Koga-Smith v. MetLife et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Koga-Smith
Defendant: MetLife, Lisa K Carter and Does 1 through 10,inclusive
Case Number: 5:2012cv04050
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Re 65 Joint Letter of March 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/27/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ALLOWING ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AND DIRECTING METLIFE'S COUNSEL TO CALL PLAINTIFF AND LISA CARTER, THEN THE COURT AT 11:30 a.m. on 4/25/13 re 56 Notice (Other) filed by MetLife. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 58 Defendant Carter's Motion to Appear by Telephone but denying other requests for relief (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendant Carter's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Naomi Koga-Smith. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 39 Defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 37 Defendant's motion for clarification and 34 Defendant's Motion for Injunctive Relief (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER PERMITTING E-FILING BY LISA CARTER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 11/9/12 TO 2/7/13 AT 9:00 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koga-Smith v. MetLife et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Koga-Smith
Represented By: Marcus James Godfrey
Represented By: James Efting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife
Represented By: Mark J. Hancock
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa K Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10,inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?