Tric Tools, Inc. v. TT Technologies, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tric Tools, Inc.
Defendant: TT Technologies, Inc and Tracto-Tecknik GMBH & Co., KG
Case Number: 5:2012cv03490
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal of Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Tric Tools, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 125 Settlement Conference. Statement or Dismissal due by 4/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN COUNTERCLAIMS re 116 Stipulation to Dismiss Three Counterclaims Without Prejudice filed by TT Technologies, Inc, Tracto-Tecknik GMBH & Co., KG. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference to September 18, 2014 filed by TT Technologies, Inc, Tracto-Tecknik GMBH & Co., KG. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RE: CONDUCT OF TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: NUMBER OF DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for 1/18/2013 is CONTINUED to 4/26/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 54 Stipulation To File First Amended Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR STAY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 39 Motion (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER re 39 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by TT Technologies, Inc, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 39 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Responses due by 11/16/2012. Replies due by 11/30/2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 27 Motion to Stay. Court vacates the 11/6/12 hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by TT Technologies, Inc, Tric Tools, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/24/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tric Tools, Inc. v. TT Technologies, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tric Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Sheridan Miller
Represented By: William Steven Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Technologies, Inc
Represented By: David A. Allgeyer
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Represented By: Christopher Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracto-Tecknik GMBH & Co., KG
Represented By: David A. Allgeyer
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Represented By: Christopher Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?