City of Capitola v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: City of Capitola
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv03428
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 86 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 79 Stipulated Request to Enlarge Time.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh finding as moot 62 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time ; finding as moot 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 70 Stipulation to Enlarge Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 40 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL, granting 23 Notice (Other), filed by City of Capitola: Hearing set as to 24 First MOTION for Discovery Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Hearing set for 1/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Opposition brief due by 1/11/2013. No reply will be considered. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/14/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 09 :00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/31/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Capitola v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Represented By: Joseph Marion Rimac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Capitola
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?