Aguirre-Olivas v. USA
Petitioner: Jaime Aguirre-Olivas
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 5:2012cv03908
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: D. Lowell Jensen
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Motion for Sentence Reduction and 2255 Motion, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Extending Period of Time for Government to Respond to Defendant's 2255 Petition. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 8/22/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Re: 2255 Motion. Government Response due 9/10/2012. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 8/9/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguirre-Olivas v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Aguirre-Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?