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Filing 979 Received Document declaration R. Peter Griffith. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 978 Received Document from Pingyn Liu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) Modified on 11/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2014 Filing 977 Received Document from Alice A. Hoagland. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014) Modified on 11/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Filing 976 RESPONSE (re #967 MOTION Seventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #966 MOTION Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER granting #964 Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER terminating in part and denying in part #940 Motion for Relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b); denying #973 Motion to Compel. The hearing scheduled for 11/14/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2014 Filing 973 MOTION to Compel to produce documents filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 11/20/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 972 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #950 MOTION re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Effective 1/1/2015, Judge Davila's Civil Law and Motion Practice will be held on Thursdays. Please see the Court's Scheduling Notes for further information at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejd (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 971 Request for Judicial Notice re #950 MOTION filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #950 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 970 OMNIBUS OPPOSITION (re #967 MOTION Seventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #966 MOTION Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application and #968 ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 969 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #967 MOTION Seventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #966 MOTION Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application , #968 Notice (Other), (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 968 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #967 MOTION Seventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #966 MOTION Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 967 MOTION Seventh Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/12/2014. Replies due by 11/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 966 MOTION Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/12/2014. Replies due by 11/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 965 OPPOSITION (re #964 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2014 ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 964 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for September 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 10/27/2014. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 963 Order Denying #962 Motion to Shorten Time for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/16/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 962 MOTION to Shorten Time, MOTION to end the permanent injunction against Mark Feathers re #950 MOTION t filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 11/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 961 Declaration filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 960 Request for Judicial Notice re #957 Opposition/Response to Motion, #950 MOTION re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct #958 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #957 , #950 , #34 , #958 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 959 OMNIBUS REPLY to re #957 Opposition/Response to Motion, #958 Opposition/Response to Motion by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 958 RESPONSE (re #950 MOTION re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/2/2014) Modified on 10/2/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2014 Filing 957 RESPONSE (re #950 MOTION re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER granting #949 Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2014. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED. The total amount of $24,048.50 for August, 2014, loan servicing costs is approved and may be distributed to the Receiver accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 10/2/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Filing 955 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Brian Bulgozdy (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 954 Declaration in Support of #952 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #952 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 952 OPPOSITION (re #949 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2014 ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 953 Proposed Order re #950 MOTION by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 951 Declaration in Support of #950 MOTION re #34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER APPOINTING PERMANENT RECEIVER filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #950 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 950 MOTION for a determination if the receiver has committed an act of gross negligence re #34 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, MOTION to End the Permanent Injunction #34 filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 949 MOTION Receiver's Administrative Motion for Payment of Loan Servicing Costs for August 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 9/22/2014. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 948 Declaration of Mark Feathers filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 947 REPLY (re #940 MOTION to alter or amend judgment filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 946 RESPONSE (re #940 MOTION from summary judgment MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for Discovery ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER RE: HEARING ON SIXTH INTERIM FEE APPLICATIONS. Since there appears to have been some confusion on this issue, the court clarifies for all interested parties that the Sixth Interim Fee Applications #923 , #924 , #925 filed by the Receiver and his counsel were resolved pursuant the court's order filed on 8/7/2014 #936 . Accordingly, to the extent such a directive was not made explicit, the hearing scheduled for 8/22/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Filing 944 STATUS REPORT RECEIVER'S TENTH INTERIM REPORT by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 943 Proposed Order re #940 MOTION from summary judgment MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for Discovery by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 942 Declaration in Support of #940 MOTION from summary judgment MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for Discovery filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #940 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 941 MEMORANDUM in Support re #940 MOTION from summary judgment MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION for Discovery filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #940 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 940 RELIEF from summary judgment, REQUEST of legal fees in the amount of $200,000, REQUEST for Discovery filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/29/2014. Replies due by 9/5/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Thomas A. Seaman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 938 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/01/14, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #937 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2014. (Related documents(s) #937 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 937 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #884 Fifth Interim Fee Application; granting in part and denying in part #885 Fifth Interim Fee Application; denying #889 Motion for Approval of Monthly Budget; granting in part and denying in part #923 Sixth Interim Fee Application; granting in part and denying in part #924 Sixth Interim Fee Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 4, 2014 Filing 935 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 934 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 8/1/2014) re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #925 Notice of Hearing of Hearing filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Matter submitted. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 933 Order denying #704 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2014 Filing 932 Received Document by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 931 RESPONSE (re #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application , #924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 930 Received letter dated 7/20/14 re #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application , #924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 929 Received letter dated 7/19/14 re #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 928 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #927 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #927 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 927 OPPOSITION (re #925 Notice of Hearing of Hearing, #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application , #924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 926 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #925 Notice of Hearing re: re #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application , #924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 925 Notice of Hearing on #923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application #924 Interim Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/23/2014. Replies due by 7/30/2014. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 924 MOTION Sixth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/23/2014. Replies due by 7/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 923 MOTION Receiver's Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/23/2014. Replies due by 7/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 922 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Intervene (Docket Item No. 704) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for July 11, 2014 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission withoutoral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The July 11, 2014 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER of USCA Appellants May 12, 2014 request to issue a temporary stay order or a temporary injunction is denied. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying #910 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2014 Filing 919 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING JUNE 24, 2014 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND COURT TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION: Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (In Re: Dkt. No. #910 ) presently set for 6/24/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal is hereby submitted without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 6/24/2014 hearing is vacated. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2014 Filing 918 REPLY (re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application ) Receiver's Response to Opposition of Natalie Feathers to Fifth Interim Fee Applications of the Receiver and His Professionals filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 30, 2014 Filing 917 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 5/20/14 re: #916 first page is missing. related to #908 Receiver's Ninth Interim Report (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 5/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 Filing 916 OPPOSITION to re #908 Receiver's Ninth Interim Report by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014) Modified on 5/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 Filing 915 RESPONSE to re #913 Opposition/Response to Motion by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 914 REPLY (re #910 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 913 RESPONSE (re #910 MOTION for Sanctions ) against John Bulgozdy, Esq. filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 912 Received Document opposition dated 5/15/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 911 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books filed by Mark Feathers: Mr. Feathers may select 5 boxes of books and records to copy. The Court does not have authority to order a budget. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 909 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #908 Status Report (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 908 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Ninth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Appeal Remark Received notification from USCA re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 05/14/2014. re #900 Notice of Appeal : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 910 MOTION for Sanctions against John Bulgozdy, Esq. filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/28/2014. Replies due by 6/4/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 907 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611014725 re #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER of USCA as to #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 13, 2014 Appeal Remark Received notification from USCA re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 05/13/2014. re #881 Notice of Appeal : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 905 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611014723 re #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 903 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/25/2014, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014. (Related documents(s) #880 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER denying #888 Motion for Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 Filing 904 USCA Case Number 14-15938 9th Circuit Court of Appeals; Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct this deficiency within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute.for #900 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 Filing 901 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 900 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion for Hearing #897 , Order on Motion for Order of Sale #898 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #896 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Order denying #766 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Order granting #762 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Order denying #684 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER partially granting #646 Fourth Interim Fee Application; partially granting #647 Fourth Interim Fee Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 895 Order Granting #894 Motion Cease Electronic Notifications as to California Business Bank. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2014: #1 Certifcate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 Filing 894 MOTION to be deleted from ECF Notifications by California Business Bank (Wright, James) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified text on 5/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF) (counsel selected incorrect event.).
May 7, 2014 Filing 893 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #892 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #892 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 892 OPPOSITION (re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP , #889 MOTION for Approval of Monthly Budget for Loan Servicing Work , #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application , #888 MOTION for Order Shortening Time on Fifth Interim Fee Applications of Receiver and Allen Matkins re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receive ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER PERMITTING RECEIVER'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MAY 16, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #890 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2014 Filing 890 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Motion for Permission to Appear Telephonically at Hearing Set for May 16, 2014 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 889 MOTION Administrative Motion for Approval of Monthly Budget for Loan Servicing Work filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 888 MOTION Administrative Motion for Order Shortening Time on Fifth Interim Fee Applications of Receiver and Allen Matkins re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 887 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #886 MOTION re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application Notice of Hearing o (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 886 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/20/2014. Replies due by 5/27/2014. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014) Modified text on 5/7/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2014 Filing 885 MOTION Fifth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/20/2014. Replies due by 5/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 884 MOTION Receiver's Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/20/2014. Replies due by 5/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 883 USCA Case Number 14-15894 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. Failure to correct this deficiency within 14 days will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The fee is payable to the District Court. for #881 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 882 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 881 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #845 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion for Hearing. #846 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 880 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 879 USCA Case Number 14-15831 9th circuit court of appeals for #872 Notice of Appeal, filed by non-party Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 878 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 54611014674 re #872 Notice of Appeal, correction to #877 filed by Natalie Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2014 Filing 877 *** CLERK'S ERROR *** Appeal Remark re #872 Notice of Appeal: Payment of $505.00 received; receipt number 54611014674. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/29/201. (incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2014 Filing 876 Declaration of Wyatt Allen in the Matter of a Proposed Plan of Reorganization of the Defendant Investment Funds in Support of #875 Follow-On Report filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #875 ) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 875 Follow-On Report to the Court for Mark Feathers Motion for Reorganization of Defendant Investment Funds by Mark Feathers re #684 MOTION for Hearing (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 874 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 4/25/2014) re #684 MOTION for Hearing filed by Mark Feathers, #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker filed by Thomas A. Seaman. The court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 873 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 871 Mark Feathers Response to Receiver's Reply re #860 Opposition/Response to Motion ( #834 ) byMark Feathers. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 870 Notice of Withdrawal of ( #869 ). filed by Mark Feathers (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2014 Filing 872 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Natalie Feathers. Appeal of ORDER granting 741 Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections. #845 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 869 Mark Feathers' Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification of the Court's Order re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Mark Feathers. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 868 Received Document: Natalie Feathers' Notice of Appeal of Court's Second Amended Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objection re #845 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Natalie Feathers. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER of USCA as to #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. Appeal nos. 13-17304 and 14-15466 are related and shall be calendaredtogether. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 21, 2014 Filing 866 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #860 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 865 Received Document - Letter dated 4/5/14 by Investor Huazhen Deng. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 864 Received Document - Letter dated 4/8/14 by Investor Andrew and Donna Lui. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 863 Received Document - Letter dated 4/7/14 by Investor Milton T. Lynch. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 862 Received Document - Letter dated 4/7/14 by Investor William Slocum. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 861 Received Document - Letter dated 4/16/14 by Investor Louis J. Leo, The Leo Family Trust. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 860 RESPONSE (re #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books ) Receiver's Response to Motion of Defendant Mark Feathers for Court to Order Receiver to (1) Provide Copies of Books and Records, and (2) Allocate $25,000 for Accounting Representation filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 859 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Motion Hearing, Advancing #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to Provide Copies of Books: 5/20/2014 Motion Hearing is advanced to 5/16/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 Filing 858 Received Document by Investor Matt Tunney. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 857 Received Document by Investor Howard Gottlieb. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 856 Received Document dated 4/4/14 by Investor Margaret M. Mosko. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 855 Received Document dated 4/4/14 by Investor Sarwan Wason. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 854 Received Document dated 4/4/14 by Investor Lawrence Seidman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 853 Received Document dated 4/4/14 by Investor Lawrence Seidman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 852 Received Document dated 4/4/14 by Investor Walter Bugna. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 851 Received Document dated 4/5/14 by Investor Michael Bird. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 850 Received Document dated 4/7/14 by Investor Steven Corcoran. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 849 Received Document dated 4/5/14 by Investor Gilbert Varnell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 848 Received Document dated 4/6/14 by Investor Nilo Zaratan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 847 Received Document dated 4/7/14 by Investor Jeff Abramson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER RE: PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS denying #716 , #722 , #731 , #745 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER granting #741 Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 Filing 844 Received Document written OBJECTIONS dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker by Leonard Strelzin. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 843 Received Document written OBJECTIONS dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker by Ronald A. Young. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 842 Received Document written OBJECTIONS dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker by Gagnon. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 841 Received Document - written OBJECTIONS dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker by Napoli (son of Elsie). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 840 RESPONSE to re #772 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 839 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 4/7/14 re #836 -3 *** DOCUMENT LOCK *** Exhibit - Identification on Number appears on page 19) (Related document(s) #834 ). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 Filing 838 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Resetting #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books: 5/12/2014 Motion Hearing is reset to 5/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2014: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 Filing 837 Proposed Order re #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 836 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, # 3)*** DOCUMENT LOCK *** Exhibit - Identification Number appears on page 19) (Related document(s) #834 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 Filing 835 MEMORANDUM in Support re #834 MOTION for Court Order to Order Receiver to provide copies of books filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #834 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 834 MOTION for Court to Order Receiver to provide copies of books filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/18/2014. Replies due by 4/25/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER of USCA Appellants requests for relief, filed March 3, 2014, March 6, 2014, and March 31, 2014, are denied. as to #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 833 Received Document written objection dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Schwalbach. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 832 Received Document written objection dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Van Blarigan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 830 REPLY (re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker ) Receiver's Reply in Support of Motion for Approval of Procedures for Sale of Loan Portfolios and SBA Lending Authority filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 829 Received Document - written OBJECTIONS dated 3/20/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Stephen St. Clair. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 828 Received Document - written OBJECTIONS dated 3/18/14 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Stella Liu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 827 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Tai. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 826 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by McDowell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 825 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 by re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Chapman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 824 OPPOSITION (re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker ) correction to #821 opposition filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declarations of Fund Member, #3 Declarations of Fund Member, #4 Declarations of Fund Member, #5 Declaration of Fund Members, #6 Exhibit, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 823 Received Order re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2014 Filing 822 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #821 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #821 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 821 *** CLERK'S ERROR *** pages 8 and 10 missing please see #824 [OPPOSITION (re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale filed by Mark Feathers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration of Fund Members, #3 Declaration of Fund Members, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2014 Filing 820 Received Document letter dated March 26, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Natalie Feathers(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2014 Filing 819 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Potter. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 818 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Luthard. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 817 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Dale. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 809 RESPONSE (re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 816 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Lau. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 815 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by prevedello. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 814 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Winters. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 813 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Wilcox. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 812 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Steil. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 811 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Van Senten. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 810 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Purdy. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 808 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Perrone. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 807 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Patz. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 806 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Nocera. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 805 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Naito. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 804 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Lipovac. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 803 Received Document letter dated March 18, 2014 re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Linders. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 802 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by leef. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 801 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Laurence. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 800 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Johnson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 799 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by hengstler. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 798 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Heaton. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 797 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Gidwani. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 796 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Corcoran. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 795 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Cehovec. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 794 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by bergman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 793 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Benson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 792 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Weisbart. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Filing 791 Received Document letter re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Trembath. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 790 Received Document letter re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Slocum. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 789 Received Document letter re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Rushka. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 788 Received Document letter re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Rubin.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 787 Received Document letter re 762 MOTION for Order of Sale Raineri. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 786 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale Raineri. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 785 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Pieceall. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 784 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Nyberg. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 783 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale McDowell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 782 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale Liu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 781 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by lindner. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 780 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale. by Lenhart (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 779 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale. by Hutchinson (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 778 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale. by Griffith (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 777 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Dalrymple. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 776 Received Document letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale. by Barbieri (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 775 Received letter re #762 MOTION for Order of Sale by Atno. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 774 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #773 Request for Judicial Notice filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #773 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 773 Request for Judicial Notice on misconduct of the receiver and his counsel re #711 Order on Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #711 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 772 RESPONSE (re #766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ) Receiver's Response to Defendant Mark Feathers' Request for a Stay of Distributions filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 771 NOTICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #770 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Withdrawal of Receivers Response to Defendant Mark Feathers' Request for a Stay of Distributions (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 770 RESPONSE (re #766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ) Receiver's Response to Defendant Mark Feathers' Request for a Stay of Distributions filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 769 Proposed Order re #766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 768 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #766 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 767 MEMORANDUM in Support re #766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order granting #628 Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions. filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #766 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 766 MOTION to Stay re #711 Order granting #628 Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions., filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 3/31/2014. Replies due by 4/7/2014. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 765 EXHIBITS - declarations of FUND Members filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Fund Members)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 Filing 764 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 54611014583 re #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Appeal Remark - Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/17/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 763 USCA Case Number 14-15466 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Payment of the $505 docketing and filing fees is past due. for #719 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Filing 762 MOTION for Order of Sale for (A) Approval of Sales Procedures for Loan Portfolios and 7(a) License and (B) Authority to Engage Voit Real Estate Services LP as Broker filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/26/2014. Replies due by 4/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Beauchamp, #2 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2014 Filing 761 RESPONSE (re #722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #745 MOTION for Reconsideration re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections, #714 Order,, #716 MOTION for Reconsideration re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #731 MOTION for Hearing re #293 Declaration in Opposition,MOTION for Reconsideration ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 760 REQUEST for clerk to remove court docket re #751 Received Document, by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2014 Filing 759 Received Document re #750 Received Document, by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 758 Received Document re #755 amended opposition, by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 757 Proposed Order re #417 Received Document by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 756 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #755 amended opposition, filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #755 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 755 AMENDED OPPOSITION to re #743 Opposition/Response to Motion, #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 754 REPLY (re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) Response to Oppositions to Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 753 Declaration of Natalie Feathers in Support of #752 Response, filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #752 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 752 RESPONSE to OPPOSITION (re #704 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byNatalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration's of fund members, #2 Declaration's of fund members, #3 Declaration's of fund members)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 751 Received Document re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 750 Received Document re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 749 Received Document by Natalie Feathers requesting reconsideration of #714 ORDER. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 748 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #714 Order, [626 filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #714 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 747 Declaration of Natalie Feathers in Support of #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #741 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 746 DECLARATION of Natalie Feathers in Opposition to #734 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #734 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 745 MOTION for Reconsideration re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections, #714 Order, #626 Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 Filing 744 Declaration in Support of #743 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #743 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 743 OPPOSITION (re #741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 742 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/14/2014, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #709 , #703 , #702 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 741 MOTION to Amend/Correct #714 Order, Administrative Motion for Entry of Second Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 3/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 740 Remark - Abstract of Judgment issued against Mark Feathers in the amount of $10,000.00 Penalty (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 739 Remark - Abstract of Judgment Issued against Defendant Mark Feathers in the amount disgorgement of $7,497,402.51, plus prejudgment interest totaling $285,558.56, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 738 Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission enclosing two Abstract of Judgment. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 737 RESPONSE (re #731 MOTION for Hearing re #293 Declaration in Opposition,MOTION for Reconsideration ) Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman in Response to Motion of Defendant Mark Feathers for Certain Motion Hearing Dates and Leave to Seek Reconsideration filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 736 RESPONSE (re #722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ) Receiver's Opposition to Feathers' Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration and Clarification of This Court's Order [Dkt. No. 711] Re: Receiver's Plan of distributions [Dkt. No. 628] filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 735 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re #734 Opposition/Response to Motion (Proof of Service of Opposition to Motion to Intervene on Natalie Feathers) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 734 OPPOSITION (re #704 MOTION to Intervene ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2014 Filing 733 Proposed Order re #731 MOTION for Hearing re #293 Declaration in Opposition,MOTION for Reconsideration by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 732 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #731 MOTION for Hearing re #293 Declaration in Opposition, MOTION for Leave to File filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #731 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 731 REQUEST for Motion Hearing Date, for reconsideration of allowing to initiate a Lawsuit in State Court re #293 Declaration in Opposition, and to REQUEST to schedule a Motion Hearing Date for the Dismissal of the Receiver, REQUEST for Reconsideration its prior approvals of the Receiver's request for payments filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014) Modified on 3/5/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 730 Remark - Abstract Issued against Defendant Mark Feathers County of Kauai, Hawaii in the amount of $300,000.00. related to #622 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified on 3/4/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 729 Remark - Abstract Issued against Defendant Mark Feathers, County of Santa Clara, in the amount of $300,000.00. related to #622 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) Modified on 3/4/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Filing 728 Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission dated 2/28/14 enclosing two Abstract of Judgment's. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER denying #705 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2014 Filing 726 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Feathers re #721 Notice (Other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 725 Proposed Order re #722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 724 Declarations of fund members in Support of #722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #722 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 723 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #722 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 722 MOTION for Reconsideration re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 721 NOTICE of pendency of action by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 720 RESPONSE (re #705 MOTION to Shorten Time ) on Motion to Intervene filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 719 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #710 , Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #711 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 718 Proposed Order re #716 MOTION for Reconsideration re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 717 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #716 MOTION for Reconsideration re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #716 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 716 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarification re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 AMENDED ORDER Granting #628 Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 AMENDED ORDER Granting #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 Filing 713 Proposed Order re #711 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Distribution Plan and Authorizing Interim Distributions by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 712 Proposed Order re #710 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Amended [Proposed] Order Approving Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Order granting #628 Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Order granting #626 Motion to approve omnibus and specific claim objections. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2014 Filing 709 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 708 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #704 MOTION to Intervene, #705 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #704 , #705 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 707 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #704 MOTION to Intervene, #705 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #704 , #705 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 706 NOTICE/ERRATA of Hearing on Motion re #704 , #705 by Natalie Feathers Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 705 MOTION to Shorten Time re: #704 filed by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 704 MOTION to Intervene filed by Natalie Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/10/2014. Replies due by 3/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 703 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Thomas A. Seaman for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 702 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez #698 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 701 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #700 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #700 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 700 Request for Judicial Notice re #628 Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #628 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 699 RESPONSE to re #695 Opposition/Response to Motion, #694 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #684 MOTION for Hearing by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 698 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 2/14/2014) re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Matter submitted. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 697 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing TIME for Motion Hearing.Set/Reset Deadlines as to #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections , #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver . Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 696 STATUS REPORT Further Status Report on Discussions Between Receiver and U.S. Small Business Administration Relating to Claims Motion and Distribution Motion by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 695 RESPONSE (re #684 MOTION for Hearing ) Opposition to Defendant Mark Feathers' Motion for Court Hearing to Discuss a Reorganization of Investors Prime Fund, LLC and Related Entities filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 694 RESPONSE (re #684 MOTION for Hearing ) to discuss a reorganization filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 693 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #692 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #692 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 692 OPPOSITION to re #689 Status Report by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER denying #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2014: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2014 Filing 690 RESPONSE (re #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 689 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Eighth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #684 MOTION for Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 688 MEMORANDUM in Support re #684 MOTION for Hearing filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #684 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark Feathers, #2 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 686 Proposed Order re #684 MOTION for Hearing by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 685 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #684 MOTION for Hearing filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #684 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 684 MOTION AND NOTICE MOTION for Court Hearing to Discuss a Reorganizing of investors Prime Fund, LLC and Related Entities filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified texton 1/29/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 683 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections , #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 682 Request for Judicial Notice and Reply to the Receiver's Status Report on Ongoing Discussions Between Receiver and US Small Business Administration Relating to Claims Motion and Distribution Motion re #680 Brief, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #680 ) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 681 Declaration of Mark Feathers Accompanying Response to Receiver's Report to The Court and Request for Judicial Notice #680 Brief, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #680 ) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 680 Brief re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections Status Report on Ongoing Discussions Between Receiver and U.S. Small Business Administration Relating to Claims Motion and Distribution Motion filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Related document(s) #628 , #626 ) (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 679 Letter dated 12/20/13 from Zafar Shaikh. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 678 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #675 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bui, Kim) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 677 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 676 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Paul Ormond (Ormond, Richard) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER granting #663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER partially granting #607 Third Interim Fee Application; partially granting #608 Third Interim Fee Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/19/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2013 Filing 673 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 672 MANDATE of USCA as to #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 671 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Feathers re #668 Opposition/Response to Motion, #669 Declaration in Support, #670 Proposed Order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 670 Proposed Order re #663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 669 Declaration in Support of #668 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #668 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 668 OPPOSITION (re #663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 2)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by James Benton Wright (Wright, James) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 666 Declaration in Support of #665 opposition addendum, filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #665 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 665 Addendum re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #653 Opposition/Response to Motion, #659 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #646 , #653 , #659 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 664 REPLY (re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) Reply to Opposition of California Business Bank to: (1) Motion to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections; and (2) Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ex Parte Application for Authority to Pursue and Settle Claims Against Certain Third Parties; Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman in Support Thereof, #4 Unredacted Version of Ex Parte Application for Authority to Pursue and Settle Claims Against Certain Third Parties; Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman in Support Thereof, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bui, Kim) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER terminating without prejudice #645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Receiver's motion to file under seal does not comply with the revised local rule. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Filing 657 REPLY (re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions ) Reply to Responses to Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Seaman, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 656 RESPONSE (re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) / Opposition to (1) Receiver's Motions to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections; and (2) Limited Opposition to Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed byCalifornia Business Bank. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Aman, Kalley) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 661 Received Document from Pingyu Liu, Phd dated 12/9/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 660 Declaration in Support of #659 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #659 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 659 RESPONSE (re #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 658 Received Document by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 655 REPLY (re #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 654 Declaration in Support of #653 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #653 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 653 RESPONSE (re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 652 Proposed Order re #645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 651 Declaration in Support of #650 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #650 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 650 OPPOSITION (re #645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver , #648 MOTION Notice of Hearing on Interim Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Applicat (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 648 Notice of Motion Hearing re #646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application , #647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/18/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified text on 12/4/2013,(incorrect event selected) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 647 MOTION Fourth Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/18/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 646 MOTION Receiver's Fourth Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/18/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Receiver Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bui, Kim) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 644 Letter dated 11/25/13 to Mr. Bulgozdy. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 643 Declaration in Support of #642 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #642 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 642 OPPOSITION (re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 641 Received Document - opposition filed by non party Dr. Stephan Hengstler. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 640 Received Document - declarations by Natalie Feathers. *** Please note *** Natalie Feathers is not a party to this action, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 639 Received Document - opposition by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) *** please note *** Natalie Feathers is not a party to this action, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified text on 12/2/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 Filing 638 Declaration in Support of #637 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #637 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 637 RESPONSE (re #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 636 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Small Business Administration (Adams, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 635 Declaration in Support of #634 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byU.S. Small Business Administration. (Related document(s) #634 ) (Adams, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 634 RESPONSE (re #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions ) Opposition filed byU.S. Small Business Administration. (Adams, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 633 Declaration of Brent Ciurlino in Support of #632 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byU.S. Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Creditor Claim of U.S. Small Business Administration))(Related document(s) #632 ) (Adams, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 632 RESPONSE (re #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections ) Opposition filed byU.S. Small Business Administration. (Adams, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER granting #630 Motion to Shorten Time. The Claims Motion and Distribution Plan Motion are hereby set for hearing on 1/31/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #628 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions , #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 630 MOTION to Shorten Time Administrative Motion for Order Shortening Time on (1) Motion to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections [Docket No. 626]; and (2) Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authority to Make Interim Distributions [Docket No. 628] filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 629 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 628 Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan and Authorization to Make Interim Distributions filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/3/2013. Replies due by 12/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 2/20/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2013 Filing 627 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions for Interim Fee Applications(Docket Item Nos. #607 , #608 , #609 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 11/22/2013 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 11/22/2013 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013) Modified text on 11/18/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2013 Filing 626 MOTION to Approve Omnibus and Specific Claim Objections filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/2/2013. Replies due by 12/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 625 USCA Case Number 13-17304 for #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #609 MOTION Notice of Hearing on Interim Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counse (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 623 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. #591 , Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction #622 (Appeal fee of $455 paid.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Order granting in part and denying in part #602 Motion for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Remedies. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 621 RESPONSE to re #618 Status Report by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER of USCA as to #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 619 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2013 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 10/22/2013) re #602 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Remedies against Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The Court took the motion under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 618 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Seventh Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 617 REPLY (re #602 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Remedies against Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 616 Received letter from Pingyu Liu PhD dated 10/1/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 613 RESPONSE to re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, #607 MOTION Receiver's Third Interim Fee Application by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 615 Declaration of Mark Feathers filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 614 RESPONSE (re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, #609 Notice of Hearing on Interim Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals re #608 MOTION filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 612 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 611 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Feathers for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 610 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, #609 MOTION Notice of Hearing on Interim Fee Applications for Approval and Payment of Compensation to Receiver and His Professionals re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counse, #607 MOTION Receiver's Third Interim Fee Application (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 609 Notice of Motion Hearing re #608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, #607 MOTION Receiver's Third Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified on 12/4/2013,(incorrect event selected.)
September 20, 2013 Filing 608 MOTION Third Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 607 MOTION Receiver's Third Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified text on 9/20/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF)(x2).
September 20, 2013 Filing 606 *** DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE 607 *** MOTION Receiver's Third Interim Fee Application filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified text on 9/20/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2013 Filing 605 Received Letter from Stanley M. Johnson regarding K-1 forms. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 604 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #603 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #603 ) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 603 RESPONSE (re #602 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Remedies against Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed byMark Feathers. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 602 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Remedies against Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/20/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy, #2 Declaration of Sarah Mitchell, #3 Proposed Order)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 601 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/23/2013, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2013. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 600 Received letter dated 8/29/13 from J. Robert Gilroy, President of First West Capital Corporation.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 599 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 598 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/28/2013, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2013. (Related documents(s) #597 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 597 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 596 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 54611014083 re #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Appeal Remark - Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00. Date paid: 09/04/2013. re #593 Notice of Appeal, : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The court finds that a pretrial conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 9/13/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/30/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 594 USCA Case Number 13-16743 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #593 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 593 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Mark Feathers. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. #591 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER RE: PENDING MOTIONS denying #389 Motion to Intervene; denying #488 Motion to Appoint Expert Witness; denying #527 Motion Allocate Additional Funds; denying #571 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #577 Motion for Leave to Initiate Lawsuit ; denying #588 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The motion hearings scheduled for 8/23/2013 and 9/27/2013 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/19/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER denying #459 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #459 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #459 Defendants' Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; granting #477 Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing on proposed relief scheduled for 10/22/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/16/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/16/2013 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER partially granting #338 Receiver's Second Interim Fee Application; partially granting #339 Second Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis, General Counsel to the Receiver. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/16/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Filing 589 OPPOSITION (re #588 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 588 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Extend Expert Cut-Off, #2 Declaration of Lynn Dean in support of Motion to Extend Expert Cut-Off, #3 Proposed Order regarding Motion to Extend Expert Cut-Off)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 587 OPPOSITION (re #577 MOTION for leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 586 OMNIBUS REPLY (re #577 MOTION for leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 585 RESPONSE (re #577 MOTION for leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman ) Receiver's Response to Defendant Mark Feathers' Request for Leave to Sue Receiver in State Court filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 584 RESPONSE (re #577 MOTION for leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 583 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #582 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #582 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2013: #1 Exhibit tax return 2007 -, #2 Exhibit tax return 2008 -, #3 Exhibit tax return 2010) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2013: #4 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 582 REPLY (re #571 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 581 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Sixth Interim Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 580 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #531 MOTION for Protective Order: The court denies defendant's motion for protective order. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Filing 579 RESPONSE (re #571 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 578 Proposed Order re #577 MOTION for leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 577 REQUEST for Leave to Initiate a Lawsuit in State Court against Thomas A. Seaman filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 8/2/2013. Replies due by 8/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 576 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #514 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Mark Feathers: The court makes ruling from the bench. The court denies plaintiff's motion for sanctions. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/3/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***July Pretrial Conference Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #566 Motion Strike Improperly Filed Documents. Docket Nos. 563, 563-1, 564, 565, and 565-1 are STRICKEN. Natalie Feathers is not a party to this action, Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/2/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2013 Filing 573 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #571 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #571 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 572 MEMORANDUM in Support re #571 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #571 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 571 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/25/2013. Replies due by 8/1/2013. (no signature on document) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 570 Declaration of Natalie Feathers re: #557 filed by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 1st report)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 569 Declaration of M. Feathers in Support of #568 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #568 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 568 RESPONSE to re #557 Status Report by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 4, #3 6)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 567 REQUEST to Withdraw #564 Declaration in Support, #565 Response ( Non Motion ), #563 Response filed by Natalie Feathers. Responses due by 7/24/2013. Replies due by 7/31/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 566 MOTION Administrative Motion to Strike Improperly Filed Docket Numbers 563, 563-1, 564, 565, and 565-1 re #564 Declaration in Support, #565 Response ( Non Motion ), #563 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 7/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 565 AMENDED OPPOSITION to re #557 Status Report by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 Filing 564 Declaration of Natalie Feathers of #557 Status Report, #563 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Natalie Feathers. (Related document(s) #557 , #563 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 Filing 563 *** FILED IN ERROR *** please see #565 amended OPPOSITION by Natalie Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013) Modified on 7/5/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Filing 562 REPLY (re #527 MOTION to allocate $15,000 from the assets of the receivership ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Filing 561 REPLY (re #531 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 28, 2013 Filing 560 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2013 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 6/28/2013) re #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION filed by Thomas A. Seaman, #295 MOTION for enjoinder of parties or dismissal of action filed by Mark Feathers, #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order filed by Mark Feathers. The Court took theReceiver's motion for Second Interim Fee Application without oral argument. The Court took the cross motions for summary judgment under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further on submitted motions and continuing case deadlines. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER denying Defendant Mark Feathers' Motion for Enjoinder #295 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 *** FILED IN ERROR. PDF DOES NOT CONTAIN SIGNATURE PLEASE SEE #559 ORDER denying Defendant Mark Feathers' Motion for Enjoinder of Parties #295 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified text on 6/28/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2013 Filing 557 STATUS REPORT Receiver's Forensic Accounting Report by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting #542 Administrative Motion for Order Clarifying Authority to Transfer Whiskey Junction, LLC Alcoholic Beverage License. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/27/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER RE: #527 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONTINUATION OF LIVING EXPENSES. The hearing before Judge Grewal scheduled for 7/15/2013 is VACATED. This court will decide the matter, and finds it suitable for decision without a hearing pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Defendants motion will be deemed submitted for decision upon conclusion of the briefing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Filing 554 RESPONSE (re #531 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 553 RESPONSE (re #527 MOTION to allocate $15,000 from the assets of the receivership ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 552 Received Document letter from Pingyu Liu, PhD dated 6/13/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 551 OPPOSITION (re #542 MOTION Administrative Motion Under Local Rule 7-11; Request for Order Clarifying Authority to Transfer Whiskey Junction, LLC Alcoholic Beverage License ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 549 Supplemental Brief re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER Supplement to Second Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver (Docket No. 339) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #339 ) (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 550 DECLARATION of Wyatt Allen in RESPONSE (re #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 548 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/11/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2013. (Related documents(s) #540 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER RE MOTION TO MODIFY DEPOSITION DEADLINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #544 Motion (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #539 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Second Interim Fee Application. Such pleadings shall be filed no later than 6/24/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/19/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2013 Filing 545 Statement of Non-Opposition re #544 MOTION to modify court order for scheduled deposition date of Natalie Feathers filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #544 ) (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 544 MOTION to modify court order filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 7/2/2013. Replies due by 7/9/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 543 REPLY (re #514 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 542 MOTION Administrative Motion Under Local Rule 7-11; Request for Order Clarifying Authority to Transfer Whiskey Junction, LLC Alcoholic Beverage License filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 6/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 541 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/10/2013, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 email: Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. (Related documents(s) #505 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 540 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 539 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Under Local Rule 7-11; Request for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Second Interim Fee Application of Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 6/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 538 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Magistrate Judge Cousins on 6/13/2013. Case did not settle. Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2013 10:30 AM for telephonic status with defendant. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2013)
June 13, 2013 Filing 537 REPLY (re #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Against Defendant Mark Feathers filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal finding as moot #405 Motion ; denying #414 Motion ; denying #446 Motion to Compel; denying #450 Motion for Protective Order; granting #464 Motion for Protective Order; granting #499 Motion to Compel; granting #506 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Filing 535 Declaration of Mark Feathers re: #513 Opposition/Response to Motion, #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #513 , #488 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 534 RESPONSE to re #513 Opposition/Response to Motion, #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 533 ERRATA re #526 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 532 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #531 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #531 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 531 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/26/2013. Replies due by 7/3/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 530 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #405 , #414 , #446 , #450 , #464 , #506 and #499 : Court to issue order after hearing. 6/18/2013 Motion Hearing (In Re: Docket No. #499 ) is VACATED. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2013) Modified on 6/11/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 529 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re #405 , #414 , #446 , #450 , #464 , #506 and #499 : Court to issue order after hearing. 6/18/2013 Motion Hearing (In Re: Docket No. #499 ) is VACATED. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 528 Declaration of Mark Feathers re: #514 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #514 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 527 MOTION to allocate $15,000 from the assets of the receivership filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/25/2013. Replies due by 7/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 526 OPPOSITION (re #514 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: #2 Exhibit 2-4) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: #3 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 525 Letter from Mark Feathers dated 6/11/13 re: docket numbers #509 , #511 , #512 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 524 Declaration of Natalie Feathers re: #523 OPPOSITION re: #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed Natalie Feathers. (Related document(s) #506 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 523 OPPOSITION reply to (re #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 522 MEMORANDUM to OPPOSITION (re #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers ) filed by Natalie Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 521 Declaration of Mark Feathers re: #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #506 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 520 MEMORANDUM in opposition (re #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 519 OPPOSITION (re #506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE of the receiver, Thomas Seaman and his counsel at the Settlement Conference scheduled for 6/13/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/10/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Set Hearing #405 MOTION request copies of all information on the receivership properties in San Leandro, CA and Holt CA, #464 MOTION for Protective Order, #414 MOTION for an order and #450 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER RE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #507 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 Filing 516 ERRATA re #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 Filing 515 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #514 Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Against Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 Filing 514 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/21/2013. Replies due by 6/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean and Exhibits 1-6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9-10, #6 Exhibit 11-14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16-18, #9 Exhibit 19-32, #10 Exhibit 33-40 and Proof of Service, #11 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 513 RESPONSE (re #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER denying #496 Motion for Leave to File; denying #497 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 512 Declaration in Support of #511 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #511 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 511 RESPONSE to re #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 509 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to re #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment , and related submissions #478 Declaration in Support, #483 Declaration in Support,, #479 Declaration in Support, #482 Declaration in Support, #481 Declaration in Support, by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit cont) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #9 Exhibit, #10 Errata cont, #11 Exhibit cont) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #12 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit cont) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #17 Exhibit 11) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/11/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME (AS MODIFIED BY COURT) by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #500 Motion to Shorten Time (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 507 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 506 MOTION to Compel the Videotaped Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 6/20/2013. Replies due by 6/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean, #3 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Securities and Exchange Commission for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 504 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #486 Opposition/Response to Motion, #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #486 , #459 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 503 OBJECTIONS to re #486 Opposition/Response to Motion, #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 502 REPLY (re #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order ) filed by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 501 RESPONSE (re #500 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Mark Feathers, #499 MOTION to Compel Document Production from Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 500 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #499 Motion to Compel Document Production from Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/3/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2013 Filing 499 MOTION to Compel Document Production from Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Grewal . Responses due by 6/17/2013. Replies due by 6/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean and Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9-17, #3 Proposed Order)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 6/3/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 498 Received Document - Letter dated 5/24/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 497 REQUEST for Leave to File motion for legal fees filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 496 MOTION for Leave to File to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Partially Granting Interim Fee Applications (Docket No. 463) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 495 RESPONSE to by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER terminating #485 Motion for Reconsideration. The Motion is TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to being re-filed only after obtaining leave of court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/29/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 Filing 494 AMENDED REPLY (re #446 MOTION to Compel ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 Filing 493 REPLY (re #446 MOTION to Compel ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 486 RESPONSE (re #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 485 MOTION for Reconsideration re #463 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Order Partially Granting Interim Fee Applications filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 491 Proposed Order re #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 490 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #488 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM in Support re #488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #488 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 488 MOTION for the court to appoint expert witness filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 487 Received Document Exhibits A by Joe S. Cecil Ph.D. and Thomas E. Willging members of the staff in the Research Division of the Federal Judicial Center, Washington, D.C.,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER PERMITTING RECEIVER'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT 6/11/2013 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #475 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2013 Filing 483 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 172, #2 Exhibit # 173 to 174, #3 Exhibit # 175 to 176, #4 Exhibit # 177, #5 Exhibit # 178 and 180, #6 Exhibit # 181 to 182, #7 Exhibit # 183 to 184, #8 Exhibit # 185 to 186, #9 Exhibit # 187, 188, 192, 215, and 216, #10 Exhibit # 217 to 219, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 482 Declaration of David Gruebele in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 3, 56, 69, 73, 74, 76, and 79, #2 Exhibit 80, 98, 100, 104, 105, 109, 112, and 117, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 481 Declaration of Robert Morris in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 118 to 123, #2 Exhibit # 124 to 131, #3 Exhibit # 132 to 141, #4 Exhibit # 142 to 147, #5 Exhibit # 148 to 153, #6 Exhibit # 154 to 159, #7 Exhibit # 160 to 163, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 480 Declaration in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 1 to 15, #2 Exhibit # 16 to 25, #3 Exhibit # 26 to 27, #4 Exhibit # 28 to 45, #5 Exhibit # 46 to 58, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 479 Declaration of Sarah Mitchell in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 478 Declaration of Barbara Bushee in Support of #477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #477 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 477 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/6/2013. Replies due by 6/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 476 CLERKS NOTICE. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 475 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Motion for Permission to Appear Telephonically at Hearing Set for June 11, 2013 filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 474 RESPONSE to REPLY (re #464 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/22/13. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 472 RESPONSE (re #464 MOTION for Protective Order ) Receiver's Response to Defendant Mark Feathers' Ex Parte Motion for Protective Court Order Instructing Plaintiff to File Certain Pleadings Under Seal Under Local Rules 7-2, 7-12, And 79-5 and Request for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Under FRCP 11 filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 471 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean in Support of #470 Opposition/Response to Motion to Compel filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #470 ) (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 470 RESPONSE (re #446 MOTION to Compel ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 469 CLERKS NOTICE Advancing Motions for Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #295 MOTION for enjoinder of parties or dismissal of action, #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION , #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER : Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 468 RESPONSE (re #464 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE AND EX PARTE MOTIONS re #405 MOTION request copies of all information on the receivership properties in San Leandro, CA and Holt CA filed by Mark Feathers, #464 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mark Feathers, #414 MOTION for an order filed by Mark Feathers, #450 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mark Feathers. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 20, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Filing 466 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #464 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #464 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 465 MEMORANDUM in Support re #464 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #464 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 464 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 5/30/2013. Replies due by 6/6/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting in part #134 Motion; granting in part #135 Motion; granting in part #136 Motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2013 Filing 462 MEMORANDUM re: (re #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Errata) #461 MEMORANDUM (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013) Modified on 5/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 461 MEMORANDUM in Support re #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #459 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2013: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Errata 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2013: #14 Exhibit B) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 460 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #459 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for an Order filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #459 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 459 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for an Order filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/28/2013. Replies due by 6/4/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than 6/26/2013. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Cousins Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER denying #329 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Order Granting Receiver Thomas Seamans Motion for Order Instructing Defendant Mark Feathers to Terminate Insurance Policy and Turn Over Cash Value #177 ; Denying Defendant Mark Feathers Second Amended Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions #275 ; Granting Receiver Thomas Seamans Motion for Authorization to Sell Properties #419 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Filing 455 MOTION ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12) filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Responses due by 5/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 Filing 454 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2013 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 5/10/2013) re #275 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for an order to instruct receiver to discontinue forensic and all other work filed by Mark Feathers, #419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC filed by Thomas A. Seaman. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED Defendant Mark Feathers Second Amended Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Sanctions and Motion for Order (Docket Item No. 275). For the reasons stated on the record the Court GRANTED the Motion for Authorization to Sell Property (Docket Item No. 419). Please see the Court's transcript of proceedings for the Court's ruling. The Court to issue further order on previously submitted motions Docket Item No. 134, 135, 16, 177. Fact Discovery Deadline 07/03/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement Due 07/16/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference 07/26/2013. Expert Discovery Deadline and Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions Deadline 08/23/2013. ***5/10/2013 Deadlines terminated. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 453 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean in Support of #452 Opposition/Response to Motion for Protective Order for Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #452 ) (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 452 RESPONSE (re #450 MOTION for Protective Order ) for Deposition of Natalie Feathers filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 449 Proposed Order re #446 MOTION to Compel by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 448 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #446 MOTION to Compel filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #446 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM in Support re #446 MOTION to Compel filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #446 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 446 MOTION to Compel filed by Mark Feathers. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 5/21/2013. Replies due by 5/28/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 443 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen D. Pahl re #389 MOTION to Intervene (Pahl, Stephen) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 441 REPLY TO DEFENDANT MARK FEATHERS' OPPOSITION TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO (A) SELL NATOMA PROPERTY; (B) SELL SWEET FINGERS PROPERTY; (C) SELL WHISKEY JUNCTION PROPERTY; AND (D) ACCEPT DISCOUNTED PAYOFF FROM THE FOUR BROTHERS INNS, LLC filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 5/7/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 Filing 440 REPLY (re #389 MOTION to Intervene ) by Stephen D. Pahl filed byStephen D. Pahl. (Pahl, Stephen) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #429 Order on Ex Parte Application: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Correcting time for hearing from 10:00 AM to 9:00 AM) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 445 ERRATA re #419 Accept Note Payoff by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 444 Declaration of Mark Feathers #442 Response filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #442 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 442 RESPONSE to re #430 ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER LOCAL RULE 7-11; REQUEST FOR ORDERS FOR RECEIVER TO PROVIDE DEFENDANT WITH FINANCIAL INFORMATION ON THE ENTITIES OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2013: #2 Exhibit C) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/7/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 439 Declaration of Mark Feathers filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 438 REPLY (re #419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2013: #1 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Filing 437 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy in Support of #436 Opposition/Response to Motion to Intervene filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #436 ) (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 436 RESPONSE (re #389 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 435 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #434 Response filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #434 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 434 REPLY to re #389 MOTION to Intervene by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2013: #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 Filing 433 RESPONSE (re #389 MOTION to Intervene ) Declaration of David Zaro in Response to Application for Leave to Intervene Filed by Stephen D., Pahl filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaro, David) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 432 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #431 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #431 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 431 RESPONSE to the receivers fifth interim report #386 by Mark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: #2 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 Filing 430 RESPONSE (re #414 MOTION for an order ) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARK FEATHERS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER LOCAL RULE 7-11; REQUEST FOR ORDERS FOR RECEIVER TO PROVIDE DEFENDANT WITH FINANCIAL INFORMATION ON THE ENTITIES OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Granting #420 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Property. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 26, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC : Opposition due by 5/3/2013. Reply due by 5/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013) Modified text on 5/7/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Filing 451 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #450 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #450 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 450 MOTION for Protective Order quashing the notice of deposition for Natalie Feathers. filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 5/9/2013. Replies due by 5/16/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 428 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #427 Reply to Opposition/Response, #426 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 427 REPLY (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/25/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Filing 426 REPLY (re #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION ) REPLY TO DEFENDANT MARK FEATHERS' OPPOSITION TO RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 425 Received Document Linders. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 424 Received Document from F. M. Sheng. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC , #420 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on Motion for Authority to: (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; (C) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 422 Received Document Blarigan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 421 Received Document from J. Van Blarigan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 420 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on #419 Motion for Authority to: (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; (C) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC filed by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/24/2013) Modified on 4/25/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2013 Filing 419 MOTION for Authorization to (A) Sell Natoma Property; (B) Sell Whiskey Junction Property; (C) Sell Sweet Fingers Property; and (D) Accept Discounted Payoff of Loan to The Four Brothers Inns, LLC filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/8/2013. Replies due by 5/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Seaman, #2 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 418 Received Document Richard Wilcox. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 417 Received Document R. Wilcox. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 416 Proposed Order re #414 MOTION for an order by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 415 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #414 MOTION for an order filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #414 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 414 MOTION for orders requesting for financial information on the ENTITIES OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 5/8/2013. Replies due by 5/15/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013) Modified on 4/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2013 Filing 413 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #340 Notice (Other), (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Filing 412 RESPONSE (re #405 MOTION request copies of all information on the receivership properties in San Leandro, CA and Holt CA ) filed byThomas A. Seaman. (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting #357 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2013 Filing 410 Received Document from Walter Bugna. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 409 Received Document by Yi Qun Zhou. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 408 Declaration in Support of #407 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #407 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 407 REPLY (re #357 MOTION to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 406 Declaration in Support of #405 MOTION request copies of all information on the receivership properties in San Leandro, CA and Holt CA filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #405 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 405 MOTION request copies of all information on the receivership properties in San Leandro, CA and Holt CA filed by Mark Feathers. Responses due by 5/3/2013. Replies due by 5/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 404 Received Document from C. Wu. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 403 Received Document by R. A. Benson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 402 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #399 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #399 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 401 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #400 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Mark Feathers. (Related document(s) #400 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 400 opposition (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 399 OPPOSITION (re #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 398 RESPONSE (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER , #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION ) Consolidated Response to Second Interim Fee Applications filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 397 Received Document by H.G. Cooper. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 396 Received Document by Nyberg. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 395 Received Document by J. Lipovac. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 394 Received Document by B. Rubin. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 393 Received Document by Z. Shaikh. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 392 Received Document by J. Kern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Marie Dean (Dean, Lynn) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen D. Pahl re #389 MOTION to Intervene on Parties Not Receiving Notice via Email (Pahl, Stephen) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 389 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stephen D. Pahl. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/1/2013. Replies due by 5/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen D. Pahl in support of Application for Leave to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order for Leave to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order for Administrative Relief Under Rule 7-11)(Pahl, Stephen) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 388 Received Document by M. D. McDowell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 387 Received Document from R. R. Mdowell re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 386 STATUS REPORT RECEIVER'S FIFTH INTERIM REPORT by Thomas A. Seaman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 385 Declaration of Mark Feathers in Support of #329 MOTION for approval of awarding of legal fees paid for defendant Mark Feathers filed byMark Feathers. (Related document(s) #329 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 384 REPLY (re #329 MOTION for approval of awarding of legal fees paid for defendant Mark Feathers ) filed byMark Feathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 383 Received Document from A. A. Hoagland re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 382 Received Document from Phillip Bach re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 381 Received Document from E. M. Napoli re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 380 Received Document from B. Naito re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 379 Received Document from A. T. Rainer re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 378 Received Document from K. F. A. Patz re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 377 Received Document from T. Lee re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 376 Received Document from N. Perrone re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 375 Received Document from R. P. Griffith re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 374 Received Document from K. J. Smith re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2013 Filing 373 Received Document from Elizabeth Cehovec re: #340 . (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 372 RESPONSE (re #329 MOTION for approval of awarding of legal fees paid for defendant Mark Feathers ) filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER STRIKING #365 , #366 , #367 , #368 , #369 , #370 IMPROPERLY FILED PLEADINGS. These Oppositions were filed by non-parties to this litigation without leave of court. Accordingly, they are STRICKEN. The clerk shall not file any additional similar documents presented by non-parties. Instead, the clerk shall designate such documents as received in the same manner a letter. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 370 OPPOSITION (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER #340 ) filed by: party Walter Patapoff. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 369 OPPOSITION (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER #340 ) filed by party Scott Hutchinson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 368 OPPOSITION (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER ) filed by party L. J. Napoli. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 367 OPPOSITION (re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER #340 ) filed by party Dr. Frank Napoli. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 366 OPPOSITION (re #339 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION ) #340 filed by party Syd and Joyce Raineri (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 365 OPPOSITION #340 (re #339 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION ) filed by party John R. Lindner (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #307 Motion for Authority to Accept Payoff of Construction Loan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER denying #303 , #304 , #308 , #316 , #318 , #320 , #323 Defendant's Pending Administrative Motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #311 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration and Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #322 Motion for Order Authorizing Receiver to Pursue Claims against California Business Bank and its Directors and Officers. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 360 Letter from Elizabeth Cehovec dated 4/8/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND SET HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MARK FEATHERS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting #358 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2013: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2013 Filing 358 NOTICE of Administrative MOTION to Shorten Time and Set Hearing on Plaintiff's #357 Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Shorten Time)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2013 Filing 357 MOTION to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 4/23/2013. Replies due by 4/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Mark Feathers)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 9, 2013 Filing 356 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY of #354 NOTICE (other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 9, 2013 Filing 355 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY of #351 NOTICE (other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 354 *** CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY *** NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re #351 Notice (Other), Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Shorten Time and Set Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Administrative Motion and Motion to Shorten Time)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2013 Filing 353 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #357 Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified text on 4/9/2013,(incorrect event selected) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/9/2013,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2013 Filing 352 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy in Support of #357 MOTION to compel videotaped deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #351 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified text on 4/9/2013,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2013 Filing 351 *** CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY *** NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Motion and Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Defendant Mark Feathers (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Videotaped Deposition of Mark Feathers)(Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2013 Filing 350 Letter from Zafar Shaikh. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 349 REPLY to #327 #328 (re #320 MOTION to have the court instruct the receiver to provide bar claims forms to harmed small business borrowers of the defendants ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 348 REPLY to #343 (re #323 MOTION directing plaintiff to discontinue harassment of defendant until determination on a award for legal fees ) filed byMark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 347 REPLY to #309 (re #303 MOTION receiver's and the commission's failures to notify the court the receiver may have regulatory conflicts of interest ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 346 REPLY to #314 (re #308 MOTION relief on plaintiff's deposition on defendant ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 Filing 345 REPLY #310 response (re #304 MOTION for court orders requiring the receiver to submit a request to engage professionals and to disengage such services until receiving court approval ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 344 Declaration of John B. Bulgozdy in Support of #343 Opposition/Response to Motion directing plaintiff to discontinue harassment of defendant until determination on an award for legal fees filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Related document(s) #343 ) (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Filing 343 RESPONSE (re #323 MOTION directing plaintiff to discontinue harassment of defendant until determination on a award for legal fees ) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bulgozdy, John) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Filing 342 REPLY to #326 opposition (re #318 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel ) filed by Mark Feathers. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION , #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. pursuant to #340 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Seaman re #339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER , #340 Notice (Other), #338 MOTION RECEIVER'S SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 340 NOTICE OF HEARING ON INTERIM FEE #338 and #339 APPLICATIONS FOR APPROVAL AND PAYMENT OF COMPENSATION TO RECEIVER AND HIS PROFESSIONALS (Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/4/2013) Modified on 4/5/2013,(counsel selected incorrect event) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2013 Filing 339 MOTION SECOND INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER filed by Thomas A. Seaman. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 4/18/2013. Replies due by 4/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fates, Ted) (Filed on 4/4/2013)