Moore et al v. Petsmart,Inc et al
Plaintiff: Danette M Moore, Alanna Harrison, Alisa Valdez and Latresa Myers
Defendant: Petsmart,Inc and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2012cv03577
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiffs do not, by 12:00 p.m. on 6/10/2016, file or cause to be filed a Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying 151 Motion to Certify the Amended Judgment. The hearing scheduled for 3/3/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/292/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting in part and denying in part 91 92 Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Plaintiffs shall file a proposed judgment consistent with this order on or before 08/11/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 08/04/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re: 91 , 92 Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys' Fees. On or before 3/9/2015 at 2:00 p.m., Plaintiffs shall lodge with the court, but shall not file, a copy of all billing records supporting the request for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/5/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015) Modified on 3/5/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order granting 40 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: 45 OBJECTOR'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. The court advises that only class counsel in this case as well as counsel for defendant shall be permitted to enter an appearance and present argument at the hearing scheduled for 3/7/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE: 42 EX PARTE APPLICATION. Any opposition to the application shall be filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on 2/18/2014. The court will not consider a reply brief and reply briefs should not be filed. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the application will then be submitted for decision based on the briefing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/14/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference scheduled for 1/31/2014 is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file the Motion for Preliminary Approval on or before 1/31/2014. The hearing on an anticipated Motion for Class Certification, previously scheduled for 5/16/2014, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/27/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 12/13/2013 at 10:00 a.m. On or before 12/6/2013 the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement which provides, inter alia, a proposed deadline for filing a Motion for Preliminary Approval if the motion is not filed before that date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING CASE 4/26/2013 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Case Management Statement, the Court finds that a Case Management Conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the conference scheduled for April 26, 2013 is VACATED. ***4/26/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds an appearance unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 11/9/2012 Case Management Conference and all other pretrial deadlines are VACATED. The court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Class Certification for April 12, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file, serve and notice the motion as necessary pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/5/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified text on 11/6/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Petsmart,Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette M Moore
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Marta Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanna Harrison
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Marta Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Valdez
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Marta Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latresa Myers
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Marta Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart,Inc
Represented By: Michelle B. Heverly
Represented By: Erica H. Kelley
Represented By: Elisa Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?