Scott v. Louisville Ladder Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Wisdom Scott, Jr.
Defendant: Louisville Ladder Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv03920
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 30 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/24/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO COMPLETE MEDIATION; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/26/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge lucy h. koh granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Louisville Ladder Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisdom Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Ladder Group, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Raymond Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?